Belle Foods, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2013-bk-81963 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) {{1803}} Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 03/05/2016.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 13-81963-CRJ Belle Foods, LLC Chapter 11 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-8 User: kvernetti Page 1 of 7 Date Rcvd: Mar 03, 2016 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 123 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Mar 05, 2016. db +Belle Foods, LLC, 1652 Beltline Rd., SW, Decatur, AL 35601-5508 aty +Alan K Bellenger, Swiney & Bellenger, 2910 Linden Avenue, Suite 201, Homewood, Al 35209-2550 aty Amy D Gundlach, Quinn Connor Weaver Davies & Rouco LLP, Mountain Brook Ctr, Ste 380, 2700 Highway 280 East, Birmingham, AL 35223 aty Brian Rosenthal, Rose Law Firm, 120 E. Fourth Street, Little Rock, AR 72201-2893 aty Christine Keifer Borton, Maynard Cooper & Gale, P.C., 1901 Sixth Avenue North, 2400 Regions/Harbert Plaza, Birmingham, AL 35203-2618 aty +Christopher M Leins, Slevin & Hart, P.C., 1625 Massachusetts Ave., N.W, Ste 450, Washington, DC 20036-2228 aty +Dan S Cushing, Cushing Law Firm, Inc., 2653-B Old Shell Road, Mobile, AL 36607-2929 aty +David J Kellerman, Middleton Reutlinger, 401 S Fourth Street, Ste 2600, Louisville, KY 40202-4408 aty +Derek B. Simms, 608 37th Street South, Birmingham, AL 35222-3204 aty George N. Davies, QUINN, CONNOR, WEAVER, DAVIES & ROUCO, Mountain Brook Center, Suite 380, 2700 Highway 280 East, Birmingham, AL 35223, UNITED STATES aty +Gianfranco Finizio, Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, 230 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10169-2898 aty +Glenn C Thompson, Hamilton Stephens Steele & Martin, PLLC, 201 South College Street, Ste 2020, Charlotte, NC 28244-0028 aty +Highway 69 Properties, L.L.C., c/o Dorroh & Associates, P.C., 1800 McFarland Blvd N, Suite 180, Tuscaloosa, AL 35406-2179, UNITED STATES aty +Jack W Jenkins, Jr, Dozier Law Firm, 327 3rd Street, Macon, GA 31201-3396 aty +Jay E. Emerson, Jr., 405 Franklin St., Huntsville, AL 35801-4210 aty +Jeffery S. DeArman, 417 20TH ST N 1700 REGIONS BANK BDLG, BIRMINGHAM, AL 35203-3203 aty +Jeffrey R Drobish, Landis Rath & Cobb, LLP, 919 Market Street, Ste 1800, Wilmington, DE 19801-3033 aty +Jeremy C Kleinman, FrankGecker, LLP, 325 North LaSalle Street, Ste 625, Chicago, IL 60654-6465 aty +Jessica M Ward, Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, 230 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10169-2898 aty +John K Cunningham, White & Case LLP, 200 South Biscayne Boulevard, 49th Fl, Miami, FL 33131-2352 aty +Kenneth M. Schuppert, Jr, Blacburn Maloney & Schuppert LLC, P O Box 1469, Decatur, AL 35602-1469 aty +Kevin M McGill, White & Case LLP, Wachovia Financial Center, 200 South Biscayne Blvd. Suite 4900, Miami, FL 33131-2346 aty Kimberly A Ashby, Esq, Akerman LLP, 420 South Orange Ave., Suite 1200, PO BOX 231, Orlando, FL 32802-0231 aty +Matthew B McGuire, Landis Rath & Cobb, LLP, 919 Market Street, Ste 1800, Wilmington, DE 19801-3033 aty Nicholas Warner Whittenburg, Miller & Martin PLLC, 832 Georgia Avenue, Suite 1000, Chattanooga, TN 37402-2289 aty +Patrick K Pendleton, 1015 Montlimar Drive, Suite B1, Mobile, AL 36609-1715 aty +Scott L Hazan, Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, 230 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10169-2898 aty +W. Bradford Kittrell, PO Box 894, 51 Saint Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602-3503 aty W. Carlos Spaht, Kantrow Sphat Weaver & Blitzer (APLC), P O Box 2997, Baton Rouge, LA 70821-2997 cr +4324 Lillian Hwy LLC c/o Waterstone Southeast Hold, 145 Rosemary Street, Building B, Needham, MA 02494-3259 cr +ACE American Insurance Company (Creditor), c/o David B. Anderson, Financial Center, Suite 1450, 505 North 20th Street, Birmingham, AL 35203-2605 cr +ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, C/O ERIC RAY, P O BOX 306, BIRMINGHAM, AL 35201-0306 cr Agri-Mark, Inc. d/b/a Cabot Creamery Cooperative, c/o Eric S. Goldstein, Shipman & Goodwin LLP, One Constitution Plaza, Hartford, CT 06103-1919 cr Airgas USA, LLC, c/o Mr. David Boyle, PO Box 6675, Radnor, PA 19087-8675 cr +Allison Childs, Simms & Associates, 608 37th Street South, Birmingham, AL 35222-3204 cr American Greetings Corporation, One American Road, Cleveland, OH 44144-2398 cr +BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC, c/o Lisa Wolgast, Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP, 1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Road, NE, Atlanta, GA 30326-1085 cr +BTC Wholesale Distributors, Inc., c/o Stephen B. Porterfield, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., 2311 Highland Avenue S., Birmingham, AL 35205-2972 cr +Balboa Retail Partners, LLC, c/o Lisa Wolgast of Morris Manning, 1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Rd NE, Atlanta, GA 30326-1085 cr +Baldwin EMC, c/o W. Alexander Gray, Jr., Silver, Voit & Thompson, 4317-A Midmost Drive, Mobile, AL 36609-5507 cr +Benefit Development Group, Inc., Attn: J. Holland Powell, P O Box 190, 729 Dallas Avenue, Selma, AL 36701-5452 cr +Bright-Meyers Dublin Associates, L.P., c/o Nicholas W. Whittenburg, Miller & Martin PLLC, Suite 1000, Volunteer Building, 832 Georgia Avenue, Chattanooga, TN 37402-2207 cr Cal-Maine Foods, Inc., c/o Justin B. Little, REYNOLDS, REYNOLDS & LITTLE, LLC, Post Office Box 2863, Tuscaloosa, AL 35403-2863 Case 13-81963-CRJ11 Doc 1805 Filed 03/05/16 Entered 03/06/16 00:11:42 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 8 District/off: 1126-8 User: kvernetti Page 2 of 7 Date Rcvd: Mar 03, 2016 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 123 cr +Carol Kreider, Lewis, Smyth, Winter & Ford, LLC, 611 Helen Keller Blvd., Tuscaloosa, AL 35404-2983 cr +City of Hoover, Alabama, 100 Municipal Lane, Hoover, AL 35216-5500 fa +CohnReznick, LLP, 1212 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10036-1602 cr +Compass Bank, P.O. Box 201347, Arlington, TX 76006-1347 cr +Cullman Shopping Center, Inc., c/o D. Sparks, B. Hightower, Christian & Small LLP, 1800 Financial Center, 505 North 20th St., Birmingham, AL 35203-4633 cr +Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies), c/o Stephen B. Porterfield, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., 2311 Highland Avenue S., Birmingham, AL 35205-2972 cr +Decatur Coca-Cola Botting Company, #1 Refreshment Place, Decatur, AL 35601-7434 mv +Donna Landis, 2500 E. Avalon Ave., Apt. J-3, Muscle Shoals, AL 35661-3172 cr +Electronic Imaging Services, Inc. d/b/a Vestcom Re, c/o James G. Henderson, 505 North 20th Street, Suite 800, Birmingham, AL 35203-4602 cr GE Capital Information Technology Solutions, Inc f, Bankruptcy Administration, 1738 Bass Road, P O Box 13708, Macon, GA 31208-3708 cr Gershman Properties, LLC, 12300 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 310, Los Angeles, CA 90025-1057 cr +Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc., c/o Walter F. McArdle, 2117 Second Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-3702 cr +Graphic Media Solutions, LLC, c/o John C. Pennington, P.O. Box 275, Helen, GA 30545-0275 cr +Green Springs, Ltd., c/o Galloway Scott Moss & Hancock, LLC, 2200 Woodcrest Place, Ste 310, Birmingham, AL 35209-1378 cr +Gregory Pest Control, Balch & Bingham, c/o Jesse S. Vogtle, Jr., PO Box 306, Birmingham, AL 35201-0306 cr +Gulf Market Development, LLC, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 intp +HPA Northridge, LLC, c/o Jackson E. Duncan, III, Esq, P O Box 16010, Huntsville, AL 35802-1649 intp +HPA St. Francis, LLC, c/o Jackson E. Duncan, III, Post Office Box 16010, Huntsville, AL 35802-1649 intp IBM Corporation, National Bankruptcy Coordinator, 275 Viger East Ste 400, Montreal, Quebec, H2X 3R7, CANADA cr +James Beard, c/o Cloud & Tidwell, 201 Beacon Parkway West, Suite 400, Birmingham, AL 35209-3129 mv +James Michael Johnson, 3444 Vance Road, West Blocton, AL 35184-3047 cr +Jay E, LLC, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +John Rudolph Turner, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +John White-Spunner, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 intp #+Johnielle Barren, c/o McFadden, Lyon & Rouse, L.L.C., Attn: William M. Lyon, Jr., 718 Downtowner Boulevard, Mobile, AL 36609-5402 cr +Karen Joiner, c/o William Gregory Dobson, Lober, Dobson & Desai, LLC, 830 Mulberry Street, Suite 201-Robert E. Lee Building, Macon, GA 31201-0608 cr +Lehmberg Crossing, LLC, c/o Walter F. McArdle, Spain & Gillon, LLC, 2117 Second Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-3753 cr +MRPM Cullman Services, LLC, c/o D. Sparks, B. Hightower, Christian & Small LLP, 1800 Financial Center, 505 North 20th Street, Birmingham, AL 35203-4633 cr +Marl M. Cummings, III, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC, c/o Stephen B. Porterfield, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., 2311 Highland Avenue S., Birmingham, AL 35205-2972 cr +McCormick & Company, Inc., c/o Jay R. Bender, Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2120 cr +Mercury Retail Services, LLc, c/o Jesse S. Vogtle, Jr., Balch & Bingham LLP, PO Box 306, Birmingham, AL 35201-0306 cr Meridian Coca-Cola Bottling Company, REYNOLDS, REYNOLDS & LITTLE, LLC, Justin B. Little, Post Office Box 2863, Tuscaloosa, AL 35403-2863 cr +Meridian Energy Group, LLC, c/o D. Sparks, B. Hightower, Christian & Small LLP, 1800 Financial Center, 505 North 20th Street, Birmingham, AL 35203-4633 cr +Microsoft Corporation, c/o RIDDELL WILLIAMS P.S., Maria Ann Milano, 1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500, Seattle, WA 98154-1192 cr +Mobile County License Commissioner, P.O. Box 161009, Mobile, AL 36616-2009 cr +Mobile Partners, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +Mrs. Stratton’s Salads, Inc., c/o Stephen B. Porterfield, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., 2311 Highland Avenue S., Birmingham, AL 35205-2972 cr +Northside, Ltd., c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +Pensecola Supermarket Owners, LLC, 62 Cooper Square, #3B, New York, NY 10003-7101 cr Pepsi Cola Decatur, LLC, c/o Kenneth M. Schuppert, Jr., PO Box 1469, Decatur, AL 35602-1469 cr +Purity Dairies, LLC, c/o Stephen B. Porterfield, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., 2311 Highland Avenue S., Birmingham, AL 35205-2972 cr Red Diamond, Inc., PO Box 11407, Birmingham, AL 35246-1422 intp Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-So, Quinn, Connor, Weaver, Davies & Rouco LL, Amy D. Gundlach, Mountain Brook Center, Suite 380, 2700 Highway 280 East, Birmingham, Al 35223 cr +Ricoh USA Inc, attn Olivia Moody, 3920 Arkwright Rd Ste 400, Macon, GA 31210-1748 cr +Riverchase Lorna LP, 1901 6th Ave N, Suite 2400, Suite 2400, Birmingham, AL 35203-4604, UNITED STATES Case 13-81963-CRJ11 Doc 1805 Filed 03/05/16 Entered 03/06/16 00:11:42 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 8 District/off: 1126-8 User: kvernetti Page 3 of 7 Date Rcvd: Mar 03, 2016 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 123 cr +Ronald Woodruff, 3351 Poor House Road, Greenville, AL 36037-6541 cr +S & P of Macon, Inc, c/o Judson E. Crump, 25029 Planters Dr, Daphne, AL 36526-8797 cr +S&H, LLC, 11100 Electron Drive, Louisville, KY 40299-3826 cr +STORE SPE Belle, LLC, c/o Lisa M. Peters, 1650 Farnam Street, Omaha, NE 68102-2104 cr +Sandra Beard, Cloud & Tidwell, LLC, 201 Beacon Parkway West, Suite 400, Birmingham, AL 35209-3129 cr +Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C., c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +Scottsboro Electric Power Board, P.O. Box 550, Scottsboro, AL 35768-0550 cr +Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown’s Dairy), c/o Stephen B. Porterfield, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., 2311 Highland Avenue S., Birmingham, AL 35205-2972 cr +Spina Marketing Services, Inc., c/o D. Sparks, B. Hightower, Christian & Small LLP, 1800 Financial Center, 505 North 20th Street, Birmingham, AL 35203-4633 cr +The Extended Trust Agreement f/b/o Jay White-Spunn, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +The John White-Spunner Children’s Trust, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr +The News Group, LP, c/o Balch & Bingham LLP, Jesse S. Vogtle, Jr., PO Box 306, Birmingham, AL 35201-0306 cr +Thomas Dudley, c/o S. Dagnal Rowe, Wilmer & Lee, P.A., P. O. Box 2168, Huntsville, AL 35804-2168 cr +Tuttle Papock Springhill, LLC, c/o David A. Boyett, III, 3800 Airport Blvd. Suite 203, Mobile, AL 36608-1662 cr UFCW National Pension Fund, c/o Christine Keifer Borton, Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C., 1901 6th Ave North, 2400 Regions/Harbert Plaza, Birmingham, AL 35203 crcm +Unsecured Creditors’ Committee of Belle Foods, LLC, R. Scott Williams, 2001 Park Place, Suite 1400, Birmingham, AL 35203-2700 cr +Whitney LaToya Sanders, P.O. Box 1511, Meridian, MS 39302-1511 intp +William "Bill" White, c/o Lee R. Benton, Benton & Centeno, LLP, 2019 3rd Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-3301 intp +Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC, 1201 Greensboro Avenue, Tuscaloosa, AL 35401-2838 7929367 +GREASE MASTERS, 612 JACKSON ROAD, ROUND OAK, GA 31038-2939 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. aty +E-mail/Text: cstewart@Burr.com Mar 04 2016 01:34:32 Burr & Forman LLP, 420 North 20th Street, Suite 3400, Birmingham, AL 35203-3284 smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_northern@alnba.uscourts.gov Mar 04 2016 01:33:27 Richard Blythe, BA Decatur, P O Box 3045, Decatur, AL 35602-3045 cr +E-mail/Text: lvoit@silvervoit.com Mar 04 2016 01:35:09 Allstate Beverage Co., LLC, c/o Lawrence B. Voit, Silver, Voit & Thompson, 4317-A Midmost Drive, Mobile, AL 36609-5507 cr +E-mail/Text: scott.harris@aronov.com Mar 04 2016 01:30:57 Aronov Realty Management, Inc., 3500 Eastern Blvd., Montgomery, AL 36116-1781 cr +E-mail/PDF: ebnnotices@ascensioncapitalgroup.com Mar 04 2016 01:42:33 BBVA Compass c/o Ascension Capital Group, Post Office Box 201347, Arlington, TX 76006-1347 cr +E-mail/Text: philipbates@bellsouth.net Mar 04 2016 01:32:47 Escambia County Tax Collector, c/o Philip A. Bates, P.A., Post Office Box 1390, Pensacola, FL 32591-1390 cr +E-mail/Text: lvoit@silvervoit.com Mar 04 2016 01:35:09 Goldring Gulf Distributing, LLC, c/o Lawrence B. Voit, Silver, Voit & Thompson, 4317-A Midmost Drive, Mobile, AL 36609-5507 cr +E-mail/Text: lvoit@silvervoit.com Mar 04 2016 01:35:09 Gulf Distributing Co. of Mobile, LLC, c/o Lawrence B. Voit, Silver, Voit & Thompson, 4317-A Midmost Drive, Mobile, AL 36609-5507 cr +E-mail/Text: gravina@us.ibm.com Mar 04 2016 01:34:17 IBM Credit LLC, Attn: Paul Wearing-Special Handling Grou, 6303 Barfield Road, Atlanta, GA 30328-4233 cr +E-mail/Text: LSI@LIQUIDITYSOLUTIONS.COM Mar 04 2016 01:35:36 Liquidity Solutions, Inc., Liquidity Solutions, Inc., 1 University Plaza, Suite 312, Hackensack, NJ 07601-6205 liq +E-mail/Text: cstewart@Burr.com Mar 04 2016 01:34:32 Peter Kravitz, the GUC Trustee of the Belle Foods, c/o Burr & Forman LLP, 420 N 20th St, Ste 3400, Birmingham, AL 35203-5210 cr +E-mail/Text: lvoit@silvervoit.com Mar 04 2016 01:35:09 Pinebrook Properties, LLC, c/o Lawrence B. Voit, Silver, Voit & Thompson, 4317-A Midmost Drive, Mobile, AL 36609-5507 cr +E-mail/Text: jwolfe@wolfejones.com Mar 04 2016 01:31:23 S & L Mechanical, Inc., c/o William M. Hancock, 905 Bob Wallace Avenue, Huntsville, AL 35801-6504 cr +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Mar 04 2016 01:35:17 STATE OF ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, P.O. BOX 320001, MONTGOMERY, AL 36132-0001 TOTAL: 14 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr Chambers Bottling Company, LLC cr John Deputy cr Lynn Haven Development Corporation, P.O. Drawer 1460, Tuscaloosa cr Southern Family Markets of Tuscaloosa McFarland Bl Case 13-81963-CRJ11 Doc 1805 Filed 03/05/16 Entered 03/06/16 00:11:42 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 8 District/off: 1126-8 User: kvernetti Page 4 of 7 Date Rcvd: Mar 03, 2016 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 123 aty* +Alan K Bellenger, Swiney & Bellenger LLC, 2910 Linden Avenue, Suite 201, Homewood, AL 35209-2550 cr ##+Jeffrey Ashland, c/o Fresh Start Law Group, P O Box 381463, Birmingham, AL 35238-1463, UNITED STATES fa ##+The Food Partners, LLC, 5335 Wisconsin Ave NW, Suite 410, Washington, DC 20015-2030 cr ##+Trav-Ad Signs & Electric, Inc., c/o Angela S. Ary, Atty., Heard Ary, LLC, 307 Clinton Avenue W, Huntsville, AL 35801-5567 TOTALS: 4, * 1, ## 3 Addresses marked'+’ were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Addresses marked'#’ were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. Addresses marked'##’ were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as undeliverable. Notices will no longer be delivered by the USPS to these addresses; therefore, they have been bypassed. The debtor’s attorney or pro se debtor was advised that the specified notice was undeliverable. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 9): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary’s privacy policies. Date: Mar 05, 2016 Signature:/s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court’s CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on March 3, 2016 at the address(es) listed below: Albert G Lewis, III on behalf of Creditor Carol Kreider agl@lswattorneys.com Andrew Todd Darwin on behalf of Creditor 4324 Lillian Hwy LLC c/o Waterstone Southeast Holding Company LLC tdarwin@holcombebomar.com, rmitchell@holcombebomar.com Angela Stewart Ary on behalf of Creditor Trav-Ad Signs & Electric, Inc. aary@heardlaw.com, kheard@heardlaw.com;adauro@heardlaw.com;bstonemetz@heardlaw.com;sboyd@heardlaw.com;bupton@heardla w.com April Bryan Danielson on behalf of Creditor City of Hoover, Alabama adanielson@wskllc.com Bradley Richard Hightower on behalf of Creditor MRPM Cullman Services, LLC brhightower@csattorneys.com Bradley Richard Hightower on behalf of Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc. brhightower@csattorneys.com Bradley Richard Hightower on behalf of Creditor Cullman Shopping Center, Inc. brhightower@csattorneys.com Bradley Richard Hightower on behalf of Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC brhightower@csattorneys.com Brent W Dorner on behalf of Debtor Belle Foods, LLC bdorner@burr.com, mstinson@burr.com Brent W Dorner on behalf of Interested Party Belle Foods, LLC bdorner@burr.com, mstinson@burr.com Christopher Kern on behalf of Creditor Marilyn E. Wood, Mobile County Revenue Commissioner chriskernlaw@comcast.net Christopher L. Hawkins on behalf of Creditor Cloverdale Station, Inc. chawkins@babc.com D Christopher Carson on behalf of Interested Party Belle Foods, LLC ccarson@burr.com, mstinson@burr.com,erains@burr.com D Christopher Carson on behalf of Debtor Belle Foods, LLC ccarson@burr.com, mstinson@burr.com,erains@burr.com Dana Rizor Burton on behalf of Movant Donna Landis dburton@higgsandemerson.com, anunley@higgsandemerson.com Daniel Pasky on behalf of Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC dpasky@mcglinchey.com, darogers@mcglinchey.com Daniel D Sparks on behalf of Creditor MRPM Cullman Services, LLC ddsparks@csattorneys.com, jgguier@csattorneys.com Daniel D Sparks on behalf of Creditor Cullman Shopping Center, Inc. ddsparks@csattorneys.com, jgguier@csattorneys.com David A Norris on behalf of Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC dnorris@mcglinchey.com, smasley@mcglinchey.