Beatty v. Ctb, Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:1999-cv-00705 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 688 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/12/1999
DEMAND for jury trial by James Beatty
2
07/12/1999
NOTICE of filing notice of removal by CTB, Inc.
3
07/12/1999
JOINDER by Latco, Inc. in [1-1] removal notice referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
4
07/12/1999
ANSWER to Complaint by Latco, Inc. Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
5
07/13/1999
JOINDER by Linco Holdings d/b/a Poultry Health Services of Georgia, Inc. in [1-1] removal notice. Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
6
07/13/1999
ANSWER to Complaint by Linco Holdings (Attorney Richard E. Broughton), referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
07/19/1999
File referred to Judge Thompson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/19/1999
NOTICE of filing original of affidavit of Gerry Broyles by CTB, Inc. Referred to Judge Thompson.
8
07/21/1999
ORDER setting a Rule 16 Status Conference for 8:00 AM on 8/10/99 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, at the FMJFB & USC, Montgomery, Al; directing counsel for all parties to be present, as further set out in order (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed to counsel; furnished to YG, HC & TW
9
07/21/1999
ORDER directing that the [4-1] motion to Dismiss by Latco, Inc. be set for submission on 8/6/99, without oral argument; brief in support due by 7/28/99 for Latco, Inc. ; setting reply brief deadline for 8/6/99 for James Beatty (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed and faxed, as directed, to counsel.
10
07/28/1999
INTERIM MOTION by Latco, Inc. for Charles Darwin "Skip" Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 77672 (Exhibit A and certificate of good standing attached). Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (djy) Modified on 07/28/1999
11
07/28/1999
BRIEF by Latco, Inc. in support of [4-1] motion to Dismiss. Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
12
07/29/1999
ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Charles Darwin "Skip" Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed to counsel.
13
07/29/1999
MOTION by CTB, Inc. to Dismiss or Consolidate Case with Civil Action No. 99-C-704-N or, in the alternative to Dismiss and Transfer Venue or, in the alternative, to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for More Definite Statement (Exhibit A attached). Referred to Mag. Judge John Carroll (djy) Modified on 08/12/1999
14
07/30/1999
MOTION by James Beatty for L. Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
15
07/30/1999
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for James Beatty by Tiernan W. Luck III
16
08/04/1999
ORDER granting [14-1] motion for L. Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Lowell Landis Sexton for James Beatty (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed to counsel.
17
08/04/1999
ORDER directing that the[13-1] motion to Dismiss, [13-2] motion Consolidate Case with Civil Action No. 99-C-704-N, [13-3] motion to Dismiss, [13-4] motion Transfer Venue, [13-5] motion to Dismiss, and [13-6] motion for More Definite Statement by CTB, Inc. be set for submission on 8/9/99, without oral argument (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson). Copies mailed and faxed, as directed to counsel.
18
08/06/1999
RESPONSE by James Beatty in opposition to [13-1] motion to Dismiss by CTB, Inc., [4-1] motion to Dismiss by Latco, Inc. (Exhibits l-2 attached), referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
19
08/09/1999
MEMORANDUM BRIEF by CTB, Inc. in support of [13-1] motion to Dismiss, [13-2] motion Consolidate Case with Civil Action No. 99-C-704-N, [13-3] motion to Dismiss, [13-4] motion Transfer Venue, [13-5] motion to Dismiss, [13-6] motion for More Definite Statement; (w/Exhibits A & B attached) referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
20
08/10/1999
Defendant Latco's consent to consolidation. Referred to Judge Thompson. (djy) Modified on 08/11/1999
21
08/10/1999
Plaintiff's consent to consolidation. Referred to Judge Thompson.
22
08/11/1999
Defendant CTB, Inc.'s consent to consolidation and consent to use of Magistrate Judge. Referred to Judge Thompson.
23
08/11/1999
Defendant Linco Holdings of Georgia's consent to consolidation. Referred to Judge Thompson.
08/12/1999
CASE reassigned to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/12/1999
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/12/1999
Motion(s) referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll : [13-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll, [13-2] motion Consolidate Case with Civil Action No. 99-C-704-N referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll, [13-3] motion to Dismiss referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll, [13-4] motion Transfer Venue referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll, [13-5] motion to Dismiss referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll, [13-6] motion for More Definite Statement referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll, [4-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Mag. Judge John L. Carroll (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/13/1999
ORDER granting [13-2] Motion Consolidate Case with Civil Action No. 99-C-704-N and that all future documents in thes consolidated cases shall be filed under Ca 99-C-704-N (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies mailed to Counsel. h
08/13/1999
Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 2cv99 704 h (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/1999
Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 2cv99 703 (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
09/13/1999
ORDER Consolidating with Civil Action Nos. 99-C-703-N and 99-C-704-N with all future documents filed under CA No. 99-C-703-N ; setting all motions to dismiss for submission on 10/4/99 with consent to mag. judge forms due by 10/4/99 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to counsel.
03/09/2001
Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 99-C-704-N h (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/09/2001
ORDER vacating [25-1] Relief Consolidating with Civil Action Nos. 99-C-703-N and 99-C-704-N with all future documents filed under CA No. 99-C-703-N; denying as moot Motion to Bifurcate filed by Dft CTB on 02/28/01 (signed by Mag. Judge John L. Carroll), copies provided to Counsel. h
06/12/2001
CASE reassigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2001
CASE reassigned to Judge W. H. Albritton III (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2001
CASE reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag. Judge Delores R. Boyd (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2001
REFERRAL JUDGE reassigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2001
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.