Bill Edward Behlke
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00232 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/23/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/23/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
07/23/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
4
07/23/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
07/23/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/23/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
07/24/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/24/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
11
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
08/21/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/27/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
15
08/28/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
16
08/28/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
17
08/28/2018
Certificate of Service
19
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
20
09/13/2018
Entry of Appearance
21
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
22
09/25/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
09/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/25/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
24
09/25/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
25
09/28/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
26
09/28/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
27
09/28/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
28
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
10/03/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
10/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
10/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
32
10/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
33
10/17/2018
Change of Address
10/18/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.