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor Mobile Partners dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor John White-Spunner dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor The John White-Spunner Children’s Trust dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C. dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor Marl M. Cummings, III dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor Jay E, LLC dboyett@abblawfirm.com Case 13-81963-CRJ11 Doc 1805 Filed 03/05/16 Entered 03/06/16 00:11:42 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 8 District/off: 1126-8 User: kvernetti Page 5 of 7 Date Rcvd: Mar 03, 2016 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 123 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court’s CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system (continued) David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor John Rudolph Turner dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor The Extended Trust Agreement f/b/o Jay White-Spunner’s Children Dated October 31, 2002 dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor Gulf Market Development, LLC dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor Tuttle Papock Springhill, LLC dboyett@abblawfirm.com David A. Boyett, III on behalf of Creditor Northside, Ltd. dboyett@abblawfirm.com David B. Anderson on behalf of Creditor ACE American Insurance Company (Creditor) dbanderson@andersonweidner.com, filings@andersonweidner.com David B. Anderson on behalf of Defendant ESIS, Inc. dbanderson@andersonweidner.com, filings@andersonweidner.com David J Cocke on behalf of Creditor Riverchase Lorna PC dcocke@evanspetree.com;tedwards@evanspetree.com, tedwards@evanspetree.com David L Pollack on behalf of Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC pollack@ballardspahr.com David L Pollack on behalf of Interested Party University Mall, LLC pollack@ballardspahr.com David L Pollack on behalf of Creditor Aronov Realty Management, Inc. pollack@ballardspahr.com David Merrill Posner on behalf of Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors’ Committee of Belle Foods, LLC dposner@kilpatricktownsend.com David Merrill Posner on behalf of Creditor Committee Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors dposner@kilpatricktownsend.com David Samuel Rubin on behalf of Creditor Community Coffee Company, LLC david@kswb.com E.B. Harrison Willis on behalf of Creditor Sandra Beard ebhw@yahoo.com, hwillis@cloudwillis.com E.B. Harrison Willis on behalf of Creditor James Beard ebhw@yahoo.com, hwillis@cloudwillis.com Edward J Peterson, III on behalf of Creditor Halpern Enterprises, Inc. epeterson.ecf@srbp.com, ksc@srbp.com Eric T Ray on behalf of Creditor ALABAMA POWER COMPANY eray@balch.com, bfreeman@balch.com Erik D Fine on behalf of Creditor Allison Childs edarlofine@gmail.com George N. Davies on behalf of Creditor Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council gdavies@qcwdr.com, jherrin@qcwdr.com;agundlach@qcwdr.com George N. Davies on behalf of Interested Party Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council gdavies@qcwdr.com, jherrin@qcwdr.com;agundlach@qcwdr.com George N. Davies on behalf of Attorney George N. Davies gdavies@qcwdr.com, jherrin@qcwdr.com;agundlach@qcwdr.com Hanna Lahr on behalf of Liquidator Peter Kravitz, the GUC Trustee of the Belle Foods GUC Trust hlahr@burr.com, mgunnells@burr.com Hanna Lahr on behalf of Interested Party Belle Foods, LLC hlahr@burr.com, mgunnells@burr.com Hanna Lahr on behalf of Debtor Belle Foods, LLC hlahr@burr.com, mgunnells@burr.com J Leland Murphree on behalf of Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP Lmurphree@maynardcooper.com Jackson E Duncan, III on behalf of Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC jackson.e.duncan@gmail.com Jackson E Duncan, III on behalf of Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC jackson.e.duncan@gmail.com James Paul Watkins on behalf of Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V. jwatkins@babc.com Jay R. Bender on behalf of Creditor McCormick & Company, Inc. jbender@babc.com Jayna Partain Lamar on behalf of Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP jlamar@maynardcooper.com, prudloff@maynardcooper.com;jturnipseed@maynardcooper.com Jayna Partain Lamar on behalf of Creditor UFCW National Pension Fund jlamar@maynardcooper.com, prudloff@maynardcooper.com;jturnipseed@maynardcooper.com Jean Winborne Boyles on behalf of Creditor Nalley-Garrett Cochran, LLC jboyles@jhvgglaw.com Jennifer Brooke Kimble on behalf of Plaintiff Peter S. Kravitz jkimble@rumberger.com, mbarnette@rumberger.com;docketingorlando@rumberger.com;jkimblesecy@rumberger.com;mcourtney@rumber ger.com;ldowner@rumberger.com Jennifer Brooke Kimble on behalf of Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors’ Committee of Belle Foods, LLC jkimble@rumberger.com, mbarnette@rumberger.com;docketingorlando@rumberger.com;jkimblesecy@rumberger.com;mcourtney@rumber ger.com;ldowner@rumberger.com Jesse S Vogtle, Jr on behalf of Creditor Mercury Retail Services, LLc jvogtle@balch.com, kharding@balch.com Jesse S Vogtle, Jr on behalf of Creditor The News Group, LP jvogtle@balch.com, kharding@balch.com Jesse S Vogtle, Jr on behalf of Creditor Gregory Pest Control jvogtle@balch.com, kharding@balch.com John Charles Pennington on behalf of Creditor Graphic Media Solutions, LLC jcppc@windstream.net John F Porter, III on behalf of Creditor Scottsboro Electric Power Board jfplaw@scottsboro.org John P Kreis on behalf of Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC jkreis@kreislaw.com, j.kreis@ca.rr.com John W Jennings, Jr. on behalf of Creditor Rainbow Plaza Assoc., LTD john@johnjenningslaw.com, jenningsandmesserpc@gmail.com Joseph D. Frank on behalf of Creditor Frito-Lay North America, Inc. jfrank@fgllp.com, ccarpenter@fgllp.com;rheiligman@fgllp.com Joseph D. Frank on behalf of Creditor Bottling Group, LLC, operating collectively with affiliates and their subsidiaries as Pepsi Beverages Company jfrank@fgllp.com, ccarpenter@fgllp.com;rheiligman@fgllp.com Judson Eric Crump on behalf of Creditor S & P of Macon, Inc judson@judsonecrump.com Justin B. Little on behalf of Creditor Coca Cola Bottling Company jlittle@rrllaw.com, alee@rrllaw.com Case 13-81963-CRJ11 Doc 1805 Filed 03/05/16 Entered 03/06/16 00:11:42 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 5 of 8 District/off: 1126-8 User: kvernetti Page 6 of 7 Date Rcvd: Mar 03, 2016 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 123 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court’s CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system (continued) Justin B. Little on behalf of Creditor Meridian Coca-Cola Bottling Company jlittle@rrllaw.com, alee@rrllaw.com Justin B. Little on behalf of Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. jlittle@rrllaw.com, alee@rrllaw.com Kathleen M. Miller on behalf of Creditor Airgas USA, LLC Kmiller@skfdelaware.com, seh@skfdelaware.com Kevin D. Heard on behalf of Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc. kheard@heardlaw.com, aary@heardlaw.com;kheard619@gmail.com;adauro@heardlaw.com;bstonemetz@heardlaw.com;sboyd@heardlaw.com;bupton@heardlaw.com Lawrence B Voit on behalf of Creditor Pinebrook Properties, LLC lvoit@silvervoit.com, notices@silvervoit.com Lawrence B Voit on behalf of Creditor Gulf Distributing Co. of Mobile, LLC lvoit@silvervoit.com, notices@silvervoit.com Lawrence B Voit on behalf of Creditor Allstate Beverage Co., LLC lvoit@silvervoit.com, notices@silvervoit.com Lawrence B Voit on behalf of Creditor Goldring Gulf Distributing, LLC lvoit@silvervoit.com, notices@silvervoit.com Lawrence T King on behalf of Creditor Ronald Woodruff llaking@msn.com, cevans7896@gmail.com;kimjett.ks@gmail.com Lee R. Benton on behalf of Interested Party William "Bill" White lbenton@bcattys.com, kmartin@bcattys.com Lisa M Peters on behalf of Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC lisa.peters@kutakrock.com Lisa McVicker Wolgast on behalf of Creditor Balboa Retail Partners, LLC lwolgast@mmmlaw.com Lisa McVicker Wolgast on behalf of Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC lwolgast@mmmlaw.com M. Lee Johnsey, Jr. on behalf of Creditor Red Diamond, Inc. ljohnsey@balch.com Marc P Solomon on behalf of Debtor Belle Foods, LLC msolomon@burr.com, mgunnells@burr.com;mivey@burr.com Marc P Solomon on behalf of Attorney Burr & Forman LLP msolomon@burr.com, mgunnells@burr.com;mivey@burr.com Marc P Solomon on behalf of Interested Party Belle Foods, LLC msolomon@burr.com, mgunnells@burr.com;mivey@burr.com Maria Ann Milano on behalf of Creditor Microsoft Corporation mmilano@riddellwilliams.com Mark Benedict on behalf of Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. mark.benedict@huschblackwell.com Mark D Griffin on behalf of Creditor STATE OF ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE mark.griffin@revenue.alabama.gov Mark H. Ralston on behalf of Creditor Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies) mralston@fishmanjackson.com, ralstonlaw@gmail.com Mark H. Ralston on behalf of Creditor Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown’s Dairy) mralston@fishmanjackson.com, ralstonlaw@gmail.com Mark H. Ralston on behalf of Creditor Purity Dairies, LLC mralston@fishmanjackson.com, ralstonlaw@gmail.com Mark H. Ralston on behalf of Creditor Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC mralston@fishmanjackson.com, ralstonlaw@gmail.com Mark P. Williams on behalf of Interested Party Derst Baking Company, LLC mpwilliams@nwkt.com Mark P. Williams on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC mpwilliams@nwkt.com Mark P. Williams on behalf of Creditor American Greetings Corporation mpwilliams@nwkt.com Mark P. Williams on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Tuscaloosa, LLC mpwilliams@nwkt.com Mark P. Williams on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Villa Rica, LLC mpwilliams@nwkt.com Mark P. Williams on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC mpwilliams@nwkt.com Mark P. Williams on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Thomasville, LLC mpwilliams@nwkt.com Matthew Barley on behalf of Plaintiff Peter S. Kravitz matt.barley@butlersnow.com, ecf.notices@butlersnow.com;sonya.graves@butlersnow.com;brittney.williams@butlersnow.com Matthew Barley on behalf of Defendant U.S. Energy Services, Inc. matt.barley@butlersnow.com, ecf.notices@butlersnow.com;sonya.graves@butlersnow.com;brittney.williams@butlersnow.com Matthew Barley on behalf of Interested Party Belle Foods, LLC matt.barley@butlersnow.com, ecf.notices@butlersnow.com;sonya.graves@butlersnow.com;brittney.williams@butlersnow.com Missty C Gray on behalf of Creditor Mobile County License Commissioner missty.gray@arlaw.com, joy.massey@arlaw.com Patrick Darby on behalf of Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V. pdarby@babc.com Paul Joseph Spina, III on behalf of Creditor BBVA Compass c/o Ascension Capital Group pspina@spinalavelle.com Peter D’Apice on behalf of Creditor Mercury Retail Services, LLc dapice@sbep-law.com R. Scott Williams on behalf of Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc. swilliams@rumberger.com, docketingorlando@rumberger.com;swilliamssecy@rumberger.com;ldowner@rumberger.com;mcourtney@rumber ger.com;mbarnette@rumberger.com R. Scott Williams on behalf of Plaintiff Peter S. Kravitz swilliams@rumberger.com, docketingorlando@rumberger.com;swilliamssecy@rumberger.com;ldowner@rumberger.com;mcourtney@rumber ger.com;mbarnette@rumberger.com Case 13-81963-CRJ11 Doc 1805 Filed 03/05/16 Entered 03/06/16 00:11:42 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 6 of 8 District/off: 1126-8 User: kvernetti Page 7 of 7 Date Rcvd: Mar 03, 2016 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 123 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court’s CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system (continued) R. Scott Williams on behalf of Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors’ Committee of Belle Foods, LLC swilliams@rumberger.com, docketingorlando@rumberger.com;swilliamssecy@rumberger.com;ldowner@rumberger.com;mcourtney@rumber ger.com;mbarnette@rumberger.com Randolph M Fowler on behalf of Attorney Highway 69 Properties, L.L.C. rfowler@pjgf.com, randolphfowler@hotmail.com Randolph M Fowler on behalf of Interested Party Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC rfowler@pjgf.com, randolphfowler@hotmail.com Richard M Blythe Richard_Blythe@alnba.uscourts.gov, courtmaildec@alnba.uscourts.gov Richard Patrick Carmody on behalf of Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC richard.carmody@arlaw.com Richard Patrick Carmody on behalf of Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. richard.carmody@arlaw.com Richard Scott Cobb on behalf of Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC cobb@lrclaw.com, mumford@lrclaw.com Richard Scott Cobb on behalf of Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. cobb@lrclaw.com, mumford@lrclaw.com Rita H Dixon on behalf of Creditor Green Springs, Ltd. ritadixon10@gmail.com Robert John Fehse, Jr on behalf of Creditor Riverchase Lorna PC rfehse@evanspetree.com, alott@evanspetree.com Ronald G Steen, Jr on behalf of Creditor Suntrust Bank ronn.steen@thompsonburton.com Russell Rutherford on behalf of Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. russell.rutherford@arlaw.com Russell Rutherford on behalf of Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC russell.rutherford@arlaw.com S. Dagnal Rowe on behalf of Creditor Thomas Dudley drowe@wilmerlee.com, dbranche@wilmerlee.com Sameer Kapoor on behalf of Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC skapoor@mmmlaw.com Shayana Boyd Davis on behalf of Creditor Jeffrey Ashland shayana@boyddavis.com, boyddavisecf@gmail.com Stephen B Porterfield on behalf of Creditor Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC sporterfield@sirote.com, cwhitburn@sirote.com Stephen B Porterfield on behalf of Creditor Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies) sporterfield@sirote.com, cwhitburn@sirote.com Stephen B Porterfield on behalf of Creditor BTC Wholesale Distributors, Inc. sporterfield@sirote.com, cwhitburn@sirote.com Stephen B Porterfield on behalf of Creditor Mrs. Stratton’s Salads, Inc. sporterfield@sirote.com, cwhitburn@sirote.com Stephen B Porterfield on behalf of Creditor Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown’s Dairy) sporterfield@sirote.com, cwhitburn@sirote.com Stephen B Porterfield on behalf of Creditor Purity Dairies, LLC sporterfield@sirote.com, cwhitburn@sirote.com Stephen Paul Wilson on behalf of Creditor Whitney LaToya Sanders swilson@thehamiltonlawfirm.com Steven C Sasser on behalf of Creditor Pepsi Cola Decatur, LLC ssasser@bmsatty.com Thomas A Nettles, IV on behalf of Creditor Lynn Haven Development Corporation tnettles@mcabeeconstruction.com Todd C. Meyers on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Thomasville, LLC TMeyers@Kilpatricktownsend.com, mwilliams@Kilpatricktownsend.com Todd C. Meyers on behalf of Interested Party Derst Baking Company, LLC TMeyers@Kilpatricktownsend.com, mwilliams@Kilpatricktownsend.com Todd C. Meyers on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Villa Rica, LLC TMeyers@Kilpatricktownsend.com, mwilliams@Kilpatricktownsend.com Todd C. Meyers on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Tuscaloosa, LLC TMeyers@Kilpatricktownsend.com, mwilliams@Kilpatricktownsend.com Todd C. Meyers on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC TMeyers@Kilpatricktownsend.com, mwilliams@Kilpatricktownsend.com Todd C. Meyers on behalf of Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC TMeyers@Kilpatricktownsend.com, mwilliams@Kilpatricktownsend.com Walter F McArdle on behalf of Creditor Lehmberg Crossing, LLC wfm@spain-gillon.com, mdj@spain-gillon.com Walter F McArdle on behalf of Creditor Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc. wfm@spain-gillon.com, mdj@spain-gillon.com Walter F Scott, III on behalf of Creditor Green Springs, Ltd. wfs3@gallowayscott.com William M Lyon, Jr. on behalf of Interested Party Johnielle Barren wlyon@mlrlawyers.com, cbusbin@mlrlawyers.com William M. Hancock on behalf of Creditor S & L Mechanical, Inc. bankruptcy@wolfejones.com, wmhancock@wolfejones.com William M. Hancock on behalf of Defendant S & L Mechanical, Inc. bankruptcy@wolfejones.com, wmhancock@wolfejones.com William M. Hancock on behalf of Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. bankruptcy@wolfejones.com, wmhancock@wolfejones.com TOTAL: 149 Case 13-81963-CRJ11 Doc 1805 Filed 03/05/16 Entered 03/06/16 00:11:42 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 7 of 8,1 7+(81,7(' 67$7(6%$1.5837&< &2857)25 7+(1257+(51 ',675,&7 2) $/$%$0$ 1257+(51 ',9,6,21,1 5(%(//()22'6//& &KDSWHU &DVH 1R No. 185 Filed by Grease Masters WKH ³6WLSXODWLRQ´ >'RFNHW 1R aged Certificate of Notice Page 8 of 8

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 816 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/01/2013
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1213 Filed by Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
07/01/2013
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(13-81963-11) [misc,volp11] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15307546. Fee Amount 1213.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
07/01/2013
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
1
Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) #
2
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor(s) #
3
List of Equity Security Holders) (Carson, D Christopher
3 Attachments
3
07/01/2013
Amended Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Carson, D Christopher)
4
07/01/2013
Application to Employ BURR & FORMAN LLP as COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
5
07/01/2013
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 363 Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
6
07/01/2013
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for Order Authorizing Retention of Professionals Utilized by Debtor in Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
7
07/01/2013
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363(b) for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
8
07/01/2013
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b) and (c) and 507(a)(7) Authorizing Debtor to Continue and Honor Certain Pre-Petition Customer Programs, Including Lottery Programs, and (II) Motion to Pay Over Funds Held in Trust to the Georgia Lottery and the Florida Lottery Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
9
07/01/2013
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363(B) and (C) for Authorization to Continue Debtors Workers Compensation Programs, All Other Insurance Policies, All Agreements Relating Thereto, and Pay All Obligations in Respect Thereof Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
10
07/01/2013
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rules 2002(m) and 9007 Establishing Omnibus Hearing Dates and Certain Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
11
07/01/2013
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 366 for Order (I) Approving Debtors Adequate Assurance of Post-Petition Payments to Utility Companies and Deeming Utility Companies Adequately Assured, (II) Prohibiting the Utility Companies from Altering, Refusing, or Disconnecting Services, and (III) Establishing Procedures for Resolving Requests for Additional Assurance Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
12
07/01/2013
Judge Jack Caddell added to case
13
07/01/2013
Application to Employ The Food Partners, LLC as AS INVESTMENT BANKER AND FINANCIAL ADVISOR FOR DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
14
07/02/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 4 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 5 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 10 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 11 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 7/3/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
15
07/02/2013
Chapter 11 Operating Order Signed on 7/2/2013.
