Bradley Barnett O'Rear
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00126 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/11/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Bradley Barnett O'Rear
2
01/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bradley Barnett O'Rear.
4
01/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Bradley Barnett O'Rear.
5
01/11/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Bradley Barnett O'Rear.
01/11/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-00126-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21595746. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/11/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Bradley Barnett O'Rear.
7
01/11/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Bradley Barnett O'Rear.
8
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/22/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/10/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/09/2018.
9
01/12/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
01/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/13/2018.
11
01/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bradley Barnett O'Rear). Notice Date 01/14/2018.
12
01/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/14/2018.
13
01/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bryce Noel Filed by Creditor THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE (CWMBS 2006-HYB1).
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.