Bradshaw v. Nyholm et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00223 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
52
05/25/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
53
05/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
54
06/26/2018
Compel
55
07/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
07/10/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
07/17/2018
Notice (Other)
58
07/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
59
07/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
60
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
61
07/26/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
62
07/26/2018
Declaration
63
07/26/2018
Declaration
64
08/06/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
65
08/08/2018
Order
66
08/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
67
08/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
68
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
70
09/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
10/29/2018
Stipulation
73
10/30/2018
Order on Stipulation
74
11/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
75
11/07/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
76
11/09/2018
Summary Judgment
77
11/09/2018
Declaration
78
11/15/2018
Notice (Other)
79
12/06/2018
Leave to File Document
80
12/06/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
81
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
82
12/07/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.