Bernard Glenn Warren
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04022 (alnb)

Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/17/2018 (RE: related document(s)[25] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent). Hearing scheduled 8/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

17-04022-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Bernard Glenn Warren } Case No: 17-04022-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-3348 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter came before the Court on Tuesday, July 17, 2018 10:00 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #25; Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Michael McCormick, Attorney for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: J. Suzanne Shinn, attorney for Bernard Glenn Warren (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, staff attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on the filings and arguments of counsel, the matter is continued to August 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Further, the automatic stay provided for by Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code shall remain in effect. Dated: 07/17/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04022-DSC13 Doc 34 Filed 07/17/18 Entered 07/17/18 15:22:50 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[34] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/19/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04022-DSC Bernard Glenn Warren Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: pbgray Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Jul 17, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 4 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 19, 2018. db +Bernard Glenn Warren, 217 23rd Avenue NE, Birmingham, AL 35215-3742 cr +Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The, 3637 Sentara Way, Virginia Beach, VA 23452-4262 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 18 2018 02:33:57 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 cr E-mail/Text: peritus@ebn.phinsolutions.com Jul 18 2018 02:39:49 Peritus Portfolio Services II LLC, P.O. Box 141419, Irving, TX 75014-1419 TOTAL: 2 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 19, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 17, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Michael McCormick on behalf of Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent BankruptcyECFMail@mccallaraymer.com, mjm@mccallaraymer.com TOTAL: 3 Case 17-04022-DSC13 Doc 35 Filed 07/19/18 Entered 07/20/18 00:13:31 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 17-04022-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Bernard Glenn Warren } Case No: 17-04022-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-3348 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter came before the Court on Tuesday, July 17, 2018 10:00 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #25; Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Michael McCormick, Attorney for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: J. Suzanne Shinn, attorney for Bernard Glenn Warren (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, staff attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on the filings and arguments of counsel, the matter is continued to August 7, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Further, the automatic stay provided for by Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code shall remain in effect. Dated: 07/17/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04022-DSC13 Doc 35 Filed 07/19/18 Entered 07/20/18 00:13:31 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/7/2018 (RE: related document(s)[25] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent). Hearing scheduled 8/28/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

17-04022-DSC13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Bernard Glenn Warren } Case No: 17-04022-DSC13 SSN: XXX-XX-3348 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter was scheduled for a hearing on Tuesday, August 07, 2018 10:00 AM on the following: RE: Doc #25; Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Michael McCormick, Attorney for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: By agreement of the parties, the matter is continued to August 28, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Further, the automatic stay provided for by Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code shall remain in effect. Dated: 08/07/2018 /s/ D. SIMS CRAWFORD D. SIMS CRAWFORD United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-04022-DSC13 Doc 36 Filed 08/07/18 Entered 08/07/18 10:31:53 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 93 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/19/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Bernard Glenn Warren
2
09/19/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren.
4
09/19/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren.
5
09/19/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren.
09/19/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04022-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21174857. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/19/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 01/23/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/19/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/26/2017.
7
09/19/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren.
8
09/19/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren.
9
09/20/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
09/20/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Bernard Glenn Warren Case Number 93-05355, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/09/1993, Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/12/1996.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
09/20/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
11
09/21/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
12
09/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/21/2017.
13
09/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren). Notice Date 09/21/2017.
14
09/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/22/2017.
15
10/25/2017
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/1/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, bc)
16
11/02/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/1/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
11/02/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren.
1
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
1 Attachment
18
11/06/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
19
11/07/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
11/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/09/2017.
21
11/15/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
22
11/27/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 11/27/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bernard Glenn Warren, 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
23
11/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 11/29/2017.
24
03/09/2018
Withdrawal of Claims: 9 Filed by Creditor Peritus Portfolio Services II LLC.
25
04/25/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service (217 23rd Avenue Northeast, Center Point, Alabama 35215-3742, which may also be known as 217 23rd Avenue Northeast, Birmingham, AL 35215), Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
04/25/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04022-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21998355. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 25) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
04/25/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service (217 23rd Avenue Northeast, Center Point, Alabama 35215-3742, which may also be known as 217 23rd Avenue Northeast, Birmingham, AL 35215), Fee Amount $181,).
27
04/25/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent). Hearing scheduled 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
29
04/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 04/27/2018.
30
05/15/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 5/15/2018 (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Further, the automatic stay provided for by Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code shall remain in effect.
31
05/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 05/17/2018.
32
06/18/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/18/2018 (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent). Hearing scheduled 7/17/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/20/2018.
34
07/17/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/17/2018 (RE: related document(s)[25] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent). Hearing scheduled 8/7/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
35
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[34] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/19/2018.
36
08/07/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/7/2018 (RE: related document(s)[25] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, By Loancare, LLC The Servicing Agent). Hearing scheduled 8/28/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
08/28/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Public)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.