Bethany Rose Aldridge
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00406 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
54
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
55
07/19/2018
Certificate of Service
56
07/26/2018
Relief from Stay
07/26/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
58
08/09/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
59
08/16/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.