Blakney v. Prasad et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00098 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
05/29/2018
Answer to Complaint
6
05/29/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
7
05/29/2018
Answer to Complaint
8
05/29/2018
Answer to Complaint
9
06/21/2018
Summary Judgment
10
07/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
11
07/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
13
07/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
14
08/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
15
08/08/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
16
08/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
17
08/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
08/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/22/2018
Dismiss
20
08/22/2018
Memorandum
21
08/22/2018
Joinder to Motion
25
09/19/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
26
09/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
27
02/05/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss
28
02/12/2019
Reconsideration
02/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/13/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
02/13/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
02/14/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
02/28/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
33
03/01/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.