Bobbie Jacqueline Simmons
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00437 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/28/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/28/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
12/28/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
12/28/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
12/28/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12/28/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/28/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
12/28/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/31/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/15/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/25/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
02/25/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.