Boards of Trustees of the Alaska Pipe Trades U.A. Local 367 Health & Security Trust Fund et al v. Polar Refrig & Restaurant Equip, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00050 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
06/07/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/18/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
07/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
07/30/2018
Scheduling Order
14
07/31/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.