Battley v. Tyonek Contractors, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90012 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Summons Service Executed
5
06/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
6
06/08/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
7
06/08/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
9
06/29/2018
Proceeding Memo
10
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
12
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
13
01/08/2019
Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
14
01/29/2019
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (NIDS ONLY - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
02/19/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.