Battley v. Weaver Bros., Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90021 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
06/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/07/2018
Summons Issued
3
06/07/2018
Summons Service Executed
4
07/10/2018
Entry of Appearance
5
07/10/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
6
07/10/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
7
07/10/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
07/10/2018
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
9
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
10
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
12
08/03/2018
Setting Trial (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
14
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
15
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.