16
07/02/2013
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
17
07/02/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 16 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 7/3/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
18
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Creditor Mrs. Stratton's Salads, Inc.
19
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Creditor BTC Wholesale Distributors, Inc.
20
07/02/2013
Agreed Interim Order Granting Use of Cash Collateral Signed on 7/2/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125475188'>1</a> Exhibit A)
1 Attachment
21
07/02/2013
Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§105(a) and 363(b) Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits (Related Doc # 7) Signed on 7/2/2013.
22
07/02/2013
Document Notice of Demand of BTC Wholesale Distributors, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor BTC Wholesale Distributors, Inc.
23
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Richard Patrick Carmody Filed by Creditors C&S Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC.
24
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffery S. DeArman by Richard Patrick Carmody Filed by Creditors C&S Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC.
25
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David K Bowsher Filed by Creditors C&S Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC.
26
07/02/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Error in uploading creditor name which should properly read as C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. Filed by Creditor C&S Grocers, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Appearance, 24 Notice of Appearance, 25 Notice of Appearance).
27
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Richard Patrick Carmody Filed by Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
28
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffery S. DeArman by Richard Patrick Carmody Filed by Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
29
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David K Bowsher Filed by Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
30
07/02/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Russell Rutherford Filed by Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
31
07/02/2013
Affidavit of William (Bill) D. White in Support of Chapter 11 Petition and First Day Motions Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11), 2 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, Equity Security Holders, 3 Amended Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11), 4 Application to Employ BURR & FORMAN LLP as COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION, 5 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 363 Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System, 6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for Order Authorizing Retention of Professionals Utilized by Debtor in Ordinary Course of Business, 7 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363(b) for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits, 8 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b) and (c) and 507(a)(7) Authorizing Debtor to Continue and Honor Certain Pre-Petition Customer Programs, Including Lottery Programs, and (II) Motion to Pa, 9 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363(B) and (C) for Authorization to Continue Debtors Workers Compensation Programs, All Other Insurance Policies, All Agreements Relating Thereto, and Pay, 10 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rules 2002(m) and 9007 Establishing Omnibus Hearing Dates and Certain Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures<, 11 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 366 for Order (I) Approving Debtors Adequate Assurance of Post-Petition Payments to Utility Companies and Deeming Utility Companies Adequately Assured, (II) P, 13 Application to Employ The Food Partners, LLC as AS INVESTMENT BANKER AND FINANCIAL ADVISOR FOR DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION, 16 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information).
32
07/02/2013
Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for Entry of an Interim and Final Order Pursuant to §§ 105 and 363: (I) Authorizing and Approving (A) the Sale of Certain of the Debtors Assets Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, and (B) the Conducting of Store Closing or Similarly Themed Sales; (II) Approving the Agent Agreement and Authorizing Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC to Act as Debtors Liquidation Agent; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
33
07/03/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 32 Debtor's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Interim Order Pursuant to §§105 and 363: (I) Authorizing and Approving (A) The Sale of Certain of the Debtor's Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, and (B) The Conducting of Store Closing or Similarly Themed Sales; (II) Approving the Agent Agreement and Authorizing Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC to Act as Debtor's Liquidation Agent; and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 7/3/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
34
07/03/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Mrs. Stratton's Salads for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Mrs. Stratton's Salads, Inc.
35
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David L Pollack Filed by Creditor Aronov Realty Management, Inc.
36
07/03/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David L. Pollack Filed by Creditor Aronov Realty Management, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
37
07/03/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [7/3/13 9:58 AM] Run Time [00:41:08] File Size [ 38.6 MB] RE: Doc #4; Debtor's Application For Order Authorizing Retention and Employment of Burr & Forman LLP as Counsel for Debtor
39
07/03/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #13; Debtor's Application for Order Authorizing Retention and Employment of The Food Partners, LLC as Investment Banker and Financial Advisor for Debtor) Hearing scheduled 07/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
40
07/03/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #5; Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System with SunTrust Bank and Regions Bank) Hearing scheduled 07/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
41
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice OF SERVICE OF NOTICES AND PLEADINGS by George N. Davies Filed by Attorney George N. Davies, Creditor Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council.
42
07/03/2013
Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc # 9) Signed on 7/3/2013.
43
07/03/2013
Order Granting Debtor an Extension of Time Within Which to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs (Related Doc # 16) Signed on 7/3/2013.
44
07/03/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Mark T. Benedict Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
45
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ronald G Steen Jr Filed by Creditor Suntrust Bank.
46
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Creditor Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy).
47
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Creditor Purity Dairies, LLC.
48
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Creditor Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies).
49
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Creditor Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC.
50
07/03/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on behalf of Mark H. Ralston by Stephen B Porterfield Filed by Creditors Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies), Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC, Purity Dairies, LLC, Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy).
51
07/04/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 20) (RE: related document(s) 20 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 07/04/2013.
52
07/04/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 21) (RE: related document(s) 21 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Notice Date 07/04/2013.
53
07/05/2013
Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc # 32) Signed on 7/5/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125492376'>1</a> Exhibit &quot;1&quot;)
1 Attachment
54
07/05/2013
Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc # 8) Signed on 7/5/2013.
55
07/05/2013
Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc # 10) Signed on 7/5/2013.
56
07/05/2013
Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 4) Signed on 7/5/2013.
57
07/05/2013
Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc # 6) Signed on 7/5/2013.
58
07/05/2013
Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc # 11) Signed on 7/5/2013.
59
07/05/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 44) Signed on 7/5/2013.
60
07/05/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC.
61
07/05/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Southern Foods Group, LLC d/b/a Brown's Dairy for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy).
62
07/05/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC d/b/a Purity Dairies for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Purity Dairies, LLC.
63
07/05/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC d/b/a Barber Dairies for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies).
64
07/05/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Richard S. Cobb Filed by Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC
65
07/05/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Richard S. Cobb Filed by Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
66
07/05/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew B. McGuire Filed by Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
67
07/05/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey D. Drobish Filed by Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
68
07/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 42) (RE: related document(s) 42 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Notice Date 07/05/2013.
69
07/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 43) (RE: related document(s) 43 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules). Notice Date 07/05/2013.
70
07/07/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David A. Boyett III Filed by Creditor Gulf Market Development, LLC.
71
07/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 53) (RE: related document(s) 53 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Notice Date 07/07/2013.
72
07/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 54) (RE: related document(s) 54 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Notice Date 07/07/2013.
73
07/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 55) (RE: related document(s) 55 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Notice Date 07/07/2013.
74
07/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 56) (RE: related document(s) 56 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 07/07/2013.
75
07/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 57) (RE: related document(s) 57 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Notice Date 07/07/2013.
76
07/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 58) (RE: related document(s) 58 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). Notice Date 07/07/2013.
77
07/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 59) (RE: related document(s) 59 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/07/2013.
78
07/08/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lawrence B Voit Filed by Creditor Pinebrook Properties, LLC.
79
07/08/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Walter F McArdle Filed by Creditor Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc.
80
07/08/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 65) Signed on 7/8/2013.
81
07/08/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 66) Signed on 7/8/2013.
82
07/08/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 67) Signed on 7/8/2013.
83
07/08/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 36) Signed on 7/8/2013.
84
07/08/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 5 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 363 Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Suntrust Bank
85
07/08/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11), 2 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, Equity Security Holders, 3 Amended Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11), 4 Application to Employ BURR & FORMAN LLP as COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION, 5 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 363 Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System, 6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for Order Authorizing Retention of Professionals Utilized by Debtor in Ordinary Course of Business, 7 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363(b) for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits, 8 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b) and (c) and 507(a)(7) Authorizing Debtor to Continue and Honor Certain Pre-Petition Customer Programs, Including Lottery Programs, and (II) Motion to Pa, 9 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363(B) and (C) for Authorization to Continue Debtors Workers Compensation Programs, All Other Insurance Policies, All Agreements Relating Thereto, and Pay, 10 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 102 and 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rules 2002(m) and 9007 Establishing Omnibus Hearing Dates and Certain Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures<, 11 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 366 for Order (I) Approving Debtors Adequate Assurance of Post-Petition Payments to Utility Companies and Deeming Utility Companies Adequately Assured, (II) P, 13 Application to Employ The Food Partners, LLC as AS INVESTMENT BANKER AND FINANCIAL ADVISOR FOR DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION, 16 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, 20 Order (Blank), 21 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, 31 Affidavit, 32 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for Entry of an Interim and Final Order Pursuant to §§ 105 and 363: (I) Authorizing and Approving (A) the Sale of Certain of the Debtors Assets Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims an).
86
07/08/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lawrence B Voit Filed by Creditor Goldring Gulf Distributing, LLC.
87
07/08/2013
Document Notice of Demand for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Goldring Gulf Distributing, LLC.
88
07/08/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lawrence B Voit Filed by Creditor Allstate Beverage Co., LLC.
89
07/08/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Allstate Beverage Co., LLC for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Allstate Beverage Co., LLC.
90
07/08/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lawrence B Voit Filed by Creditor Gulf Distributing Co. of Mobile, LLC.
91
07/08/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Gulf Distributing Co. of Mobile, LLC for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Gulf Distributing Co. of Mobile, LLC.
92
07/09/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John Charles Pennington Filed by Creditor Graphic Media Solutions, LLC.
93
07/09/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 84 Objection filed by Creditor Suntrust Bank). Hearing scheduled 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
94
07/10/2013
Document Supplement to Motion to Admit Richard S. Cobb Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC (RE: related document(s) 65 Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Richard S. Cobb).
95
07/10/2013
Document Supplement to Motion to Admit Matthew B. McGuire Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC (RE: related document(s) 66 Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew B. McGuire).
96
07/10/2013
Document Supplement to Motion to Admit Jeffrey R. Drobish Pro Hac Vice Filed by Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC (RE: related document(s) 67 Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Jeffrey D. Drobish).
97
07/10/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Randolph M Fowler Filed by Interested Party Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC.
98
07/10/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 53 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, 57 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, 58 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions).
99
07/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 80) (RE: related document(s) 80 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/10/2013.
100
07/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 81) (RE: related document(s) 81 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/10/2013.
101
07/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 82) (RE: related document(s) 82 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/10/2013.
102
07/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 83) (RE: related document(s) 83 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/10/2013.
103
07/11/2013
Statement Notice of Website Containing Documents Pertinent to Debtors Case Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
104
07/11/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice / Service by Justin B. Little Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc.
105
07/11/2013
Document : Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc.
1
Exhibit to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods
1 Attachment
106
07/12/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David Samuel Rubin, W. Carlos Spaht Filed by Creditor Community Coffee Company, LLC.
107
07/12/2013
Notice of Demand of Community Coffee Company, L.L.C. for Reclamation of Goods. Filed by Creditor, Communtiy Coffee Company, L.L.C.
108
07/12/2013
Agreed Second Interim Order Granting Use of Cash Collateral Signed on 7/12/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125535534'>1</a> Exhibit A)
1 Attachment
109
07/12/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #1 filed by Pensacola News Journal. PROBLEM: The claim has an incorrect case number (13-819963) noted on the claim form. SOLUTION: The filer, Pensacola News Journal should make the following corrections: file an amended claim with the correct case number (13-81963) on the form
110
07/12/2013
Exhibit 1 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
111
07/12/2013
Exhibit 2 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
112
07/12/2013
Exhibit 3 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
113
07/12/2013
Exhibit 4 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
114
07/12/2013
Exhibit 5 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
115
07/12/2013
Exhibit 6 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
116
07/12/2013
Exhibit 7 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
117
07/12/2013
Exhibit 8 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
118
07/12/2013
Exhibit 9 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
119
07/12/2013
Exhibit 10 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
120
07/12/2013
Exhibit 11 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
121
07/12/2013
Exhibit 12 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
122
07/12/2013
Amended and Restated Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363(b) Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits Order Signed on 7/12/2013 (RE: related document(s) 21 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions).
123
07/12/2013
Exhibit 13 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
124
07/12/2013
Exhibit 14 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
125
07/12/2013
Exhibit 15 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
126
07/12/2013
Exhibit 16 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
127
07/12/2013
Exhibit 17 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
128
07/12/2013
Exhibit 18 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
129
07/12/2013
Exhibit 19 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
130
07/12/2013
Exhibit 20 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
131
07/12/2013
Exhibit 21 to Notice of Demand of Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 105 Document).
132
07/12/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee of $50.00 paid by Mark T. Benedict (Re Item:44 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601045137 (RE: related document(s) 44 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC).
133
07/12/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee of $150.00 paid by Richard S. Cobb, Matthew B. McGuire and Jeffrey D. Drobish (Re Item:64 Motion to Appear pro hac vice, 66 Motion to Appear pro hac vice, 67 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601045254 (RE: related document(s) 64 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC, Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., 66 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC, Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., 67 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC, Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.).
134
07/12/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee of $50.00 paid by David L. Pollack (Re Item:36 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601045255 (RE: related document(s) 36 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Aronov Realty Management, Inc.).
135
07/12/2013
Document Notice of Demand of Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc., For Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc.
136
07/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 108) (RE: related document(s) 108 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 07/14/2013.
137
07/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 122) (RE: related document(s) 122 Amended Order). Notice Date 07/14/2013.
138
07/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 109) (RE: related document(s) 109 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/14/2013.
139
07/15/2013
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/13/2013 at 01:00 PM at Room 200 Decatur.
140
07/15/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Walter F Scott III Filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd.
141
07/16/2013
Document Amended Notice of Demand of Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc.
142
07/16/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [7/16/13 9:59 AM] Run Time [00:09:08] File Size [ 8.6 MB] RE: Doc #5; Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System with SunTrust Bank and Regions Bank
144
07/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor IBM Credit LLC.
145
07/16/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #4,5,6,7 filed by Pensacola News Journal. PROBLEM: The creditor has not referenced the correct debtor name for this case on the claim forms and has not included a signature and date by a creditor representative. SOLUTION: The filer, Pensacola News Journal, should make the following corrections: Please file amended claims to note the debtor's name for the case in the box provided on the claim form which is "Belle Foods, LLC". You may indicate the particular store that the claim relates to on a separate portion of the claim. Also, please have a creditor representative sign and date the claim forms.
146
07/16/2013
Document Amended Notice of Demand of Mrs. Stratton's Salads for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Mrs. Stratton's Salads, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 34 Document).
147
07/16/2013
Document Amended Notice of Demand of Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies) for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies) (RE: related document(s) 63 Document).
148
07/16/2013
Document Amended Notice of Demand of Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC d/b/a Purity Dairies for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Purity Dairies, LLC (RE: related document(s) 62 Document).
149
07/16/2013
Document Amended Notice of Demand of Southern Foods Group, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy) for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy) (RE: related document(s) 61 Document).
150
07/16/2013
Document Amended Notice of Demand of Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC (RE: related document(s) 60 Document).
151
07/17/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Todd C. Meyers Filed by Interested Parties Derst Baking Company, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Tuscaloosa, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Villa Rica, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Thomasville, LLC.
152
07/17/2013
Bankruptcy Administrator's Notice To The Court Regarding Formation of An Unsecured Creditors' Committee Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe.
153
07/17/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Eric T Ray Filed by Creditor ALABAMA POWER COMPANY.
154
07/17/2013
Order Appointing The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Signed on 7/17/2013.
155
07/17/2013
Document Notice of Reclamation Demand Filed by Attorney The News Group, LP.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
156
07/17/2013
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant to an Asset Purchase Agreement, (II) Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Real Property Leases; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B #
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
157
07/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 139) (RE: related document(s) 139 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Notice Date 07/17/2013.
158
07/18/2013
FINAL ORDER AUTHORIZING AND APPROVING RETENTION AND EMPLOYMENT OFTHE FOOD PARTNERS, LLC AS INVESTMENT BANKER AND FINANCIAL ADVISOR TODEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION (Related Doc # 13) Signed on 7/18/2013.
159
07/18/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher Kern Filed by Creditor Marilyn E. Wood, Mobile County Revenue Commissioner.
160
07/18/2013
Document Additional Notice of Demand of Reclamation of Goods Filed by Creditor Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc.
161
07/18/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 145) (RE: related document(s) 145 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/18/2013.
162
07/19/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Creditors Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies), Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC, Purity Dairies, LLC, Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy)
163
07/19/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Rita H Dixon Filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd.
164
07/19/2013
Document Notice of Mercury Retail Services, LLC Demand for Reclamation of Goods Filed by Attorney Mercury Retail Services, LLc.
165
07/19/2013
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Christopher Kern, attorney for Marilyn E. Wood, Mobile County Revenue Commissioner, has the incorrect case number in the style of the case when filing the Notice of Appearance. SOLUTION: The filer, Christopher Kern, attorney for Marilyn E. Wood, Mobile County Revenue Commissioner, should re-file the pleading with the correct case number in the style. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 159 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Marilyn E. Wood, Mobile County Revenue Commissioner).
166
07/19/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY incorrect PDF document attached Filed by Creditor Marilyn E. Wood, Mobile County Revenue Commissioner (RE: related document(s) 159 Notice of Appearance).
167
07/19/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher Kern Filed by Creditor Marilyn E. Wood, Mobile County Revenue Commissioner.
168
07/19/2013
AGREED ORDER RESOLVING OBJECTION TO DEBTORS MOTION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 AND 363 AUTHORIZING CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM Signed on 7/19/2013 (RE: related document(s) 5 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 84 Objection filed by Creditor Suntrust Bank). (mmb) Modified on 7/19/2013
169
07/19/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice filed by Mark H. Ralston (Related Doc # 162) Signed on 7/19/2013.
170
07/19/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 5 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 84 Objection filed by Creditor Suntrust Bank). Hearing scheduled 7/22/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
171
07/19/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Angela Stewart Ary Filed by Creditor Trav-Ad Signs & Electric, Inc.
172
07/19/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 154) (RE: related document(s) 154 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 07/19/2013.
173
07/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 158) (RE: related document(s) 158 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 07/20/2013.
174
07/21/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 168) (RE: related document(s) 168 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 07/21/2013.
175
07/21/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 169) (RE: related document(s) 169 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/21/2013.
177
07/22/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David L Pollack Filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC.
178
07/22/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Amended) by David L Pollack Filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC.
179
07/22/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Peter C. D'Apice Filed by Attorney Mercury Retail Services, LLc
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
180
07/22/2013
Agreed Modification of Second Interim Order Granting Use of Cash Collateral Signed on 7/22/2013 (RE: related document(s) 108 Order (Blank)).
181
07/23/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kathleen M. Miller Filed by Creditor Airgas USA, LLC.
182
07/23/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jean Winborne Boyles Filed by Creditor Nalley-Garrett, LLC. Modified on 7/24/2013 to reflect correct creditor
183
07/23/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William M. Hancock Filed by Creditor S & L Mechanical, Inc.
184
07/24/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Service of Documents to R. Scott Williams as Co-Counsel for the Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC by R. Scott Williams Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC. (Williams, R.)
185
07/24/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 179) Signed on 7/24/2013.
186
07/24/2013
Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d), Motion to Use Cash Collateral Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtor (A) to Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 364(C)(1), 364(C)(2), 364(C)(3), 364(D)(1) and 364(E) and (B) to Utilize Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363, and (II) Scheduling Final Hearing Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 4001(B) and (C) Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
187
07/24/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 186 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364 filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral). Hearing scheduled 7/24/2013 at 12:00 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
188
07/24/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Service of Documents to Jennifer B. Kimble as co-counsel for the Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC by Jennifer Brooke Kimble Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC.
190
07/24/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor GE Capital Information Technology Solutions, Inc f/d/b/a IKON Financial Services.
191
07/24/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [7/24/13 12:03 PM] Run Time [00:23:35] File Size [ 22.1 MB] RE: Doc #186; Debtor's Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post Petition Financing, Utilize Cash Collateral and Scheduling Final Hearing
192
07/24/2013
Interim Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363, 364 and 507 (A) Authorizing PostPetition Financing, (B) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral, (C) Granting Adequate Protection, (D) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (E) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 186) Signed on 7/24/2013.
193
07/24/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 186 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364 filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
194
07/24/2013
Application to Employ Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC as Chief Restructuring Officer Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
195
07/24/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 180) (RE: related document(s) 180 Order Granting). Notice Date 07/24/2013.
