Bertha Davis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02014 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Dismissing Case (B121 non-compliance)
doc
05/25/2018
Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/15)
doc
05/25/2018
Matrix Filed
doc
05/25/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
doc
05/25/2018
Employee Income Records
doc
05/25/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs
doc
05/25/2018
Statement of Intent
doc
05/25/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
doc
05/25/2018
Reinstate Case
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
37
08/04/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.