Benjamin Armour Robinson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00306 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/14/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
09/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
09/14/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/14/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
4
09/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
09/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
09/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
7
09/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
09/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
09/17/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
09/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
11
09/20/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
09/28/2018
Extend Time
13
09/28/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
14
09/28/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
10/01/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/01/2018
Extend Time
16
10/08/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
17
10/08/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
18
10/08/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
19
10/11/2018
Entry of Appearance
20
10/12/2018
Entry of Appearance
10/17/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/06/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
22
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
11/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
24
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.