Black v. State of Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00099 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
21
05/21/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
22
05/21/2018
Affidavit
23
05/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
24
05/31/2018
Dismiss
25
06/26/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
26
06/27/2018
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.