Best v. Holladay et al
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2013-cv-00001 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 764 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/03/2013
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carl Johnson from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-12-4884. Filing fee $ 350 pd., receipt #LIT037603.
1
Civil Cover Sheet)(kpr) (Docket entry modified on 1/4/2013 to correct the party filer and to remove text regarding summons.) (thd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2013: #
2
https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/doc1/02712846438" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02712846438','92080','11','','2','0','',''}};">2</a> Main Document - Correct)
2 Attachments
2
01/03/2013
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does, Charles Holladay, Carl Johnson, Randy Morgan filed by Roxanne Best
3
01/03/2013
ANSWER to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles Holladay, Randy Morgan.
4
01/03/2013
ANSWER to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Carl Johnson.
5
01/03/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Fuqua on behalf of Charles Holladay, Randy Morgan
01/04/2013
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the party filer as Carl Johnson, and the docket text was modified to remove the text regarding summons. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/07/2013
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The image file was corrected to remove duplicate pages. The Appearance on Behalf of Charles Holladay and Randy Morgan was scanned twice. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry 1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties.
7
02/01/2013
NOTICE by Charles Holladay, Randy Morgan of Consent to Removal
8
02/04/2013
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/11/2013; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/25/2013; proposed date for Jury Trial set for 10/20/2014 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Entered at the Direction of the Court on 2/4/2013.
9
02/04/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine M. Corless on behalf of Carl Johnson
10
04/01/2013
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Charles Holladay, Randy Morgan. JOINT REPORT
11
04/03/2013
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2014 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. : Discovery due by 7/11/2014; Motions due by 7/22/2014; Pretrial Disclosure Sheets due by 9/22/2014; and Status Reports due by 5/14/2014. Entered at the Direction of the Court on 4/3/2013.
12
05/03/2013
MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint by Roxanne Best
1
Exhibit &quot;A&quot; Proposed Complaint
1 Attachment
13
05/09/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER : Unopposed motion, No. 12, granted. Best must file her amended complaint no later than 16 May 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/9/2013.
14
05/11/2013
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Roxanne Best
15
05/16/2013
ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Melissa Grimes, Charles Holladay, Rachel Holmes, Randy Morgan, Donna Washburn.
05/16/2013
Summons Issued as to Melissa Grimes, R Hale, Rachel Holmes, Maxim Healthcare Services Inc, Donna Washburn. (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
05/24/2013
ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Carl Johnson.
17
07/02/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Jon Sallings on behalf of R Hale, Maxim Healthcare Services Inc
18
07/02/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Thompson on behalf of R Hale, Maxim Healthcare Services Inc
19
07/02/2013
ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand (filed by Attorney Jerry Sallings) by R Hale, Maxim Healthcare Services Inc.
20
09/18/2013
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Carl Johnson
21
09/18/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Johnson.
22
09/18/2013
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Johnson.
23
09/22/2013
MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Roxanne Best
24
09/22/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 23 Motion to Stay filed by Roxanne Best.
25
09/30/2013
RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Johnson.
26
10/02/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 23 MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Affidavit filed by Roxanne Best.
27
10/09/2013
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay ddl for responding to Dr. Johnson's motion for summary judgment 20 until December 16, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/9/13.
28
12/16/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 27 Order on Motion to Stay by Roxanne Best
29
12/17/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER : The Court would appreciate an expedited response to Best's motion to extend time, No. 28. Expedited response due by noon on 20 December 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/17/2013.
30
12/18/2013
RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 27 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Carl Johnson.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
31
12/18/2013
ORDER granting pltf's 28 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 2/15/14 to respond to 20 Johnson's MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/13.
32
12/23/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roxanne Best. Maxim Healthcare Services Inc served on 6/24/2013.
33
02/14/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Roxanne Best.
1
Exhibit &quot;A&quot; Dr. Johnson's contract
2
Exhibit &quot;B&quot; Expert Report
3
Exhibit &quot;B-1&quot; Sufrin CV
4
Exhibit &quot;B-2&quot; Sufrin Declaration
5
Exhibit &quot;C&quot; Declaration of Plaintiff
6
Exhibit &quot;D&quot; Deposition of Dr. Johnson
7
Exhibit &quot;E&quot; Deposition of Nurse Washburn
8
Exhibit &quot;F&quot; Deposition of Nurse Holmes
9
Exhibit &quot;G&quot; Nursing Protocols
9 Attachments
34
02/14/2014
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 22 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) filed by Roxanne Best.
35
02/14/2014
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 33 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Roxanne Best.
36
02/15/2014
NOTICE by Roxanne Best re 35 Brief in Support of filing Exhibits 1-4
1
Exhibit &quot;1&quot; Best medical
2
Exhibit &quot;2' Halferty medical
3
Exhibit &quot;3&quot; Hernandez medical
4
Exhibit &quot;4&quot; Parr medical
4 Attachments
37
02/15/2014
NOTICE by Roxanne Best re 35 Brief in Support of Filing Exhibit 5
1
Exhibit &quot;5&quot; Declaration of Marshall
1 Attachment
38
02/15/2014
MOTION to Dismiss by Roxanne Best
39
02/17/2014
MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 Amended Complaint by Roxanne Best
1
Exhibit &quot;A&quot; Proposed Complaint
1 Attachment
40
02/20/2014
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Carl Johnson
41
02/20/2014
ORDER grating 38 Motion for Voluntary dismissal. Best's claims against Rachel Holmes, R. Hale, and Maxim Healthcare Services Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. The unopposed 40 Motion for Extension is granted. Dr. Johnson's reply due by 7 March 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/20/2014
42
02/25/2014
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion to amend, No. 39, granted. Amended complaint due by 28 February 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/25/2014.
43
02/27/2014
MOTION to Withdraw 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Carl Johnson
44
02/27/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Charles Holladay, Carl Johnson, Randy Morgan, Donna Washburn, filed by Roxanne Best
45
02/28/2014
ORDER granting 43 Motion to Withdraw. 20 Motion for Summary Judgment withdrawn. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/2014.
46
03/10/2014
ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint by Charles Holladay, Randy Morgan, Donna Washburn.
47
03/13/2014
ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Carl Johnson. (Docket text modified on 3/13/2014 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.)
03/13/2014
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 47 Answer to Amended Complaint by Carl Johnson. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
05/14/2014
STATUS REPORT by Charles Holladay, Carl Johnson, Randy Morgan, Donna Washburn.
49
05/14/2014
MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Remand to State Court, MOTION for Extension of Time to File () by Roxanne Best
50
05/20/2014
MOTION to Substitute Attorney MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Carl Johnson
51
05/20/2014
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion to substitute, No. 50, granted. Catherine M. Corless is no longer associated with this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/20/2014.
52
05/22/2014
ORDER granting 49 Motion. All of Best's federal law claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Court declines jurisdiction over the remaining pendent state-law claims, 28 U.S.C. ยง 1367(c). The Court remands those claims to the Pulaski County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/21/2014.
53
05/22/2014
Letter to Pulaski County Circuit Court transmitting a copy of file and certified copies of Order to Remand and Docket Sheet by certified mail.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.