Ben Hur F Corpus and Mary Joanne Corpus
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00207 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/03/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/03/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
07/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
07/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
6
07/03/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
07/03/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/03/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
07/04/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/04/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
07/05/2018
OSC Referral Re: Statement of Social Security (Form 121) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/05/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
10
07/05/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
11
07/05/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
12
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
07/10/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
07/12/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
07/13/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/25/2018
Entry of Appearance
18
07/27/2018
Request for Special Notice
08/08/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/21/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
20
08/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
21
08/30/2018
Proceeding Memo
22
09/04/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
23
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
24
10/01/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
25
10/01/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
26
10/02/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
27
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
28
10/05/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
29
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
30
10/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
31
10/30/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
32
10/30/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
33
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.