Benjamin B. Smith and Racinda M. Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00156 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
doc
05/21/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
05/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
doc
05/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/22/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/23/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
06/28/2018
Change of Address
06/29/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/20/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
16
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
08/29/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
19
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
09/02/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
21
09/02/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
22
09/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
23
09/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
09/04/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.