196
07/25/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 194 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 7/25/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
198
07/25/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [7/25/13 9:56 AM] Run Time [00:26:40] File Size [ 25.0 MB] RE: Doc #194; Debtor's Application for an Order Authorizing the Employment of Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC and Designating Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC as Chief Restructuring Officer
199
07/25/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David Merrill Posner Filed by Creditor Committee Proposed Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors.
200
07/26/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Interested Party IBM Corporation.
201
07/26/2013
Order Supplementing This Court's Order (I) Authorizing and Approving (A) The Sale of Certain of Debtor's Asset Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, and (B) The Conducting of Store Closing or Similarly Themed Sales; (II) Approving the Agent Agreement and Authorizing HILCO Merchant Resources, LLC to Act as Debtor's Liquidation Agent; and (III) Granting Related Relief Signed on 7/26/2013 (RE: related document(s) 53 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions).
202
07/26/2013
Final Order Approving Application to Employ of Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC and Designating Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC as Chief Restructuring Officer. (Related Doc # 194) Signed on 7/26/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125638325'>1</a> Consulting Agreement)
1 Attachment
203
07/26/2013
Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Debtor's Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 AND 363 Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Cash Management System. Signed on 7/26/2013 (RE: related document(s) 5 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 84 Objection filed by Creditor Suntrust Bank).
204
07/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 185) (RE: related document(s) 185 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/26/2013.
205
07/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 192) (RE: related document(s) 192 Order on Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364). Notice Date 07/26/2013.
206
07/28/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 201) (RE: related document(s) 201 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 07/28/2013.
207
07/28/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 202) (RE: related document(s) 202 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 07/28/2013.
208
07/28/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 203) (RE: related document(s) 203 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 07/28/2013.
209
07/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #20 filed by National Flex LLC. PROBLEM: The names of Debtor and Creditor are incorrect on claim (Name of Debtor listed as National Flex LLC and name of Creditor listed as Belle Foods). SOLUTION: The filer, National Flex LLC should make the following corrections: File an Amended Claim #20 listing the Debtor's name and Creditor's name correctly.
210
07/29/2013
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 156 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant to an Asset Purchase Agreement, (II) Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Real Property Leases; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
211
07/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #26 filed by J.C. Sowell Meats, Inc. PROBLEM: Claim was filed without a proof of claim form attached. SOLUTION: The filer, J.C. Sowell Meats, Inc. should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #26 to include a completed Proof of Claim form. Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10.
212
07/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #31 filed by City of Milton, Florida. PROBLEM: Claim was filed without a proof of claim form attached. SOLUTION: The filer, City of Milton, Florida should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #31 to include a completed Proof of Claim form. Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10.
213
07/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #32 filed by Hendrix Service & Equipment. PROBLEM: Claim was filed without a proof of claim form attached. SOLUTION: The filer, Hendrix Service & Equipment should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #32 to include a completed Proof of Claim form. Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10.
214
07/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #33 filed by Grass With Class. PROBLEM: Claim was filed without a proof of claim form attached. SOLUTION: The filer, Grass With Class should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #33 to include a completed Proof of Claim form. Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10.
215
07/29/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 210 Notice of Dismissal/Withdrawal of a Document).
216
07/29/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Gianfranco Finizio of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
217
07/29/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Jessica M. Ward of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
218
07/29/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David M. Posner of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
219
07/29/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Scott L. Hazan of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
220
07/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #19 filed by Custom Cleaning Solutions, LLC. PROBLEM: The names of Debtor and Creditor are incorrect on claim (Name of Debtor listed as Custom Cleaning Solutions, LLC and name of Creditor listed as Belle Foods, LLC). SOLUTION: The filer, Custom Cleaning Solutions, LLC should make the following corrections: File an Amended Claim #19 listing the Debtor's name and Creditor's name correctly.
221
07/29/2013
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, (B) Authorizing The Assumption And Assignment Of Certain Real Property Leases; (II) Approving Bidding Procedures Related Thereto; And (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
222
07/30/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 221 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
223
07/30/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 216 Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Gianfranco Finizio of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C., 217 Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Jessica M. Ward of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C., 218 Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David M. Posner of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C., 219 Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Scott L. Hazan of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C.).
224
07/30/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Amy D. Gundlach, Attorney for Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council.
225
07/30/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 216) Signed on 7/30/2013.
226
07/30/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 217) Signed on 7/30/2013.
227
07/30/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 218) Signed on 7/30/2013.
228
07/30/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 219) Signed on 7/30/2013.
229
07/30/2013
Declaration re: Debtor's Schedules, Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Schedules, Statement Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 3 Amended Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)).
1
Schedule A #
2
Schedule B #
3
Schedule D #
4
Schedule E #
5
Schedule F #
6
Schedule G #
7
Schedule H #
8
Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules #
9
Statement of Financial Affairs #
10
Verification of Creditor Matrix
10 Attachments
230
07/31/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James G Henderson Filed by Creditor dba Vestcom Retail Electronic Imaging Services, Inc.
231
07/31/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Creditor dba Vestcom Retail Electronic Imaging Services, Inc.
232
07/31/2013
Requestfor Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim Filed by Creditor dba Vestcom Retail Electronic Imaging Services, Inc.
1
Exhibit &quot;A&quot; (Starling Affidavit)
1 Attachment
233
07/31/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Incomplete PDF attachment Upload - Filed by Creditor dba Vestcom Retail Electronic Imaging Services, Inc. Related document(s) 232 Request filed by Creditor Electronic Imaging Services, Inc. d/b/a Vestcom Retail. Modified on 7/31/2013 to relate change docket entry relationship from #231 to #232 per filing counsel
234
07/31/2013
Request for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim Filed by Creditor dba Vestcom Retail Electronic Imaging Services, Inc.
1
Affidavit (&quot;Starling Affidavit&quot;) #
2
Exhibit &quot;A&quot; #
3
Exhibit &quot;B&quot; part 1 of 2 #
4
Exhibit &quot;B&quot; part 2 of 2
4 Attachments
235
07/31/2013
Verified Statement Filed by Creditors ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, Mercury Retail Services, LLc, Attorney The News Group, LP.
236
07/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 209) (RE: related document(s) 209 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/31/2013.
237
07/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 211) (RE: related document(s) 211 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/31/2013.
238
07/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 212) (RE: related document(s) 212 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/31/2013.
239
07/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 213) (RE: related document(s) 213 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/31/2013.
240
07/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 214) (RE: related document(s) 214 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/31/2013.
241
07/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 220) (RE: related document(s) 220 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 07/31/2013.
242
07/31/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 231) Signed on 7/31/2013.
243
08/01/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 234 Request for Allowance and Payment of Section 503(b)(9) Administrative Claim filed by Creditor Electronic Imaging Services, Inc. d/b/a Vestcom Retail). Hearing scheduled 9/3/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
244
08/01/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances,).
245
08/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 225) (RE: related document(s) 225 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/01/2013.
246
08/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 226) (RE: related document(s) 226 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/01/2013.
247
08/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 227) (RE: related document(s) 227 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/01/2013.
248
08/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 228) (RE: related document(s) 228 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/01/2013.
249
08/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 222) (RE: related document(s) 222 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/01/2013.
250
08/02/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #47 filed by King Louie Special Blends. PROBLEM: Claim was filed without a proof of claim form attached. SOLUTION: The filer, King Louie Special Blends should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #47 to include a completed Proof of Claim form. Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10.
251
08/03/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 242) (RE: related document(s) 242 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/03/2013.
252
08/03/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 243) (RE: related document(s) 243 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/03/2013.
253
08/04/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 250) (RE: related document(s) 250 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/04/2013.
254
08/05/2013
Application to Employ R. Scott Williams, Jennifer B. Kimble, Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
255
08/05/2013
Application to Employ Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. as Co-Counsel of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
256
08/05/2013
Application to Employ CohnReznick, LLP for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc as Financial Advisors Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
257
08/05/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by M. Lee Johnsey Jr. Filed by Creditor Red Diamond, Inc. (Johnsey, M.)
258
08/05/2013
Bankruptcy Administrator's Recommendation Approving Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe (RE: related document(s) 254 Application to Employ R. Scott Williams, Jennifer B. Kimble, Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC).
259
08/05/2013
Bankruptcy Administrator's Recommendation Approving Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe (RE: related document(s) 255 Application to Employ Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. as Co-Counsel of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC).
260
08/05/2013
Bankruptcy Administrator's Recommendation Approving Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Employ CohnReznick, LLP for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc as Financial Advisors Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC).
261
08/05/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC)(Limited Objection) Filed by Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C.
262
08/05/2013
Motion to Set a Determination Hearing on Request for Additional Adequate Assurance Made by Baldwin EMC Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
263
08/06/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by S. Dagnal Rowe Filed by Creditor Thomas Dudley. (Rowe, S.)
264
08/06/2013
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditor Thomas Dudley (Rowe, S.)
08/06/2013
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(13-81963-JAC11) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15454153. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 264) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
265
08/06/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 261 Objection filed by Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C.). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
266
08/06/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
267
08/06/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 262 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/20/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
268
08/06/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #65 filed by Holifield Farms. PROBLEM: Claim was filed without a proof of claim form attached. SOLUTION: The filer, Holifield Farms, should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #65 to include a completed Proof of Claim form. Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10.
269
08/06/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #66 filed by S&H, LLC. PROBLEM: Claim was filed without a proof of claim form attached. SOLUTION: The filer, S&H, LLC should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #66 to include a completed Proof of Claim form. Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10.
270
08/06/2013
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas Dudley (RE: related document(s) 264 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Thomas Dudley). Hearing scheduled 9/3/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
271
08/06/2013
Joint Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC)(Joinder in Limited Objection) Filed by Creditors Marl M. Cummings III, John Rudolph Turner, Jay E, LLC, The Extended Trust Agreement f/b/o Jay White-Spunner's Children Dated October 31, 2002, The John White-Spunner Children's Trust, John White-Spunner, Northside, Ltd., Tuttle Papock Springhill, LLC
272
08/06/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 271 Objection filed by Creditor Tuttle Papock Springhill, LLC, Creditor John White-Spunner, Creditor The John White-Spunner Children's Trust, Creditor John Rudolph Turner, Creditor Northside, Ltd., Creditor The Extended Trust Agreement f/b/o Jay White-Spunner's Children Dated October 31, 2002, Creditor Marl M. Cummings, Creditor Jay E, LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
273
08/06/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Interested Party Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1 CBA Excerpt
1 Attachment
274
08/06/2013
Order Authorizing Retention and Employment of Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc to July 23, 2013 (Related Doc # 254) Signed on 8/6/2013.
275
08/06/2013
Order Authorizing Retention and Employment of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Belle Foods, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc to July 23, 2013 (Related Doc # 255) Signed on 8/6/2013.
276
08/06/2013
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant to Asset Purchase Agreements, (II) Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts; (III) Authorizing the Rejection of a Real Property Lease; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
277
08/07/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 273 Objection filed by Interested Party Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
278
08/07/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 276 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbra).
279
08/07/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Travis Stuart Jackson Filed by Creditor Decatur Coca-Cola Botting Company.
280
08/07/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC)and Decatur Coca-Cola Bottling Company Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Decatur Coca-Cola Botting Company
281
08/07/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
282
08/07/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 276 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
283
08/07/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 281 Objection filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
284
08/07/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 280 Objection filed by Creditor Decatur Coca-Cola Botting Company). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
285
08/07/2013
Order/Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s) 281 Objection filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.). Incomplete Filings due by 8/21/2013.
286
08/07/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 186 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtor (A) to Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 364(C)(1), 364(C)(2), 364(C)(3), 364(D)(1) and 364(E) and (B) t) Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
1 Attachment
287
08/07/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
288
08/07/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 156 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbran, 194 Application to Employ Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC as Chief Restructuring Officer).
289
08/07/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 286 Objection filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC, 287 Objection filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
290
08/07/2013
JoinderIn Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Creditors Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies), Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC, Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy)
291
08/07/2013
Response to (Re Item: 273 Objection filed by Interested Party Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council) Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
292
08/07/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David B. Anderson Filed by Attorney ACE American Insurance Company (Creditor).
293
08/07/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 186 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Motion to Use Cash Collateral Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtor (A) to Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 364(C)(1), 364(C)(2), 364(C)(3), 364(D)(1) and 364(E) and (B) t)(LIMITED OBJECTION) Filed by Creditor ACE American Insurance Company (Creditor) Modified on 8/8/2013 to reflect objection filed by "Creditor" ACE American Insurance Company instead of "Attorney" ACE American Insurance Company
294
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #256; Application by the Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Order Authorizing the Employment of CohnReznick LLP as Financial Advisors Nunc Pro Tunc to July 23, 2013) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
295
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #186; Final Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post Petition Financing and To Utilize Cash Collateral) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
296
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #286; Objection to Debtor's Motion for Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post Petition Financing and to Utilize Cash Collateral filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
297
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #221; Debtor's Motion for Entry of Orders Authorizing & Approving Sale of Certain Retail Stores, Authorizing the Assumption & Assignment of Certain Real Property Leases & Approving Bidding Procedures Related Thereto) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
298
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #261; Limited Objection to Debtor's Motion For Approval of Sale of Certain Retail Stores filed by Saraland Loop Road, LLC) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
299
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #271; Joinder in Limited Objection to Debtor's Motion For Approval of Sale of Certain Retail Stores filed by below listed parties) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
300
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #273; Objection to Motion For Approval of Sale of Certain Retail Stores filed by The Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, MId-South Council (RWDSU)) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
301
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #281; Limited Objection to Motion For Approval of Sale of Certain Retail Stores filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
302
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #280; Conditional Objection to Motion For Approval of Sale of Certain Retail Stores and Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay on vending coolers & equipment filed by Decatur Coca-Cola Bottling Company) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
303
08/08/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #287; Objection to Debtor's Motion For Approval of Sale of Certain Retail Stores filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) Hearing scheduled 08/09/2013 at 09:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
304
08/08/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [8/8/13 8:58 AM] Run Time [00:13:01] File Size [ 12.2 MB] RE: Doc #276; Debtor's Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing & Approving Sale of Certain Retail Stores, Authorizing the Assumption & Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts, and Authorizing the Rejection of a Real Property Lease
306
08/08/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 290 Joinder filed by Creditor Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy), Creditor Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies), Creditor Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC, 291 Response filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 293 Objection filed by Attorney ACE American Insurance Company (Creditor)). Hearing scheduled 8/9/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
307
08/08/2013
Hearing Rescheduled (RE: related document(s) 280 Objection filed by Creditor Decatur Coca-Cola Bottling Company). Hearing scheduled 8/20/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
308
08/08/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #70 filed by Gregory R. Slaney. PROBLEM: The attached claim has not been signed. SOLUTION: The filer, Gregory R. Slaney should make the following corrections: The claim should be refiled to include a signature.
309
08/08/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice-Lisa M. Peters Filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC
310
08/08/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC
311
08/08/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 310 Objection filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/9/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
312
08/08/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by W Alexander Gray Jr Filed by Attorney Baldwin EMC.
313
08/08/2013
Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion for an Order Setting Bar Date for Filing Claims Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe.
314
08/08/2013
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC (RE: related document(s) 310 Objection).
315
08/08/2013
Order and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing on Motion to Set Claims Bar Date Signed on 8/8/2013 (RE: related document(s) 313 Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion for an Order Setting Bar Date for Filing Claims filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe).
316
08/08/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 309) Signed on 8/8/2013.
317
08/08/2013
Supplement Filed by Creditor ACE American Insurance Company (Creditor) (RE: related document(s) 293 Objection).
318
08/08/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for service by Richard Garth Ferrell Filed by Creditor Pensecola Supermarket Owners, LLC.
319
08/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 274) (RE: related document(s) 274 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 08/08/2013.
320
08/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 275) (RE: related document(s) 275 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 08/08/2013.
321
08/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 267) (RE: related document(s) 267 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/08/2013.
322
08/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 270) (RE: related document(s) 270 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 08/08/2013.
323
08/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 268) (RE: related document(s) 268 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/08/2013.
324
08/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 269) (RE: related document(s) 269 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/08/2013.
325
08/09/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [8/9/13 8:56 AM] Run Time [01:35:12] File Size [ 89.4 MB] RE: Doc #256; Application by the Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Order Authorizing the Employment of CohnReznick LLP as Financial Advisors Nunc Pro Tunc to July 23, 2013
326
08/09/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna PC
1
Exhibit A #
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
328
08/09/2013
Order Granting Application to Employ CohnReznick, LLP (Related Doc # 256) Signed on 8/9/2013.
08/09/2013
Corrective Entry - Copy of Order did not go out to parties. Order will be redocketed to send notice. (RE: related document(s) 328 Order on Application to Employ). (Text entry; no document attached.)
329
08/09/2013
Order **entered in Duplicate to send notice to parties**Signed on 8/9/2013 (RE: related document(s) 256 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC).
330
08/09/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice-David J. Cocke (Related Doc # 326) Signed on 8/9/2013.
331
08/09/2013
Order Authorizing and Approving Debtor's (I) Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Pursuant to Asset Purchase Agreements, (II) Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts; (III) Rejection of a Real Property Lease; and (IV) Related Relief (Related Doc # 276) Signed on 8/9/2013.
332
08/09/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 285) (RE: related document(s) 285 Notice of Deficient Filing). Notice Date 08/09/2013.
333
08/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 315) (RE: related document(s) 315 Notice and Order). Notice Date 08/10/2013.
334
08/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 316) (RE: related document(s) 316 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/10/2013.
335
08/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 307) (RE: related document(s) 307 Hearing Rescheduled). Notice Date 08/10/2013.
336
08/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 308) (RE: related document(s) 308 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/10/2013.
337
08/11/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 329) (RE: related document(s) 329 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 08/11/2013.
338
08/11/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 330) (RE: related document(s) 330 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/11/2013.
339
08/11/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 331) (RE: related document(s) 331 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 08/11/2013.
340
08/12/2013
Final Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363, 364 and 507 (A) Authorizing PostPetition Financing, (B) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral, (C) Granting Adequate Protection, and (D) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 186) Signed on 8/12/2013.
1
Exhibit A #
2
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125746933'>2</a> Exhibit B)
2 Attachments
341
08/12/2013
Order (A) Approving Bid Procedures Relating to Sale of Certain of the Debtor's Assets; (B) Scheduling a Hearing to Consider the Sale; (C) Establishing Notice and Procedures Related to the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Contracts and Leases; and (D) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 221) Signed on 8/12/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125748820'>1</a> Exhibit A)
1 Attachment
342
08/12/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 221 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
343
07/23/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Peter C. D'Apice (Re Item:179 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601045549 (RE: related document(s) 179 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Mercury Retail Services, LLc).
344
07/19/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Mark H. Ralston (Re Item:162 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601045682 (RE: related document(s) 162 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Southern Food Groups, LLC (d/b/a Brown's Dairy), Creditor Purity Dairies, LLC, Creditor Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC (d/b/a Barber Dairies), Creditor Mayfield Dairy Farms, LLC).
345
07/30/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Gianfranco Finizio; Jessica M. Ward; David M. Posner; Scott L. Hazan (Re Item:216 Motion to Appear pro hac vice, 217 Motion to Appear pro hac vice, 218 Motion to Appear pro hac vice, 219 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601045682 (RE: related document(s) 216 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC, 217 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC, 218 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC, 219 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC).
346
08/12/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Brian Rosenthal (Re Item:326 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601045894 (RE: related document(s) 326 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna PC).
347
08/12/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lisa M Peters Filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC.
348
08/12/2013
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtors Motion for an Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain Nonresidential Real Property Leases and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Lease Rejection Damage Claims Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
349
08/12/2013
Motion to Approve Compensation Procedures for Professionals Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
350
08/12/2013
Motion for an Order Providing for the Establishment of Procedures for Addressing the Return of Consigned Goods and Equipment Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
351
08/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas A Nettles IV Filed by Creditor Lynn Haven Development Corporation.
352
08/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Glenn Thompson Filed by Creditor Mondelez Global, LLC.
353
08/12/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice-Lisa Wolgast Filed by Creditor Balboa Retail Partners, LLC
354
08/12/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lisa Wolgast Filed by Creditor Balboa Retail Partners, LLC.
355
08/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Nicholas Warner Whittenburg Filed by Creditor Bright-Meyers Dublin Associates, L.P.
356
08/13/2013
Meeting of Creditors Held. Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe.
