Billy Joe Harris and Sheryl Ann Harris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00450 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/31/2017
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Billy joe Harris and Sheryl ann Harris
34
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
35
10/30/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
36
11/05/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
37
01/03/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
38
01/03/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
39
01/03/2019
Certificate of Service
01/03/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
01/16/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
01/23/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/25/2019
Certificate of No Objection
42
01/25/2019
Certificate of Service
43
02/06/2019
Relief from Stay
44
02/07/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
45
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
02/21/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
02/21/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
02/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
48
03/11/2019
Generic Motion / Application
49
03/12/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
50
03/12/2019
Certificate of Service
51
03/12/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
52
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
53
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
04/04/2019
Certificate of No Objection
55
04/04/2019
Certificate of No Objection
56
04/16/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
57
04/16/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
58
04/17/2019
Generic Motion
04/18/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
05/08/2019
Certificate of No Objection
60
05/10/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.