Booth v. North Slope Borough
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

2:2015-cv-00005 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
54
07/11/2018
Transcript
55
07/20/2018
ORDER RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: In light of the foregoing, the Boroughs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment at Docket 37 is GRANTED with respect to Ms. Booths procedural due process challenge to the RIF process, alleged as part of Count 8. The motion is DENIED as to Count 3, the FMLA claim of Count 4, and the remaining due process challenge of Count 8. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 07/20/2018.
56
10/17/2018
Substitute Attorney
10/18/2018
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
03/20/2019
Continue
03/21/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.