357
08/13/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Lisa Wolgast (Re Item:353 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601046069 (RE: related document(s) 353 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Balboa Retail Partners, LLC).
358
08/13/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by David J. Cocke (Re Item:326 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601046071 (RE: related document(s) 326 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna PC).
359
08/13/2013
Exhibit Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 348 Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtors Motion for an Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain Nonresidential Real Property Leases and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Lease Rejection Damage Claims).
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
360
08/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Steven C Sasser Filed by Creditor Pepsi Cola Decatur, LLC.
361
08/13/2013
Motion to Establish Procedures for Filing Requests for Payment of 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(9) Administrative Expenses, Including Setting a Bar Date for Filing Requests Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
362
08/13/2013
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 363 Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Personal Property Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
363
08/14/2013
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for An Order Approving Rejection of Certain NonResidential Real Property Leases (Related Doc # 348) Signed on 8/14/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125763188'>1</a> Exhibit A)
1 Attachment
364
08/14/2013
Order Establishing Procedures for the Return or Release of Consigned Goods and Equipment (Related Doc #350) Signed on 8/14/2013.
365
08/14/2013
Order Approving Compensation Procedures for Professionals (Related Doc #349) Signed on 8/14/2013.
366
08/14/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice-Lisa Wolgast (Related Doc # 353) Signed on 8/14/2013.
367
08/14/2013
Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property Outside of the Normal Course of Business Notice of Sale of Assets of Debtor.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
368
08/14/2013
Certificate of Service Supplement to Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 367 Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property Outside of the Normal Course of Business).
369
08/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 340 Order on Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364). Notice Date 08/14/2013.
370
08/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 341 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 08/14/2013.
371
08/15/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Missty C Gray Filed by Creditor Mobile County License Commissioner.
372
08/15/2013
Order Establishing Procedures for Filing Requests for Payment of 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(9) Administrative Expenses, Including Setting a Bar Date for Filing Requests (Related Doc #361) Signed on 8/15/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125771826'>1</a> xhibit A)
1 Attachment
373
08/15/2013
Order Authorizing and Approving Debtor's Sale of Certain Personal Property Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 362) Signed on 8/15/2013.
374
08/15/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #84 filed by Missy C. Gray, attorney. PROBLEM: Amount of claim is not listed on Claim/PDF under Amount of Claim as of Date Case Filed. SOLUTION: The filer, Missy C. Gray, attorney should make the following corrections: File an AMENDED claim with the amount listed.
375
08/15/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John F Porter III Filed by Creditor Scottsboro Electric Power Board.
376
08/15/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #87 filed by JD Distribution. PROBLEM: The filer has filed a claim or claim attachments not in an upright position. SOLUTION: The filer, JD Distribution, should AMEND the claim with copies of attachments in portrait orientation.
377
08/15/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 281 Objection).
378
08/16/2013
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 8/16/2013 (RE: related document(s) 362 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC. Hearing scheduled 8/20/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
379
08/16/2013
Certificate of Good Standing Filed by Lisa Wolgast (RE: related document(s) 353 Motion to Appear pro hac vice).
380
08/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by April Bryan Danielson Filed by Creditor City of Hoover, Alabama.
381
08/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel D Sparks Filed by Creditor MRPM Cullman Services, LLC.
382
08/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel D Sparks Filed by Creditor Cullman Shopping Center, Inc.
383
08/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley Richard Hightower Filed by Creditor MRPM Cullman Services, LLC.
384
08/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley Richard Hightower Filed by Creditor Cullman Shopping Center, Inc.
385
08/16/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 363 Order on Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 08/16/2013.
386
08/16/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 364 Order on Motion). Notice Date 08/16/2013.
387
08/16/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 365 Order on Motion). Notice Date 08/16/2013.
388
08/16/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 366 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/16/2013.
389
08/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 372 Order on Motion). Notice Date 08/17/2013.
390
08/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 373 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 08/17/2013.
391
08/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 374 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/17/2013.
392
08/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 376 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 08/17/2013.
393
08/18/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 378 Notice and Order). Notice Date 08/18/2013.
394
08/19/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #89 filed by Edward J. Gaffney for Automated Door Ways Inc. PROBLEM: The case number is not stated on the claim PDF form. SOLUTION: The filer, Edward J. Gaffney for Automated Door Ways Inc. should make the following corrections: amend the claim to include the claim number on the PDF document.
395
08/19/2013
Agreed Order Resolving Request for Additional Adequate Assurance Made by Baldwin EMC (Related Doc #262) Signed on 8/19/2013.
396
08/19/2013
Motion to Set a Determination Hearing on Request for Additional Adequate Assurance Made by Alabama Gas Corporation Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
397
08/20/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [8/20/13 10:00 AM] Run Time [00:07:36] File Size [ 7.2 MB] RE: Doc #362; Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Personal Property Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims & Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief
398
08/20/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 396 Motion to Set a Determination Hearing on Request for Additional Adequate Assurance Made by Alabama Gas Corporation).
400
08/20/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 396 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/3/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
401
08/20/2013
Agreed Order on Decatur Coca-Cola Bottling Company's (I) Conditional Objection to Debtor's Motion Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free and Clear of Liens and (II) Emergency Motion for Relief From Stay Signed on 8/20/2013 (RE: related document(s) 280 Objection filed by Creditor Decatur Coca-Cola Botting Company). (scm) Modified on 8/21/201 to remove Order which was incorrectly attached as a Supplement. Order re-docketed correctly as entry #404
402
08/20/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by E.B. Harrison Willis Filed by Creditors Sandra Beard, James Beard. (Willis, E.B.)
403
08/21/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Andrew Todd Darwin Filed by Creditor 4324 Lillian Hwy LLC c/o Waterstone Southeast Holding Company LLC.
08/21/2013
Corrective Entry - Deleted Order which was was incorrectly attached as a Supplement and re-docketed as a separate order (RE: related document(s) 401 Order (Blank)). (Text entry; no document attached.)
404
08/20/2013
Order Supplementing This Court's Order on the Debtor's Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363(B) and (C) for Authorization to Continue the Debtor's Insurance Policies and Workers' Compensation Programs, All Agreements Relating Thereto, and Pay All Obligations in Respect Thereof Signed on 8/20/2013 (RE: related document(s) 42 Order).
405
08/21/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 395 Order on Motion). Notice Date 08/21/2013.
406
08/21/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 394 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/21/2013.
407
08/22/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 401 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 08/22/2013.
408
08/22/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 400 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/22/2013.
409
08/23/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Judson Eric Crump Filed by Creditor S & P of Macon, Inc.
410
08/23/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 341 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) Filed by Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C.
411
08/23/2013
Order Authorizing and Approving Debtor's Sale of Certain Personal Property Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 362) Signed on 8/23/2013.
412
08/23/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 404 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 08/23/2013.
413
08/25/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 411 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 08/25/2013.
414
08/26/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 410 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C.). Hearing scheduled 9/3/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
415
08/26/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joseph D. Frank Filed by Creditors Frito-Lay North America, Inc., Bottling Group, LLC, operating collectively with affiliates and their subsidiaries as Pepsi Beverages Company.
416
08/26/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John P Kreis Filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC.
417
08/26/2013
Debtor-In-Posession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 7/1/2013 - 7/27/2013 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
418
08/27/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #117 filed by The OgleThorpe Echo, Inc. PROBLEM: The creditor has not included a Proof of Claim form. SOLUTION: The filer, The OgleThorpe Echo, Inc. should make the following corrections: Please file an Amended Claim #117 and include a completed claim form. The form may be found at www.uscourts.gov. You will need to go to Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I - Official Forms, Form B 10. (mmb) Modified on 8/27/2013
419
08/27/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #119 filed by Pollard Milling Co., Inc. PROBLEM: The creditor has not included a Proof of Claim form. SOLUTION: Please file an Amended Claim #119 and include a completed claim form. The form may be found at www.uscourts.gov. You will need to go to Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I - Official Forms, Form B 10.
420
08/27/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #120 filed by Coca Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. PROBLEM: The creditor has noted the incorrect case number on the claim form. SOLUTION: The filer, Coca Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. should make the following corrections: Please file an Amended Claim #120 to include the correct case number on the claim form.
421
08/28/2013
Amended Order Establishing Procedures for Filing Requests for Payment of 11 U.S.C. §503(b)(9) Administrative Expenses, Including Setting a Bar Date for Filing Requests Signed on 8/28/2013 (RE: related document(s) 361 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC).
422
08/28/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nicholas W. Whittenburg Filed by Creditor Bright-Meyers Dublin Associates, L.P.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
423
08/28/2013
Affidavit Notice of Affidavit of William W. Simmons, Member of Glover, Young, Walton & Simmons, PLLC Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
424
08/28/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Bright-Meyers Dublin Associates, L.P.
1
Exhibit A, part 1 #
2
Exhibit A, part 2 #
3
Exhibit A, part 3 #
4
Exhibit B, part 1 #
5
Exhibit B, part 2 #
6
Exhibit B, part 3 #
7
Exhibit C
7 Attachments
425
08/28/2013
Notice to Creditors Notice of Cure Schedule.
426
08/28/2013
Amended Notice to Creditors Amended Notice of Cure Schedule.
427
08/28/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 414 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/28/2013.
428
08/29/2013
Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Signed on 8/29/2013 (RE: related document(s) 313 Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion for an Order Setting Bar Date for Filing Claims filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe). Proofs of Claims due by 10/29/2013.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/29/2013.
429
08/29/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice-Nicholas W. Whittenburg (Related Doc # 422) Signed on 8/29/2013.
08/29/2013
Corrective Entry - Notice regenerated to send copy of order to all parties and creditors (RE: related document(s) 428 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim). (Text entry; no document attached.)
430
08/29/2013
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 264) Signed on 8/29/2013.
431
08/29/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY REGARDING A CLAIM - Pdf of Claim #131 reattached to allow for claim and attachments to be in portait orientation
432
08/29/2013
Application to Employ Barfield, Murphy, Shank & Smith LLC as Accountant for Debtor Debtor's Application to Employ Barfield, Murphy, Shank & Smith LLC as Ordinary Course Professional Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
433
08/29/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Lisa Peters (Re Item:309 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601046092 (RE: related document(s) 309 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC).
434
08/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 418 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/29/2013.
435
08/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 419 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/29/2013.
436
08/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 420 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 08/29/2013.
437
08/30/2013
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Motion for Approval of Agreed Stipulation by and between Debtor and Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Delivery of and Payment for Certain Goods Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
438
08/30/2013
Bankruptcy Administrator's Recommendation Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe (RE: related document(s) 432 Application to Employ Barfield, Murphy, Shank & Smith LLC as Accountant for Debtor Debtor's Application to Employ Barfield, Murphy, Shank & Smith LLC as Ordinary Course Professional Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC).
439
08/30/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 426 Notice to Creditors).
440
08/30/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 421 Amended Order). Notice Date 08/30/2013.
441
08/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 428 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim). Notice Date 08/31/2013.
442
08/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 429 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 08/31/2013.
443
08/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 430 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 08/31/2013.
444
09/03/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [9/3/13 10:44 AM] Run Time [00:08:36] File Size [ 8.1 MB] RE: Doc #234; Motion for Allowance and Payment of 503(b)(9) Administrative Claim in the amount of $22,094.32 filed by Electronic Imaging Services, Inc d/b/a Vestcom Retail Solutions
446
09/03/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #396; Debtor's Motion to Set a Determination Hearing on Request for Additional Adequate Assurance made by Alabama Gas Corporation) Hearing scheduled 09/24/2013 at 10:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
447
09/03/2013
Order Approving Application to Employ (Related Doc # 432) Signed on 9/3/2013.
448
09/03/2013
Amendment to Order (A) Approving Bid Procedures Relating to Sale of Certain of the Debtor's Assets; (B) Scheduling a Hearing to Consider the Sale; (C) Establishing Notice and Procedures Related to the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Contracts and Leases; and (D) Granting Related Relief Signed on 9/3/2013 (RE: related document(s) 331 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b), 410 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C.).
449
09/03/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #147 filed by Doris Haralson, creditor. PROBLEM: Creditor has not completed the claim form correctly on the top portion of the claim form with the debtor's name and case number and creditor's name and address. SOLUTION: The filer, Doris Haralson, creditor should make the following corrections: Creditor should file an amended proof of claim #147 with the correct information in the proper fields.
450
09/03/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Creditor Microsoft Corporation
451
09/04/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice-Maria Milano (Related Doc # 450) Signed on 9/4/2013.
452
09/05/2013
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Movant Donna Landis
453
09/05/2013
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Movant Donna Landis
09/05/2013
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(13-81963-JAC11) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15590547. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 453) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
454
09/05/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Papers by Maria Ann Milano Filed by Creditor Microsoft Corporation.
455
09/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 447 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 09/05/2013.
456
09/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 448 Amended Order). Notice Date 09/05/2013.
457
09/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 449 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/05/2013.
458
09/06/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #396; Debtor's Motion to Set a Determination Hearing on Request for Additional Adequate Assurance made by Alabama Gas Corporation) Hearing scheduled 09/18/2013 at 10:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
459
09/06/2013
Amended Notice to Creditors Notice of Amended Cure Schedule (RE: related document(s) 426 Amended Notice to Creditors Amended Notice of Cure Schedule.).
460
09/06/2013
Agreed Order Allowing Request of Vestcom Retail Solutions for Allowance and Payment of Section 503(b)(9) Administrative Claim Signed on 9/6/2013 (RE: related document(s) 234 Request filed by Creditor Electronic Imaging Services, Inc. d/b/a Vestcom Retail).
461
09/06/2013
Order Signed on 9/6/2013.
462
09/06/2013
Notice to Creditors Notice of Itemized Statement of Results of Sale of Personal Property (RE: related document(s) 411 Order Authorizing and Approving Debtor's Sale of Certain Personal Property Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief (Related Doc 362) Signed on 8/23/2013. (mmb)).
463
09/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 460 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 09/08/2013.
464
09/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 461 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 09/08/2013.
465
09/09/2013
Order/Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s) 452 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Movant Donna Landis, 453 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Movant Donna Landis). Incomplete Filings due by 9/23/2013.
466
09/09/2013
Interim Application for Compensation for The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1/2013 to 8/31/2013, Fee: $280,000.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Financial Advisor The Food Partners, LLC
467
09/09/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 466 Interim Application for Compensation for The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1/2013 to 8/31/2013, Fee: $280,000.00, Expenses: $0.00.).
468
09/10/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark P. Williams Filed by Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Thomasville, LLC.
469
09/10/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark P. Williams Filed by Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Tuscaloosa, LLC.
470
09/10/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark P. Williams Filed by Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Villa Rica, LLC.
471
09/10/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark P. Williams Filed by Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC.
472
09/10/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark P. Williams Filed by Interested Party Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC.
473
09/10/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY duplicate motion filed in error Filed by Movant Donna Landis (RE: related document(s) 452 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176,).
474
09/10/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark P. Williams Filed by Interested Party Derst Baking Company, LLC.
475
09/10/2013
Motion to Withdraw document 452 Filed by Movant Donna Landis
476
09/10/2013
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Dan Burton, attorney for Donna Landis, has docketed a "Motion to Withdraw" rather than a "Notice of Withdrawal" when filing the Motion to Withdraw the Motion for Relief filed incorrectly. SOLUTION: The filer, Dan Burton, attorney for Donna Landis, should restyle the pleading as a Notice of Withdrawal and re-file using the event found at Bankruptcy>Notices>Notice of Dismissal/Withdrawal of a Document. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 475 Motion to Withdraw filed by Movant Donna Landis).
477
09/10/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 466 Application for Compensation). Hearing scheduled 10/8/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
478
09/10/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #183 filed by Stephanie Artnak, for Catalog Sales Div of Maplehurts Bakeries. PROBLEM: The claim form is not dated. SOLUTION: The filer, Stephanie Artnak, for Catalog Sales Div of Maplehurts Bakeries should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #183 to include the date in the appropriate box beside the signature.
479
09/10/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #186 filed by Danny Snow, Creditor. PROBLEM: Claim form is not dated. SOLUTION: The filer, Danny Snow, Creditor should make the following corrections: Please file an Amended Claim #186 to include a date in the appropriate box next to the signature.
480
09/10/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #188 filed by Spanish Fort Water System. PROBLEM: The claim form is not dated. SOLUTION: The filer, Spanish Fort Water System should make the following corrections: Please file an Amended Claim #188 to include a date in the appropriate box next to the signature
481
09/10/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #190 filed by Coca-Cola Meridian. PROBLEM: The creditor's name and the debtor's name are not in the correct boxes on the claim form. SOLUTION: The filer, Coca-Cola Meridian should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #190 to place the creditor's name and debtor's name in the appropriate boxes.
482
09/11/2013
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 452 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Movant Donna Landis).
483
09/11/2013
Motion to Approve Abandonment of Certain Personal Property Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
484
09/11/2013
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Donna Landis (RE: related document(s) 453 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Movant Donna Landis). Hearing scheduled 9/18/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
485
09/11/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Movant Donna Landis (RE: related document(s) 453 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176,).
486
09/11/2013
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditor BBVA Compass c/o Ascension Capital Group
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
487
09/11/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 483 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/18/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
488
09/11/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 424 Objection filed by Creditor Bright-Meyers Dublin Associates, L.P.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
489
09/11/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #209 filed by Yardsman Lawn Service LLC. PROBLEM: A claim form was not filed with invoice copies. SOLUTION: The filer, Yardsman Lawn Service LLC, should make the following corrections: A claim form should be filed. The form may be found at www.uscourts.gov. Please go to Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B 10. Please mark the claim as Amended Claim #209.
490
09/11/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 465 Notice of Deficient Filing). Notice Date 09/11/2013.
491
09/12/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Movant Donna Landis (RE: related document(s) 453 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176,).
492
09/12/2013
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by BBVA Compass (RE: related document(s) 486 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor BBVA Compass c/o Ascension Capital Group). Hearing scheduled 9/18/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
493
09/12/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 459 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor Nalley-Garrett Cochran, LLC
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
494
09/12/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #217 filed by A-Lign Security. PROBLEM: Creditor representative filed the claim without a dating the form in the section provided. SOLUTION: The filer, A-Lign Security should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #217 to include a date next to the signature box.
495
09/12/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 477 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/12/2013.
496
09/12/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 478 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/12/2013.
497
09/12/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 479 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/12/2013.
498
09/12/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 480 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/12/2013.
499
09/12/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 481 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/12/2013.
500
09/13/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 459 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor John White-Spunner
501
09/13/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 459 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor Northside, Ltd.
502
09/13/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 459 Notice to Creditors, 493 Objection filed by Creditor Nalley-Garrett Cochran, LLC, 500 Objection filed by Creditor John White-Spunner, 501 Objection filed by Creditor Northside, Ltd.). Hearing scheduled 9/18/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
503
09/13/2013
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 459 Notice to Creditors, 493 Objection filed by Creditor Nalley-Garrett Cochran, LLC, 500 Objection filed by Creditor John White-Spunner, 501 Objection filed by Creditor Northside, Ltd.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
504
09/13/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 483 Motion to Approve Abandonment of Certain Personal Property filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor BBVA Compass c/o Ascension Capital Group
505
09/13/2013
Statement Reservation of Rights of C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. Regarding Claim for Reimbursement Under 11 U.S.C. 503(b)(9) Filed by Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
506
09/13/2013
Amended Notice to Creditors Notice of Amended Cure Schedule (RE: related document(s) 459 Amended Notice to Creditors Notice of Amended Cure Schedule (RE: related document(s) 426 Amended Notice to Creditors Amended Notice of Cure Schedule.).).
507
09/13/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 504 Objection filed by Creditor BBVA Compass c/o Ascension Capital Group). Hearing scheduled 9/18/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
508
09/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by J Leland Murphree Filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP.
509
09/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jayna Partain Lamar Filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP.
510
09/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Patrick Darby Filed by Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V. (Darby)
511
09/13/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Compass Bank.
512
09/13/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC. 426 Notice to Creditors, 459 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditors Cullman Shopping Center, Inc., MRPM Cullman Services, LLC.
1
Exhibit A, Part 1 #
2
Exhibit A, part 2 #
3
Exhibit A, part 3 #
4
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018125982342'>4</a> Exhibit B and C) Related document(s) Modified on 9/16/2013 to remove docket entry relationship to #362 and add relationship to #221 per corrective entry
4 Attachments
513
09/13/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 487 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/13/2013.
