Blas v. Bank of America, N.A. (BANA)
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90028 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/10/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
09/11/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
09/11/2018
Summons Issued
3
09/11/2018
Summons Service Executed
4
10/02/2018
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (CM15)
5
10/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
6
10/05/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
7
10/09/2018
Support Documentation
8
10/11/2018
Entry of Appearance
9
10/16/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
10
10/16/2018
Certificate of Service
11
10/22/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
10/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/02/2018
Generic Motion / Application
13
11/09/2018
Proceeding Memo
14
11/09/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
15
11/13/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
16
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
11/19/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
18
11/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.