514
09/13/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 484 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 09/13/2013.
515
09/13/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 489 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/13/2013.
516
09/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 492 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 09/14/2013.
517
09/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 494 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/14/2013.
518
09/15/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 502 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/15/2013.
519
09/15/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 503 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/15/2013.
520
09/16/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #223 filed by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. PROBLEM: The filer has filed a claim or claim attachments not in an upright position. SOLUTION: The filer, Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc, should AMEND the claim scanning it in the portrait orientation.
521
09/16/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY REGARDING A CLAIM - Edited claim #120 by Coca Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. to attach correct pdf of claim.
522
09/05/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Nicholas W. Whittenburg (Re Item:422 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601046564 (RE: related document(s) 422 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Bright-Meyers Dublin Associates, L.P.).
523
09/11/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Maria Milano (Re Item:450 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601046755 (RE: related document(s) 450 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Microsoft Corporation).
09/12/2013
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(13-81963-JAC11) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15617400. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 486) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
524
09/16/2013
Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions Randolph M. Fowler (Objection to Cure Amount) Filed by Interested Party Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC.
525
09/16/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Objection should be associated with Doc 221 instead of Doc 362 Filed by Creditors Cullman Shopping Center, Inc., MRPM Cullman Services, LLC (RE: related document(s) 512 Objection).
526
09/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jackson E Duncan III Filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC.
527
09/16/2013
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Randolph Fowler, attorney for Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC, has used the incorrect event when filing the Objection to Cure Amount. SOLUTION: The filer, Randolph Fowler, attorney for Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC, should re-file the pleading using the event found at Bankruptcy>Answer/Response>Reference an Existing motion/application. Please select Objection from the Available Events. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 524 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions filed by Interested Party Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC).
528
09/16/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 512 Objection filed by Creditor MRPM Cullman Services, LLC, Creditor Cullman Shopping Center, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
529
09/16/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 506 Notice to Creditors). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
530
09/16/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 426 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor Cloverdale Station, Inc.
531
09/16/2013
First Application for Compensation for Burr & Forman LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 7/1/2013 to 8/31/2013, Fee: $552,210.75, Expenses: $9,848.61. Filed by Attorney Burr & Forman LLP
532
09/16/2013
Debtor-In-Posession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 7/28/2013 - 8/24/2013 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
533
09/17/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 530 Objection filed by Creditor Cloverdale Station, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
534
09/17/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 531 Application for Compensation). Hearing scheduled 10/8/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
535
09/17/2013
Amended Objection to (related document(s): 506 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor Northside, Ltd.
536
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 426 Notice to Creditors, 459 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC
1
Index 1 - part A #
2
Exhibit 1 - part B #
3
Exhibit 2 #
4
Exhibit 3 #
5
Exhibit 4 - part A #
6
Exhibit 4 - part B
6 Attachments
537
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 426 Notice to Creditors, 506 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
1 Attachment
538
09/17/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 535 Amended Objection filed by Creditor Northside, Ltd.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
539
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 425 Notice to Creditors)- Limited Objection - Filed by Creditors Meridian Energy Group, LLC, Spina Marketing Services, Inc.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B #
3
Exhibit C #
4
Exhibit D #
5
Exhibit E #
6
Exhibit F #
7
Exhibit G #
8
Exhibit H #
9
Exhibit I #
10
Exhibit J
10 Attachments
540
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 506 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Interested Party Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC
541
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 426 Notice to Creditors, 459 Notice to Creditors) of Amended Cure Schedule Filed by Creditor S & L Mechanical, Inc.
542
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 506 Notice to Creditors)of Amended Cure Schedule Filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC
543
09/17/2013
Statement Objection and Reservation of Rights of Southern Family Markets LLC Regarding Amended Cure Schedule Filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC.
544
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 459 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC
545
09/17/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 459 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC
546
09/18/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 536 Objection filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC, 537 Objection filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC, 539 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC, 540 Objection filed by Interested Party Wright/Hurd Properties, LLC, 541 Objection filed by Creditor S & L Mechanical, Inc., 542 Objection filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC, 543 Statement filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC, 544 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC, 545 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
547
09/18/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [9/18/13 10:00 AM] Run Time [00:11:16] File Size [ 10.6 MB] RE: Doc #396; Debtor's Motion to Set a Determination Hearing on Request for Additional Adequate Assurance made by Alabama Gas Corporation
549
09/18/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 531 First Application for Compensation for Burr & Forman LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 7/1/2013 to 8/31/2013, Fee: $552,210.75, Expenses: $9,848.61.).
550
09/18/2013
Consent Order Lifting Automatic Stay (Related Doc # 453) Signed on 9/18/2013.
551
09/18/2013
Motion to Modify the Post-Petition Debtor-In-Possession Financing Budget Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
552
09/18/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 520 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 09/18/2013.
553
09/19/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditors Meridian Energy Group, LLC, Spina Marketing Services, Inc.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B #
3
Exhibit C #
4
Exhibit D #
5
Exhibit E #
6
Exhibit F #
7
Exhibit G #
8
Exhibit H #
9
Exhibit I #
10
Exhibit J
10 Attachments
554
09/19/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 553 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
555
09/19/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
556
09/19/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC
557
09/19/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC
558
09/19/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 534 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/19/2013.
559
09/20/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 551 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
560
09/20/2013
Supplement Filed by Creditors Meridian Energy Group, LLC, Spina Marketing Services, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 553 Objection).
561
09/20/2013
Supplemental Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 310 Objection filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC) Filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC
562
09/20/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 555 Objection filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC, 556 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC, 557 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC, 561 Objection filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
563
09/20/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC)- Notice of Materialmen's Lien, and Limited Objection to Debtor's Sale Motion Filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
564
09/20/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP
565
09/20/2013
Statement Objection and Reservation of Rights of Southern Family Markets LLC Regarding Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC.
1
Master Service List
1 Attachment
566
09/20/2013
Motion (I) for Approval of Consensual Termination of a Non-Residential Real Property Lease, and (II) for Authority to Enter into Non-Residential Real Property Subleases Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
567
09/20/2013
Notice to Creditors Notice of Selection of Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. as the Stalking Horse Bidder for the Purchase of Certain of Debtor's Assets.
568
09/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 550 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 09/20/2013.
569
09/22/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 559 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/22/2013.
570
09/23/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 563 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., 564 Objection filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP, 565 Statement filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
571
09/23/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 566 Motion (I) for Approval of Consensual Termination of a Non-Residential Real Property Lease, and (II) for Authority to Enter into Non-Residential Real Property Subleases, 567 Notice to Creditors).
572
09/23/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #264 filed by A-lign Security. PROBLEM: Creditor filed a claim without an amount in Section 3 of the Proof of Claim form. SOLUTION: The filer, A-lign Security should make the following corrections: Please file an Amended Proof of Claim #264 to include the amount claimed in Section 3 of the form.
573
09/23/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 566 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
09/23/2013
Motion for Relief from Stay(13-81963-JAC11) [motion,mrlfsty] Filed In Duplicate. Filing Fee Not Due (re:Doc452) (kdh) Modified on 9/23/2013 (Text entry; no document attached.)
574
09/24/2013
Letter Filed by Custom Cleaning Solutions, LLC regarding invalid address deletion.
575
09/24/2013
Objection to (related document(s): Related document(s) 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC. Filed by John Kreis, attorney for Gershman Properties, LLC. Modified on 9/24/2013 to relate to docket #221 instead of #276
576
09/24/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John W Jennings Jr Filed by Creditor Rainbow Plaza Assoc., LTD.
1
Matrix Part 3 #
2
Matrix Part 2
2 Attachments
577
09/24/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 567 Notice to Creditors)(Limited Objection to Proposed Asset Purchase Agreement with Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.) Filed by Creditor Gulf Market Development, LLC
578
09/24/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #209 filed by Cyrus Noel Allen on behalf of Yardsman Lawn Service. PROBLEM: Creditor has not correctly completed the claim form with the debtor's name and case number on the top portion of the form. SOLUTION: The filer, Cyrus Noel Allen on behalf of Yardsman Lawn Service, should make the following corrections: Please file an Amended Claim #209 to correctly state the debtor's name and case number in the appropriate box on the top portion of the form.
579
09/24/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 575 Objection filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
580
09/24/2013
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, John Kreis, Attorney for Gershman Properties, LLC, has dated the pleading and certificate of service for the incorrect date and has possibly related the objection to the incorrect docket event when filing the Objection and Reservation of Rights of Gershman Properties, LLC Concerning Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. SOLUTION: The filer, John Kreis, Attorney for Gershman Properties, LLC, should should verify the correct motion to relate the objection to and refile the objection with the correct date of pleading and certificate of service. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 575 Objection filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC).
581
09/24/2013
Supplemental Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 567 Notice to Creditors) Filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC
582
09/24/2013
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Date of Pleading & Cert of Service dated today rather than September 25 2013 & should be related to docket No 221 Filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC (RE: related document(s) 575 Objection).
583
09/25/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 567 Notice to Creditors, 577 Objection filed by Creditor Gulf Market Development, LLC, 581 Objection filed by Creditor Gulfdale Improvements, LLC). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
584
09/25/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #267 filed by Adams Milling Company. PROBLEM: The creditor did not submit a Proof of Claim form with invoice information. SOLUTION: The filer, Adams Milling Company should make the following corrections: Creditor should complete a B10 Proof of Claim Form and mark the claim as Amended Claim #267. The Claim form may be found at www.uscourts.gov. Please go to Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I, Form B10. Please also insure that the debtor's name and creditor's name are in the appropriate fields on the form, that the claim form is signed and dated, and all other appropriate information is included on the form before sending to the court for filing.
585
09/25/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Limited Objection, Response, and Reservation of Rights of McCormick & Company, Inc., and Its Subsidiaries and Affiliates, Including Zatarain's, Inc. in Response to Debtor's Motion for Entry of Orders Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 363 and 365 Filed by Creditor McCormick & Company, Inc.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
586
09/25/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 573 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/25/2013.
587
09/25/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 572 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/25/2013.
588
09/26/2013
Affidavit in Support of Limited Objection to Proposed Asset Purchase Agreement Filed by Creditor Gulf Market Development, LLC (RE: related document(s) 577 Objection).
589
09/26/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 585 Objection filed by Creditor McCormick & Company, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
590
09/26/2013
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 424 Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Bright-Meyers Dublin Associates, L.P.
591
09/26/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark D Griffin Filed by Creditor STATE OF ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE.
592
09/26/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John K. Cunningham Filed by Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
593
09/26/2013
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Kevin M. McGill Filed by Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
594
09/26/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 567 Notice to Creditors) (Objection to Proposed Assignee of Lease for Store No. 334) Filed by Creditor Northside, Ltd.
595
09/26/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 594 Objection filed by Creditor Northside, Ltd.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
596
09/26/2013
Response to (Re Item: 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) and Reservation of Rights Filed by Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V. (Darby)
597
09/26/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice-John K. Cunningham (Related Doc # 592) Signed on 9/26/2013.
598
09/26/2013
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice-Kevin M. McGill (Related Doc # 593) Signed on 9/26/2013.
599
09/26/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 596 Response filed by Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
600
09/26/2013
Response to (Re Item: 560 Supplement filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC, 563 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc.) Debtor's Response to Spina Marketing Services, Inc. and Meridian Energy Group, LLC's Claim of an Equitable Lien and Mechanic's Lien on Certain Assets Owned by the Debtor Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
601
09/26/2013
Supplemental Objection to (related document(s): 221 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Motion For Entry Of Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363 and 365: (I)(A) Authorizing And Approving The Sale Of Certain Retail Stores Free And Clear Of All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances, filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP
602
09/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 578 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/26/2013.
603
09/27/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 600 Response filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 601 Objection filed by Creditor Riverchase Lorna LP). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
604
09/27/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [9/27/13 11:29 AM] Run Time [01:07:15] File Size [ 63.2 MB] RE: Doc #221; Debtor's Motion for Entry of Orders Authorizing & Approving the Sale of Certain Retail Stores Free & Clear of Liens and Authorizing the Assumption & Assignment of Certain Real Property Leases
605
09/27/2013
Order Approving Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) (Related Doc # 221) Signed on 9/27/2013.
1
Exhibit A-1 #
2
Exhibit A-2 #
3
Exhibit A-3 #
4
Exhibit A-4 #
5
Exhibit A-5 #
6
Exhibit A-6 #
7
Exhibit A-7 #
8
Exhibit A-8 #
9
Exhibit A-9 #
10
Exhibit B #
11
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018126085285'>11</a> Exhibit C)
11 Attachments
606
09/27/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 584 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 09/27/2013.
607
09/28/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 597 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 09/28/2013.
608
09/28/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 598 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 09/28/2013.
609
09/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 09/29/2013.
610
09/30/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #274 filed by ECUA. PROBLEM: Creditor did not include the second page of the claim form which includes a signature and date. SOLUTION: The filer, ECUA should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #274 to include all pages of claim form. Please mark the claim as "amended claim #274".
612
10/02/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 610 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 10/02/2013.
613
10/03/2013
Order Approving Modification of the Post-Petition Debtor-In-Possession Financing Budget (Related Doc #551) Signed on 10/3/2013.
614
10/03/2013
Order Granting Motion to Approve Abandonment of Certain Personal Property filed by Debtor (Related Doc #483), Granting Motion For Relief From Stay filed by BBVA Compass (Related Doc # 486) Signed on 10/3/2013.
615
10/04/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #284 filed by City of Mobile. PROBLEM: The filer has filed a claim or claim attachments not in an upright position. SOLUTION: The filer, City of Mobile, should AMEND the claim scanning it in the portrait orientation.
616
10/05/2013
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract, Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
617
10/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 613 Order on Motion). Notice Date 10/05/2013.
618
10/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 614 Order on Motion). Notice Date 10/05/2013.
619
10/06/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 615 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 10/06/2013.
620
10/07/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 616 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract). Hearing scheduled 10/8/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
621
10/07/2013
Motion to Extend Time Motion for Entry of an Order Purusant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105 and 365 Granting a Ninety Day Extension of Debtor's Time Within Which to Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of NonResidential Real Property Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
622
10/07/2013
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC.
623
10/07/2013
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 616 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract, Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract). Hearing scheduled 10/8/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
624
10/07/2013
Motion to Quash ASSOCIATED WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC.'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM TO QUASH HPA NORTHRIDGE LLC'S SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
626
10/08/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [10/8/13 10:42 AM] Run Time [00:25:14] File Size [ 23.7 MB] RE: Doc #531; First Interim Application for Payment of Professional Fees filed by Burr & Forman, LLP, attorneys for the Debtor in Possession, in the amount of $552,210.75 Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses in the amount of $9.848.61
628
10/08/2013
Order Approving Application For Compensation (Related Doc#466) for The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor, Fees awarded: $280,000.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 10/8/2013 Signed on 10/8/2013.
629
10/08/2013
Order Approving Application For Compensation (Related Doc#531) for Burr & Forman LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 7/1/2013 to 8/31/2013, Fees awarded: $552,210.75, Expenses awarded: $9,848.61; Awarded on 10/8/2013 Signed on 10/8/2013.
630
10/08/2013
Motion for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
631
10/08/2013
Order Extending Debtor's Time Within Which to Assume or Reject Leases of NonResidential Real Property (Related Doc # 621) Signed on 10/8/2013.
632
10/09/2013
Motion to Withdraw Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum to Quash HPA Northridge LLC's Subpoena to Produce Documents Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
633
10/09/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 630 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 10/10/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
634
10/09/2013
Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to §§ 105 and 363 Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Certain Real Property Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
635
10/09/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Kevin M. McGill (Re Item:593 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601047166 (RE: related document(s) 593 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V.).
636
10/09/2013
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by John Cunningham (Re Item:592 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601047165 (RE: related document(s) 592 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Interested Party Koninklijke Ahold N.V.).
637
10/09/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 634 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 10/17/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
639
10/10/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [10/10/13 9:57 AM] Run Time [00:11:01] File Size [ 10.3 MB] RE: Doc #630; Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases
640
10/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 628 Order on Application for Compensation filed by Financial Advisor The Food Partners, LLC). Notice Date 10/10/2013.
641
10/10/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 629 Order on Application for Compensation). Notice Date 10/10/2013.
642
10/11/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 437 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 10/17/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
643
10/11/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 631 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 10/11/2013.
644
10/11/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 637 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/11/2013.
645
10/13/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 642 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/13/2013.
646
10/15/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) (Motion to Amend Cure Amount) Filed by Creditor Gulf Market Development, LLC
1
Affidavit Affidavit of Teresa Boyett #
2
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 1 #
3
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 2 #
4
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 3 #
5
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 4 #
6
Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Store 306 Cure Charges
6 Attachments
647
10/15/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) (Motion to Amend Cure Amount) Filed by Creditor John White-Spunner
1
Affidavit Affidavit of Jackie Hutchinson #
2
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 1 #
3
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 2 #
4
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 3 #
5
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 4 #
6
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 5 #
7
Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Store 309 Cure Amounts)
7 Attachments
648
10/15/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) (Motion to Amend Cure Amount) Filed by Creditor Tuttle Papock Springhill, LLC
1
Affidavit Affidavit of Teresa T. Boyett #
2
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 1 #
3
Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Lease) Part 2 #
4
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 3 #
5
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 4 #
6
Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Store 323 Cure Charges)
6 Attachments
649
10/15/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) (Motion to Amend Cure Amount) Filed by Creditor Mobile Partners
1
Affidavit Affidavit of Bill Cooper #
2
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 1 #
3
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 2 #
4
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 3 #
5
Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Store 339 Cure Charges)
5 Attachments
650
10/15/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) (Motion to Amend Cure Amount) Filed by Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C.
1
Affidavit Affidavit of Dawn Collum #
2
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 1 #
3
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 2 #
4
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 3 #
5
Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Lease) Part 4 #
6
Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Store 337 Cure Charges)
6 Attachments
651
10/15/2013
Agreed Order Amending Exhibit to Order Dated September 27, 2013. Signed on 10/15/2013 (RE: related document(s) 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)).
652
10/15/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 646 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Creditor Gulf Market Development, LLC, 647 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Creditor John White-Spunner, 648 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Creditor Tuttle Papock Springhill, LLC, 649 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Creditor Mobile Partners, 650 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Creditor Saraland Loop Road,L.L.C.). Hearing scheduled 10/22/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
653
10/15/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #302 filed by United Refrigeration, Inc. PROBLEM: The creditor has the parties listed incorrectly on the Proof of Claim Form B10. Creditor has debtor's name and creditor's name reversed on the form. SOLUTION: The filer, United Refrigeration, Inc. should make the following corrections: please file an amended claim #302 to indicate the parties correctly on the form.
654
10/16/2013
Agreed Order Resolving Request for Additional Adequate Assurance Made by Alabama Gas Corporation (Related Doc #396) Signed on 10/16/2013.
655
10/16/2013
Joint Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) Joint Motion of Debtor and AGW for Approval of Amendment to Asset Purchase Agreement and Sale Order Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
656
10/16/2013
Motion to Extend Time Debtor's Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing a Proof of Claim for Zenith American Solutions and the United Food and Commercial Workers International Union - Industry Pension Fund Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
657
10/16/2013
Debtor-In-Posession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 8/25/2013 - 9/28/2013 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
658
10/16/2013
Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement for Period: 7/1/2013 - 9/30/2013; Fee Amount $30,000.00 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
10/16/2013
Receipt of Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement(13-81963-JAC11) [misc,qfeerpt] (30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15774267. Fee Amount 30000.00 (re:Doc# 658) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
659
10/17/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [10/17/13 9:57 AM] Run Time [01:00:41] File Size [ 57.0 MB] RE: Doc #437; Debtor's Motion for Approval of Agreed Stipulation by and between Debtor and Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. for Delivery of and Payment for Certain Goods
661
10/17/2013
Order Extending Deadline to File Proof of Claim for creditors, Zenith American Solutions and the United Food and Commercial Workers International Union - Industry Pension Fund. Deadline set for 11/18/13. (Related Doc # 656) Signed on 10/17/2013.
662
10/17/2013
Supplemental Order Amending (1) The Asset Purchase Agreement By and Between Belle Foods, LLC and Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. and (2) The September 27, 2013 Sale Order (Related Doc # 655) Signed on 10/17/2013.
663
10/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 651 Order (Blank)). Notice Date 10/17/2013.
664
10/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 652 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/17/2013.
665
10/17/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 653 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 10/17/2013.
666
10/18/2013
Response to (Re Item: 340 Order on Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC (Williams, R.)
667
10/18/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) Debtor's Motion for the Entry of an Order (I) Amending (A) the Asset Purchase Agreement by and between Belle Foods, LLC and Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. and (B) the September 27, 2013 Sale Order; and (II) Approving the Rejection of that Certain Contract by and between Debtor and McCormick & Company, Inc. Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
668
10/18/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 340 Order on Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Debtor's Motion to Modify the Final Dip Order Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
669
10/18/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 666 Response filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC, 668 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 10/18/2013 at 11:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
670
10/18/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 667 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 10/18/2013 at 11:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
671
10/18/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 553 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC, 560 Supplement filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC, 563 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 10/22/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
672
10/18/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [10/18/13 11:00 AM] Run Time [00:11:07] File Size [ 10.4 MB] RE: Doc #668; Debtor's Motion to Modify the Final DIP Order through and including the earlier of November 8, 2013 or the occurrence of the Effective Termination Date and Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral
673
10/18/2013
Order Approving Stipulation By And Between Debtor And Cal-Maine Foods, Inc. For Delivery Of And Payment For Certain Goods (Related Doc # 437) Signed on 10/18/2013.
674
10/18/2013
Modification of Final DIP Order (Related Doc # 668) Signed on 10/18/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018126232183'>1</a> Exhibit A)
1 Attachment
676
10/18/2013
Order Granting Motion To Amend and/or Alter (A) The Asset Purchase Agreement By and Between Belle Foods, LLC and Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. and (B) The September 27, 2013 Sale Order; And (II) Approving the Rejection of That Certain Contract By and Between Debtor and McCormick & Company, Inc.(Related Doc # 667) Signed on 10/18/2013.
677
10/18/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 654 Order on Motion). Notice Date 10/18/2013.
678
10/19/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 661 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 10/19/2013.
679
10/19/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 662 Order on Motion to Amend and/or Alter). Notice Date 10/19/2013.
680
10/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 673 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019). Notice Date 10/20/2013.
681
10/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 674 Order on Motion to Amend and/or Alter). Notice Date 10/20/2013.
682
10/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 676 Order on Motion to Amend and/or Alter). Notice Date 10/20/2013.
683
10/22/2013
Order (I) Approving Consensual Termination of a Non-Residential Real Property Lease, and (II) Granting Authority to Debtor to Enter Into Non-Residential Real Property Subleases (Related Doc #566) Signed on 10/22/2013.
1
https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/doc1/018126252025'>1</a> Exhibit A)
1 Attachment
685
10/22/2013
Order Overruling Signed on 10/22/2013 (RE: related document(s) 553 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC, 560 Supplement filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc., Creditor Meridian Energy Group, LLC, 563 Objection filed by Creditor Spina Marketing Services, Inc.).
686
10/22/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #322 filed by Wilson & Wilson Lawn Care. PROBLEM: Creditor has used the incorrect form for filing a proof of claim. SOLUTION: The filer, Wilson & Wilson Lawn Care should make the following corrections: Please re-file the claim using the correct form which may be found at www.uscourts.gov. Please go to Forms and Fees, then select Bankruptcy Forms, next select Part I Official Forms and select B10 - Proof of Claim form. Please file mark and file claim as amended claim #322.
687
10/23/2013
Order Authorizing and Approving Debtor's Sale of Certain Real Property Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and Granting Related Relief (Related Doc #634) Signed on 10/23/2013.
688
10/23/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [10/22/13 10:00 AM] Run Time [00:41:03] File Size [ 38.5 MB] RE: Doc #553; Objection by Spina Marketing Services, Inc. and Meridian Energy Group, LLC to Debtor's Sale Motion and Alternatively for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim
689
10/23/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David A Norris Filed by Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC.
690
10/23/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Taylor Allison Heck Filed by Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC.
691
10/23/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #324 filed by Paul Williams. PROBLEM: Claimant has not signed and dated the Proof of Claim form in the space provided. SOLUTION: The filer, Paul Williams should make the following corrections: Please file an Amended Proof of Claim to include signature and date. Please mark claim as Amended Claim #324 on the top right portion of the form.
692
10/23/2013
Amended Objection to (related document(s): 544 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC) Filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC
1
Exhibit Affidavit of Joel I. Beeler with attachments
1 Attachment
693
10/23/2013
Amended Answer (related document(s);545 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC) Filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC
1
Exhibit Affidavit of Joel I. Beeler
1 Attachment
694
10/24/2013
Application for Administrative Expenses Filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Lease #
2
Exhibit Exhibit A-2 Lease
2 Attachments
695
10/24/2013
Motion to Extend Time Debtor's Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing a Proof of Claim for Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Council Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC
696
10/24/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 692 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC, 693 Answer filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC, 694 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd.). Hearing scheduled 11/12/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
697
10/24/2013
Order Extending Deadline to File Proof of Claim as to creditor, Retail, Wholesale & Department Store Union, Mid-South Counsel. Deadline extended to 11/25/2013. (Related Doc # 695) Signed on 10/24/2013.
698
10/24/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 683 Order on Motion). Notice Date 10/24/2013.
699
10/24/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 685 Order Overruling). Notice Date 10/24/2013.
700
10/24/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 686 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 10/24/2013.
701
10/25/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 687 Order on Motion) Motion to Amend Sale Order to Reduce Purchase Price Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
702
10/25/2013
Motion to Establish Escrow Procedures Related to Asset Purchase Agreement Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
703
10/25/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 687 Order on Motion). Notice Date 10/25/2013.
704
10/25/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 691 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 10/25/2013.
705
10/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 697 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 10/26/2013.
706
10/26/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 696 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/26/2013.
707
10/28/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 701 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 702 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 10/28/2013 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
708
10/28/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #346 filed by Robert J. Mayo, Asst. Vice Pres. and /or David Anderson PROBLEM: Did not add amount of claim on form. SOLUTION: The filer, Robert J. Mayo, Asst. Vice Pres. should make the following corrections: File an amended claim with the claim amount included in the official form
709
10/28/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [10/28/13 10:11 AM] Run Time [01:08:00] File Size [ 63.8 MB] RE: Doc #701; Debtor's Motion to Amend and/or Alter Sale Order to Reduce Purchase Price of the Gadsden Real Property and improvements thereon by $20,000.00
711
10/28/2013
Order Approving Amendment of Sale Order to Reduce Purchase Price (Related Doc # 701) Signed on 10/28/2013.
712
10/29/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #344 of ACE American Insurance Company and #345 of Westchester Fire Insurance Company filed by David B. Anderson/Edward A. Mungiole, Jr. on behalf of ACE American Insurance and David B. Anders/Margery Reed on behalf of Westchester Fire Insurance Company. PROBLEM: The filers did not add amount of claims on form. SOLUTION: The filers should make the following corrections: Please file amended claims with the claim amounts included in the official form
713
10/29/2013
Request of creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC for Allowance and Payment of Section 503(b)(9) Administrative Claim Filed by Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC.
1
Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Todd Mueller with exhibits A and B
1 Attachment
714
10/29/2013
Report to Court Plan Update Report Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC. (Carson, D Christopher)
715
10/29/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 713 Request filed by Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC). Hearing scheduled 11/12/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
716
10/29/2013
Statement Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019 Filed by Creditors Lehmberg Crossing, LLC, Golden Flake Snack Foods, Inc.
717
10/30/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #392 filed by Lawrence B. Voit on behalf of Gulf Distributing & Allstate Beverage. PROBLEM: The filer has filed Supporting Documentation not in an upright position. SOLUTION: The filer, Lawrence B. Voit on behalf of Gulf Distributing & Allstate Beverage, should AMEND the Claim being sure to scan the Claim and all Supporting Documentation in the portrait orientation.
718
10/30/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #393 filed by Lawrence B. Volt, attorney for Goldring Gulf Distributing LLC. PROBLEM: The filer has filed a claim or claim attachments not in an upright position. SOLUTION: The filer, Lawrence B. Volt, attorney for Goldring Gulf Distributing LLC, should AMEND the claim scanning it in the portrait orientation.
719
10/30/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #396 filed by Jay R Bender, creditor representative. PROBLEM: The filer has filed a claim or claim attachments not in an upright position. SOLUTION: The filer, Jay R Bender, creditor representative, should AMEND the claim scanning it in the portrait orientation.
720
10/30/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Creditors Jeffrey Ashland, James Harris, Jacob Skousen, Johnathan Ogzewalla, and Scott Bayne by Shayana Boyd Davis Filed by Creditor Jeffrey Ashland.
721
10/30/2013
Statement Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019 Filed by Creditor Jeffrey Ashland.
722
10/30/2013
Motion to Set Bar Date for Certain Landlord Claims Determined After Sale Order Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
723
10/30/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 711 Order on Motion to Amend and/or Alter). Notice Date 10/30/2013.
724
10/30/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 708 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 10/30/2013.
725
10/31/2013
Order Approving Motion to Establish Escrows Related to Asset Purchase Agreement (Related Doc #702) Signed on 10/31/2013.
726
10/31/2013
First Supplemental Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases and Authorizing Debtor to Reject Certain Leases (Related Doc # 616) Signed on 10/31/2013.
727
10/31/2013
Second Supplemental Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases (Related Doc #630) Signed on 10/31/2013.
728
10/31/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 722 Motion filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 11/12/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
729
10/31/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #405 filed by Carey Otwell. PROBLEM: The claim has not been signed. SOLUTION: The filer, Carey Otwell should make the following corrections: Please file an amended claim #405 to include a signature.
730
10/31/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 722 Motion to Set Bar Date for Certain Landlord Claims Determined After Sale Order). (Carson, D Christopher)
731
10/31/2013
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtors Motion for an Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain Nonresidential Real Property Leases and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Lease Rejection Damage Claims Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
732
10/31/2013
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
733
10/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 715 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/31/2013.
734
10/31/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 712 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 10/31/2013.
735
11/01/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 731 Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, 732 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 11/5/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
736
11/01/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor S&H, LLC.
737
11/01/2013
Fourth Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Fourth Motion for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
738
11/01/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 732 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365). (Carson, D Christopher)
739
11/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 717 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 11/01/2013.
740
11/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 718 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 11/01/2013.
741
11/01/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 719 Notice of Incorrect Claim (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 11/01/2013.
742
11/02/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 725 Order on Motion). Notice Date 11/02/2013.
743
11/02/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 726 Order on Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 11/02/2013.
744
11/02/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 727 Order on Motion). Notice Date 11/02/2013.
745
11/02/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 728 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/02/2013.
746
11/02/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 729 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 11/02/2013.
747
11/03/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 735 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/03/2013.
748
11/04/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 737 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 11/5/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
749
11/04/2013
Certificate of Service Supplement to Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 722 Motion to Set Bar Date for Certain Landlord Claims Determined After Sale Order, 730 Certificate of Service). (Carson, D Christopher)
750
11/04/2013
Stipulation By Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC and Lenders Regarding Further Extension of Challenge Period. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC. (Williams, R.)
751
11/04/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #409 filed by Griffin Daily News. PROBLEM: Creditor has not included the amount of the claim on the form in the appropriate space provided. SOLUTION: The filer, Griffin Daily News should make the following corrections: Please file an amended Claim #409 to include the amount of the claim on the proper space provided.
752
11/04/2013
Withdrawal of Claims: 45,46. Filed by Curtis Blair, Revenue Commissioner of Pike County.
753
11/05/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [11/5/13 10:37 AM] Run Time [00:13:00] File Size [ 12.2 MB] RE: Doc #731; Debtor's Motion for an Order Approving Rejection of Certain NonResidential Real Property Leases and Setting a Bar Date for Lease Rejection Damage Claims
755
11/05/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 750 Stipulation). (Williams, R.)
756
11/06/2013
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain NonResidential Real Property Leases and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Lease Rejection Damage Claims (Related Doc # 731) Signed on 11/6/2013.
757
11/06/2013
Fourth Supplemental Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases (Related Doc # 737) Signed on 11/6/2013.
758
11/06/2013
Third Supplemental Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases (Related Doc # 732) Signed on 11/6/2013.
759
11/06/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 751 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 11/06/2013.
760
11/08/2013
Debtor-In-Posession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 9/29/2013 - 10/26/2013 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
761
11/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 756 Order on Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 11/08/2013.
762
11/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 757 Order on Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 11/08/2013.
763
11/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 758 Order on Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 11/08/2013.
764
11/11/2013
Stipulation By Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC and Lenders Regarding Further Extension of Challenge Period. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC. (Williams, R.)
765
11/12/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 764 Stipulation).
766
11/12/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [11/12/13 10:30 AM] Run Time [00:20:17] File Size [ 19.0 MB] RE: Doc #692; Objection to Debtor's Statement of Cure Amounts with Respect to Store #75 filed by HPA Northridge, LLC
768
11/12/2013
Order Signed on 11/12/2013 (RE: related document(s) 692 Objection filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC, 693 Answer filed by Interested Party HPA St. Francis, LLC).
769
11/12/2013
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney.
770
11/13/2013
Order Granting Motion to Set Bar Date for Certain Landlord Claims Determined After Sale Order (Related Doc #722) Signed on 11/13/2013.
771
11/14/2013
Notice of Resetting Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 694 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd., 713 Request filed by Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC). Hearing scheduled 12/2/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
772
11/14/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 770 Order on Motion). (Carson, D Christopher)
773
11/14/2013
Order Amending Cure List(Related Doc # 646, 647, 648, 649 and 650) Signed on 11/14/2013.
774
11/14/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 768 Order Overruling). Notice Date 11/14/2013.
775
11/15/2013
Stipulation By Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC and Lenders Regarding Extension of Challenge Period. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC.
776
11/15/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 770 Order on Motion). Notice Date 11/15/2013.
777
11/16/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 773 Order on Motion to Amend and/or Alter). Notice Date 11/16/2013.
778
11/16/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 771 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/16/2013.
779
11/18/2013
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditor Carol Kreider
11/18/2013
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(13-81963-JAC11) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15909869. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 779) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
780
11/18/2013
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Carol Kreider (RE: related document(s) 779 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Carol Kreider). Hearing scheduled 12/9/2013 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
781
11/19/2013
*Corrected* Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Carol Kreider (RE: related document(s) 779 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Carol Kreider). Hearing scheduled 12/2/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
782
11/19/2013
Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date Filed by Creditor Whitney LaToya Sanders
783
11/20/2013
Application for Compensation Second Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Submitted by Burr & Forman LLP, Attorneys for the Debtor-In-Possession for Burr & Forman LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 9/1/2013 to 10/31/2013, Fee: $588,219.75, Expenses: $8,213.52. Filed by Attorney Burr & Forman LLP
1
Appendix Fee Detail
1 Attachment
784
11/20/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 782 Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date filed by Creditor Whitney LaToya Sanders). Hearing scheduled 12/2/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
785
11/20/2013
Certificate of Service of the Second Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Submitted by Burr & Forman LLP, Attorneys for the Debtor-In-Possession Filed by Attorney Burr & Forman LLP (RE: related document(s) 783 Application for Compensation Second Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Submitted by Burr & Forman LLP, Attorneys for the Debtor-In-Possession for Burr & Forman LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 9/1/2013 to 10/).
1
Appendix Master Service List
1 Attachment
786
11/20/2013
Stipulation By Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC and Lenders Regarding Extension of Challenge Period. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC.
787
11/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 780 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 11/20/2013.
788
11/21/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 783 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney Burr & Forman LLP). Hearing scheduled 12/2/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
789
11/21/2013
Application for Compensation Final Application For Compensation Submitted By The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor And Investment Banker For The Debtor And Debtor In Possession for The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1/2013 to 11/8/2013, Fee: $2,527,975.00, Expenses: $42,438.10. Filed by Financial Advisor The Food Partners, LLC
790
11/21/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 781 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 11/21/2013.
791
11/22/2013
Certificate of Service of the Final Application For Compensation Submitted By The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor And Investment Banker For The Debtor And Debtor In Possession Filed by Financial Advisor The Food Partners, LLC (RE: related document(s) 789 Application for Compensation Final Application For Compensation Submitted By The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor And Investment Banker For The Debtor And Debtor In Possession for The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1).
1
Appendix Master Service List
1 Attachment
792
11/22/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 789 Application for Compensation filed by Financial Advisor The Food Partners, LLC). Hearing scheduled 12/2/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
793
11/22/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 768 Order Overruling) Filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC
1
Exhibit Affidavit of Joel Beeler --- Northridge #
2
Exhibit Affidavit of Beeler --- St. Francis
2 Attachments
794
11/22/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 784 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/22/2013.
795
11/23/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 788 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/23/2013.
796
11/24/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 792 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/24/2013.
797
11/25/2013
Order Denying Motion by HPA Northridge, LLC, for Rehearing or in the Alternative, to Alter or Amend Order (Related Doc # 793) Signed on 11/25/2013.
798
11/25/2013
Stipulation By Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC and Lenders Regarding Extension of Challenge Period. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC.
799
11/25/2013
Motion to Amend and/or Alter (related documents 605 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)) Motion to Amend Cure Amount Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
800
11/26/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Randolph M Fowler Filed by Attorney Highway 69 Properties, L.L.C.
801
11/26/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 799 Motion to Amend and/or Alter filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 12/2/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
802
11/26/2013
Application for Administrative Expenses Filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC
1
Volume(s) 2
1 Attachment
803
11/26/2013
Response to (Re Item: 770 Order on Motion) Filed by Creditor Nalley-Garrett Cochran, LLC
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
805
11/27/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 803 Response filed by Creditor Nalley-Garrett Cochran, LLC). Hearing scheduled 12/2/2013 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
806
11/27/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 802 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
807
11/27/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 797 Order on Motion to Amend and/or Alter). Notice Date 11/27/2013.
808
11/28/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 801 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/28/2013.
809
11/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 806 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/29/2013.
810
12/02/2013
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [12/2/13 10:29 AM] Run Time [00:28:18] File Size [ 26.6 MB] RE: Doc #694; Application for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expenses filed by Green Springs, Ltd.
812
12/02/2013
Motion to Allow Claim Landlord Claim Determined After Sale Order Filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC
813
12/02/2013
Request Additional Cure Claim of Southern Family Markets LLC, as Administrative Agent Filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC (RE: related document(s) 722 Motion to Set Bar Date for Certain Landlord Claims Determined After Sale Order).
814
12/02/2013
Supplemental Statement providing addtional sum to Cure Amount Filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC.
815
12/03/2013
Hearing Rescheduled (RE: related document(s) 713 Request filed by Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
816
12/03/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 812 Motion to Allow Claims filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC, 814 Statement filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
817
12/03/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #422 filed by Randolph M. Fowler, Attorney for Highway 69 Properties, LLC. PROBLEM: The Comprehensive Cure Claim filed by Highway 69 Properties, LLC on 12/2/13 as Claim #422 on the Claims Register should also be filed as a docket event on the court docket so that a hearing notice may be generated. SOLUTION: The filer, Robert Fowler, Attorney for Highway 69 Properties, LLC should make the following corrections: Please re-file the pleading as a request or notice so that a hearing notice may be generated.
819
12/03/2013
Request for Payment of Comprehensive Cure Claim Filed by Attorney Highway 69 Properties, L.L.C.
820
12/04/2013
Order Approving Application For Compensation (Related Doc#789) for The Food Partners, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1/2013 to 11/8/2013, Fees awarded: $2,527,975.00, Expenses awarded: $42,438.10; Awarded on 12/4/2013 Signed on 12/4/2013.
821
12/04/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 819 Request filed by Attorney Highway 69 Properties, L.L.C.). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
822
12/04/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 813 Request filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
823
12/05/2013
Order Approving Application For Compensation (Related Doc#783) for Burr & Forman, LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 9/1/2013 to 10/31/2013, Fees awarded: $588219.75, Expenses awarded: $8213.52; Awarded on 12/5/2013 Signed on 12/5/2013.
824
12/05/2013
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtors Motion for an Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Contract Rejection Damage Claims Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
825
12/05/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 816 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/05/2013.
826
12/06/2013
Notice and Order Signed on 12/6/2013 (RE: related document(s) 536 Objection filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/7/2014 at 09:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
827
12/06/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 824 Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
828
12/06/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 820 Order on Application for Compensation filed by Financial Advisor The Food Partners, LLC). Notice Date 12/06/2013.
829
12/06/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 821 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/06/2013.
830
12/06/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 822 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/06/2013.
831
12/07/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 823 Order on Application for Compensation). Notice Date 12/07/2013.
832
12/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 826 Notice and Order). Notice Date 12/08/2013.
833
12/08/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 827 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/08/2013.
834
12/09/2013
Stipulation By Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC and Lenders Regarding Extension of Challenge Period. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC.
835
12/09/2013
Motion to Set Administrative Expense Claims Bar Date for Non-11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(9) and Non-Professional Administrative Expense Claims Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
836
12/09/2013
Fifth Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Fifth Motion for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
837
12/10/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 836 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
838
12/10/2013
Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 2002 and 3003 Setting Administrative Expense Claims Bar Date for Non-11 U.S.C. §503(b)(9) and Non-Professional Administrative Expense Claims (Related Doc #835) Signed on 12/10/2013.
839
12/10/2013
Certificate of Service Supplement to Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 824 Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtors Motion for an Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Contract Rejection Damage Claims, 827 Notice of Hearing). (Carson, D Christopher)
840
12/10/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 834 Stipulation).
841
12/12/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 838 Order on Motion). Notice Date 12/12/2013.
842
12/12/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 837 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/12/2013.
843
12/13/2013
Response to BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC's Limited Objection to Debtor's Proposed Cure Amounts and Cross-Motion to Establish Cure Amount, Administrative Expense and Terms for Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property at Store 84 Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
844
12/13/2013
Notice of Hearing Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 843 Response). Hearing scheduled 1/7/2014 at 09:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
845
12/13/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
846
12/16/2013
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney and Request to be Removed from Service List.
847
12/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jennifer Brooke Kimble Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC.
848
12/16/2013
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by R. Scott Williams Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC. (Williams, R.)
849
12/17/2013
Supplement Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 843 Response).
1
Exhibit A-1 Ground Lease #
2
Exhibit A-2 Ground Lease #
3
Exhibit B-1 Lease #
4
Exhibit B-2 Lease #
5
Exhibit B-3 Lease #
6
Exhibit C-1 First Landlord Appraisal #
7
Exhibit C-2 First Landlord Appraisal #
8
Exhibit C-3 First Landlord Appraisal #
9
Exhibit C-4 First Landlord Appraisal #
10
Exhibit C-5 First Landlord Appraisal #
11
Exhibit C-6 First Landlord Appraisal #
12
Exhibit C-7 First Landlord Appraisal #
13
Exhibit C-8 First Landlord Appraisal #
14
Exhibit C-9 First Landlord Appraisal #
15
Exhibit C-10 First Landlord Appraisal #
16
Exhibit C-11 First Landlord Appraisal #
17
Exhibit C-12 First Landlord Appraisal #
18
Exhibit C-13 First Landlord Appraisal #
19
Exhibit D-1 Second Landlord Appraisal #
20
Exhibit D-2 Second Landlord Appraisal #
21
Exhibit D-3 Second Landlord Appraisal #
22
Exhibit D-4 Second Landlord Appraisal #
23
Exhibit D-5 Second Landlord Appraisal #
24
Exhibit D-6 Second Landlord Appraisal #
25
Exhibit D-7 Second Landlord Appraisal #
26
Exhibit D-8 Second Landlord Appraisal #
27
Exhibit D-9 Second Landlord Appraisal #
28
Exhibit D-10 Second Landlord Appraisal #
29
Exhibit D-11 Second Landlord Appraisal #
30
Exhibit D-12 Second Landlord Appraisal #
31
Exhibit D-13 Second Landlord Appraisal #
32
Exhibit D-14 Second Landlord Appraisal #
33
Exhibit E-1 First Tenant Appraisal #
34
Exhibit E-2 First Tenant Appraisal #
35
Exhibit E-3 First Tenant Appraisal #
36
Exhibit E-4 First Tenant Appraisal #
37
Exhibit E-5 First Tenant Appraisal #
38
Exhibit E-6 First Tenant Appraisal #
39
Exhibit E-7 First Tenant Appraisal #
40
Exhibit E-8 First Tenant Appraisal #
41
Exhibit E-9 First Tenant Appraisal #
42
Exhibit E-10 First Tenant Appraisal #
43
Exhibit E-11 First Tenant Appraisal #
44
Exhibit E-12 First Tenant Appraisal #
45
Exhibit E-13 First Tenant Appraisal #
46
Exhibit E-14 First Tenant Appraisal #
47
Exhibit E-15 First Tenant Appraisal #
48
Exhibit E-16 First Tenant Appraisal #
49
Exhibit E-17 First Tenant Appraisal #
50
Exhibit E-18 First Tenant Appraisal #
51
Exhibit E-19 First Tenant Appraisal #
52
Exhibit E-20 First Tenant Appraisal #
53
Exhibit E-21 First Tenant Appraisal #
54
Exhibit E-22 First Tenant Appraisal #
55
Exhibit F-1 Second Tenant Appraisal #
56
Exhibit F-2 Second Tenant Appraisal #
57
Exhibit F-3 Second Tenant Appraisal #
58
Exhibit F-4 Second Tenant Appraisal #
59
Exhibit F-5 Second Tenant Appraisal #
60
Exhibit F-6 Second Tenant Appraisal #
61
Exhibit F-7 Second Tenant Appraisal #
62
Exhibit F-8 Second Tenant Appraisal #
63
Exhibit F-9 Second Tenant Appraisal #
64
Exhibit F-10 Second Tenant Appraisal #
65
Exhibit F-11 Second Tenant Appraisal #
66
Exhibit F-12 Second Tenant Appraisal #
67
Exhibit F-13 Second Tenant Appraisal #
68
Exhibit F-14 Second Tenant Appraisal #
69
Exhibit F-15 Second Tenant Appraisal #
70
Exhibit F-16 Second Tenant Appraisal #
71
Exhibit F-17 Second Tenant Appraisal #
72
Exhibit F-18 Second Tenant Appraisal #
73
Exhibit F-19 Second Tenant Appraisal #
74
Exhibit F-20 Second Tenant Appraisal #
75
Exhibit F-21 Second Tenant Appraisal #
76
Exhibit F-22 Second Tenant Appraisal #
77
Exhibit F-23 Second Tenant Appraisal #
78
Exhibit F-24 Second Tenant Appraisal #
79
Exhibit F-25 Second Tenant Appraisal #
80
Exhibit F-26 Second Tenant Appraisal #
81
Exhibit F-27 Second Tenant Appraisal #
82
Exhibit F-28 Second Tenant Appraisal #
83
Exhibit F-29 Second Tenant Appraisal
83 Attachments
850
12/18/2013
Order Amending Cure List (Related Doc # 799) Signed on 12/18/2013.
851
12/18/2013
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Green Springs, LTD's Application For Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense (Related Doc # 694) Signed on 12/18/2013.
852
12/18/2013
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 779) Signed on 12/18/2013.
853
12/17/2013
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 511 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Compass Bank.).
854
12/19/2013
Debtor-In-Posession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 10/27/2013 - 11/30/2013 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
856
12/19/2013
Notice of Incorrect Claim #425 filed by Darryl McMillan, Owner, Saints Security, LLC. PROBLEM: The creditor has not filed a Proof of Claim Form. SOLUTION: The filer, Darryl McMillan, Owner should make the following corrections: If you wish to file a Proof of Claim, you may locate the form at www.uscourts.gov. The form is located under Forms and Fees, Bankruptcy Forms, Part I Official Forms, Form #B10
857
12/19/2013
Order on Motion to File Out-Of-Time Claim Filed By Whitney Sanders (Related Doc # 782) Signed on 12/19/2013.
858
12/20/2013
Objection to (related document(s): 802 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC) Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
859
12/20/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 858 Objection filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
860
12/20/2013
Stipulation By Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC and Lenders Regarding Extension of Challenge Period. Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC.
861
12/20/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #536; Limited Objection by BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC to Debtor's Assumption and Assignment of Lease for Real Property located at 2001 McFarland Boulevard, Tuscaloosa, Alabama & Proposed Cure Amounts Regarding Same) Hearing scheduled 01/14/2014 at 10:30 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
862
12/20/2013
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #843; Response by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. to BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC's Limited Objection and Cross-Motion to Establish Cure Amount, Administrative Expense and Terms for Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property at Store 84) Hearing scheduled 01/14/2014 at 10:30 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor Decatur.
863
12/20/2013
Joint Response to (Re Item: 812 Motion to Allow Claim Landlord Claim Determined After Sale Order filed by Creditor STORE SPE Belle, LLC, 813 Request filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC, 814 Statement filed by Interested Party HPA Northridge, LLC, 819 Request filed by Attorney Highway 69 Properties, L.L.C.) (POC 149-2 filed by Rosen Monroe, LLC; POC 421-1 RCG-Macon, LLC) Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Creditors C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Southern Family Markets, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
864
12/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 850 Order on Motion to Amend and/or Alter). Notice Date 12/20/2013.
865
12/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 851 Order on Application for Administrative Expenses). Notice Date 12/20/2013.
866
12/20/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 852 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 12/20/2013.
867
12/21/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 857 Order on Motion To File Claim After Claims Bar Date). Notice Date 12/21/2013.
868
12/21/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 856 Notice of Incorrect Claim). Notice Date 12/21/2013.
869
12/23/2013
Joint Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
1
Exhibit A & B
1 Attachment
870
12/23/2013
Notice of Hearing Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 536 Objection). Hearing scheduled 1/14/2014 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
871
12/23/2013
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 870 Notice of Hearing).
872
12/23/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 863 Response filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Creditor Southern Family Markets, LLC, Creditor C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
873
12/24/2013
Certificate of Service ~ Affidavit of Service~ Filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 869 Joint Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019).
874
12/26/2013
Sixth Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract and to Reject Leases Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
875
12/26/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 869 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/21/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
876
12/27/2013
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 874 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
877
12/27/2013
Withdrawal of Claims #424 Filed by Derry M. Boyd, Walton County Tax Commissioner.
880
12/30/2013
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 869 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/21/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
881
12/30/2013
Summary of Schedules (Amended), Schedule B (Amended), Schedule D (Amended), Schedule F (Amended), Declaration re: Debtor's Amended Schedules Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (RE: related document(s) 229 Declaration, Schedule A - Real Property, Schedule B - Personal Property, Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims, Schedule E - Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims, Schedule F - Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Schedules, Statement).
1
Amended Schedule B #
2
Amended Schedule D #
3
Amended Schedule F #
4
Declaration Concerning Debtor's Amended Schedules
4 Attachments
882
12/31/2013
Withdrawal of Claims: 421 Filed by RCG-Macon, LLC.
883
12/31/2013
Reply to (Re Item: 802) Filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC
884
01/02/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 883 Reply filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
885
01/02/2014
Notice of Deficient Filing (RE: related document(s) 881 Summary of Schedules filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC, Schedule B - Personal Property, Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims, Schedule F - Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims, Declaration). Incomplete Filings due by 1/16/2014.
887
01/03/2014
Amended Schedules. Amendments to Schedule B - Personal Property, Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims, and Schedule F - Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims (RE: related document 881) Fee Amount $30 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC.
01/03/2014
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)(13-81963-JAC11) [misc,amdsch2] (30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16078726. Fee Amount 30.00 (re:Doc# 887) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
888
01/03/2014
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 713 Request of creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC for Allowance and Payment of Section 503(b)(9) Administrative Claim Filed by Creditor Gulf Coast Cookies, LLC.
889
01/03/2014
Notice of Amendment to Schedules
890
01/05/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 889 Notice of Amendment to Schedules (Chapter 11)). Notice Date 01/05/2014.
891
01/06/2014
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [1/6/14 10:04 AM] Run Time [00:33:37] File Size [ 31.6 MB] RE: Doc #883; Reply by Gershman Properties, LLC in Support of Application and Request for Allowance of an immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim
893
01/06/2014
Order Signed on 1/6/2014 (RE: related document(s) 802 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC, 883 Reply filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC).
894
01/06/2014
RequestMotion of University Mall, LLC for Bankruptcy Court to Abstain from Determining the Fair Market Rent Owed Under a Certain Ground Lease (with Certificate of Service attached) Filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC (RE: related document(s) 843 Response).
895
01/06/2014
Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents 894 Request) Motion to Set Expedited Hearing on University Mall, LLCs Motion for Bankruptcy Court to Abstain from Determining Fair Market Rent Under a Certain Ground Lease Filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC
896
01/07/2014
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (Related Doc # 895) Signed on 1/7/2014.
897
01/07/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 894 Request filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/14/2014 at 10:30 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
01/07/2014
Corrective Entry - Order entered in error. Hearing to be set at a different date and time by a Corrected Order. (RE: related document(s) 896 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, 897 Hearing Scheduled). (Text entry; no document attached.)
898
01/07/2014
Amended Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (Related Doc # 895) Signed on 1/7/2014.
899
01/07/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 894 Request filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
900
01/08/2014
Motion to Compel Motion for Court to Abstain from Determining Rent Owed Under Lease Filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC
901
01/08/2014
Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents 900 Motion to Compel) Filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC
902
01/08/2014
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing (Related Doc # 901) Signed on 1/8/2014. Hearing to be held on 1/9/2014 at 10:00 AM 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur for 900 Motion for Court to Abstain from Determining the Fair Market Rent Owed Under Lease
903
01/08/2014
Exhibit and Witness List for January 14, 2014 Hearing Filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC.
904
01/08/2014
Exhibit and Witness List Filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC.
1
Witness List #
2
Exhibit List #
3
Exhibit Exhibit 1 #
4
Exhibit 2 - Part A #
5
Exhibit 2 - Part B #
6
Exhibit 3 #
7
Exhibit 4 #
8
Exhibit 5 #
9
Exhibit 6 #
10
Exhibit 7 #
11
Exhibit 8 #
12
Exhibit 9 #
13
Exhibit 10 #
14
Exhibit 11 #
15
Exhibit 12 #
16
Exhibit 13 #
17
Exhibit 14 #
18
Exhibit 15 - Part A #
19
Exhibit 15 - Part B #
20
Exhibit 15 - Part C #
21
Exhibit 16 #
22
Exhibit 17 #
23
Exhibit 18 #
24
Exhibit 19 - Part A #
25
Exhibit 19 - Part B #
26
Exhibit 19 - Part C #
27
Exhibit 19 - Part D
27 Attachments
905
01/08/2014
Exhibit and Witness List for January 14, 2014 Hearing Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
906
01/08/2014
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
907
01/08/2014
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Stephen A Walsh Filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets of Tuscaloosa McFarland Blvd East LLC.
908
01/08/2014
Exhibit and Witness List for Hearing Regarding BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC's Limited Objection to Debtor's Assumption and Assignment of Lease for Real Property Located at 2001 McFarland Blvd, Tuscaloosa, AL Filed by Creditor Southern Family Markets of Tuscaloosa McFarland Blvd East LLC.
909
01/08/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 893 Order Overruling). Notice Date 01/08/2014.
910
01/09/2014
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [1/9/14 10:00 AM] Run Time [01:35:01] File Size [ 89.2 MB] RE: Doc #894; Motion by University Mall, LLC for Bankruptcy Court to Abstain from Determining the Fair Market Rent owed under a Certain Ground Lease
911
01/09/2014
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as Counsel of a Document(RE: related document(s) 230 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James G Henderson Filed by Creditor dba Vestcom Retail Electronic Imaging Services, Inc.).
912
01/09/2014
Objection to Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. Modified on 1/10/2014 to delete docket entry relationship to docket #901 per corrective entry
913
01/09/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 898 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). Notice Date 01/09/2014.
914
01/10/2014
Response to (Re Item: 894 Request filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC) Debtor's Response in Opposition to Motion of University Mall, LLC for Bankruptcy Court to Abstain from Determining the Fair Market Rent Owed under a Certain Ground Lease Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC (Carson, D Christopher)
915
01/10/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 894 Request filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC, 900 Motion to Compel filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/10/2014 at 03:00 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
916
01/10/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 912 Objection filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., 914 Response filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/10/2014 at 03:00 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
917
01/10/2014
CORRECTIVE ENTRY DOC 912 was incorrectly linked to DOC 901. It should be linked to DOC 900. Filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 912 Objection).
918
01/10/2014
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lee R. Benton Filed by Interested Party William "Bill" White.
919
01/10/2014
Objection to (related document(s): 869 Joint Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC)(Objection to Joint Motion for Approval of Compromise) Filed by Interested Party William "Bill" White
920
01/10/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 919 Objection filed by Interested Party William "Bill" White). Hearing scheduled 1/21/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
921
01/10/2014
Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Contract Rejection Damage Claims (Related Doc # 824) Signed on 1/10/2014.
922
01/10/2014
Fifth Supplemental Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases (Related Doc # 836) Signed on 1/10/2014.
923
01/10/2014
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [1/10/14 2:59 PM] Run Time [00:17:24] File Size [ 16.3 MB] RE: Doc #894; Motion by University Mall, LLC for Bankruptcy Court to Abstain from Determining the Fair Market Rent owed under a Certain Ground Lease
924
01/10/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 902 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). Notice Date 01/10/2014.
925
01/12/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 921 Order on Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 01/12/2014.
926
01/12/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 922 Order on Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 01/12/2014.
927
01/13/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 894 Request filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC, 900 Motion to Compel filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC, 912 Objection filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., 914 Response filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC). Hearing scheduled 1/13/2014 at 03:00 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
928
01/13/2014
Sixth Supplemental Order Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Leases and to Reject Certain Leases (Related Doc # 874) Signed on 1/13/2014.
929
01/13/2014
Order Granting in Part the Application and Request of Gershman Properties, LLC for Allowance and Immediate Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Signed on 1/13/2014 (RE: related document(s) 802 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC).
930
01/13/2014
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Sameer K. Kapoor for creditor, BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC
931
01/13/2014
Hearing Rescheduled (RE: related document(s) 536 Objection filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC, 843 Response filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2014 at 09:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
933
01/14/2014
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice-Sameer K. Kapoor (Related Doc # 930) Signed on 1/14/2014.
934
01/14/2014
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Sameer K. Kapoor (Re Item:930 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601049700 (RE: related document(s) 930 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC).
935
01/15/2014
Amended Order Granting Debtor's Motion for An Order (I) Approving Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and (II) Setting a Bar Date for Contract Rejection Damage Claims Signed on 1/15/2014 (RE: related document(s) 921 Order on Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract).
936
01/15/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 928 Order on Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract). Notice Date 01/15/2014.
937
01/15/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 929 Order Granting). Notice Date 01/15/2014.
939
01/16/2014
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [1/16/14 9:00 AM] Run Time [00:04:42] File Size [ 4.4 MB] RE: Doc #536; Limited Objection by BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC to Debtor's Assumption and Assignment of Lease for Real Property located at 2001 McFarland Boulevard, Tuscaloosa, Alabama & Proposed Cure Amounts Regarding Same
940
01/16/2014
Objection to (related document(s): 869 Joint Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Creditor Committee Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC) Filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd.
941
01/16/2014
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 940 Objection filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd.). Hearing scheduled 1/21/2014 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom Decatur.
942
01/16/2014
Withdrawal of Claims: 99 Filed by Grover Dunn, Assistant Tax Collector-Jefferson County.
943
01/16/2014
Response to (Re Item: 940 Objection filed by Creditor Green Springs, Ltd.) Joinder Filed by Creditor Gershman Properties, LLC
944
01/16/2014
Consent Order Regarding Assumption and Assignment of Debtor's Sublease Relating to Store #84 Signed on 1/16/2014 (RE: related document(s) 536 Objection filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC, 843 Response filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., 894 Request filed by Interested Party University Mall, LLC, 900 Motion to Compel filed by Creditor BRNK Tuscaloosa, LLC, 912 Objection filed by Creditor Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., 914 Response filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC).
945
01/16/2014
Debtor-In-Posession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 12/1/2013 - 12/31/2013 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC. (Carson, D Christopher)
946
01/16/2014
Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement for Period: 10/1/2013 - 12/31/2013; Fee Amount $30,000 Filed by Debtor Belle Foods, LLC. (Carson, D Christopher)
01/16/2014
Receipt of Chapter 11 Quarterly F