Brafort v. City of Eufaula, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2000-cv-01566 (almd)

JURY VERDICT

Case 2: 00-cv-01566-SRW Document 52 Filed 04/17/02 Page 1 of 2 IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF THE UNITED STATES MIDDLE DISTRICT OF ALABAMA NORTHERN DIVISION FILE D 9: 41Ama APR 17 2002 JOHN BRAFORT, CLERK U. S. DISTRICT COURT M. CCLE DIST. OF ALA. Plaintiff, NAARAA CIVIL ACTION NO. 00-W-1566-N CITY OF EUFAULA, Defendant. VERDICT 1. Was plaintiff denied a position by defendant? v Yes No Yes No 2. Was plaintiff's race a substantial or motivating factor that prompted defendant's decision? Yes NO No Note: If you answered No to either Question 1 or Question 2, you need not answer the remaining questions. 3. Has defendant established that plaintiff would have been denied the position for other reasons even in the absence of consideration of plaintiffs race? Yes No Note: If you answered Yes to Question 3, you need not answer the remaining questions. 4. What amount, if any, is plaintiff entitled to recover to compensate for a net loss of wages and benefits to the date of trial? VA Case 2: 00-cv-01566-SRW Document 52 Filed 04/17/02 Page 2 of 2 5. What amount, if any, is plaintiff entitled to recover to compensate for emotional pain and mental anguish? DONE this 1 day of April, 2002. FOREPERSON 2-----------

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 607 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/09/2000
DEMAND for jury trial by John Brafort (ajr) Modified on 11/16/2000
2
11/16/2000
SUMMONS issued for Eufaula City Police - mailed CMRRR
11/16/2000
"Notice of Assignment to U.S. Mag. Judge" mailed to counsel for plaintiff (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2000
File referred to Judge Walker (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/20/2000
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Mary Cumbie on 11/17/00 for Eufaula City Police. Answer due on 12/7/00 for Eufaula City Police
4
12/07/2000
ANSWER to Complaint by Eufaula City Police (Attorney Allison L. Alford, C. Winston Sheehan Jr.), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
12/08/2000
"Notice of Assignment to U.S. Mag. Judge" mailed to counsel for defendant (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/15/2000
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Eufaula City Police by Jimmy S. Calton, Jimmy S. Calton Jr.
6
01/17/2001
ORDER that the Rule 26 report containing the discovery plan shall be filed no later than 1/31/01; that on or before 1/31/01 parties shall complete and return the attached consent forms; (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
7
01/30/2001
REPORT of Planning Meeting; referred to Judge Walker
02/05/2001
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/05/2001
Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Mag. Judge received from counsel for defendant; referred to Judge Walker
9
02/05/2001
Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Mag. Judge received from counsel for plaintiff; referred to Judge Walker
10
02/12/2001
AMENDED REPORT of Planning Meeting; referred to Judge Walker(ajr) Modified on 02/13/2001
11
03/09/2001
ORDER setting schedule for submissions in support of and opposition to the motion for summary judgment as further set out in order; (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
12
03/09/2001
SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 16 setting Pretrial Conference for 4:00 3/13/02 before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker Motion Filing deadline on 12/17/01; Discovery cutoff 1/1/02; jury trial set for 4/15/02 before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker; set amended pleading deadline for 7/2/01 Mediation Notice deadline on 1/7/02 (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel, JT, WAR, YG, HC.
13
12/13/2001
MOTION by Eufaula City Police for Summary Judgment referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
14
12/13/2001
BRIEF by Eufaula City Police in support of [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment (affidavits, depositions and exhibits attached); referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
15
12/17/2001
ORDER that briefing will proceed as set forth in the briefing schedule entered in this action on 3/9/01; (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided.
16
01/22/2002
MOTION by John Brafort to Extend Time to respond to motin for summary judgment referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
17
01/25/2002
Stamped ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motin for summary judgment Response to Motion reset to 1/25/02 for [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment (by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
01/25/2002
Text not available. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
01/25/2002
BRIEF by John Brafort in opposition to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment (exhibits, affidavits and deposition excerpts attached); referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
19
02/05/2002
MOTION by Eufaula City Police to supplement evidence (attachment); referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
20
02/05/2002
REPLY by Eufaula City Police to response to [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Eufaula City Police referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
21
02/05/2002
MOTION by Eufaula City Police to exclude testimony referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
22
02/14/2002
ORDER Response to Motion set to 2/19/02 for [21-1] motion to exclude testimony (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
23
02/14/2002
ORDER Response to Motion set to 2/19/02 for [19-1] motion to supplement evidence (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
24
02/14/2002
MOTION by John Brafort to supplement brief filed in response to motion for summary judgment referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
25
02/19/2002
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Eufaula City Police by Brandy A. Adkins
26
02/19/2002
RESPONSE by Eufaula City Police to [24-1] motion to supplement brief filed in response to motion for summary judgment by John Brafort referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
27
02/19/2002
RESPONSE by John Brafort to [21-1] motion to exclude testimony by Eufaula City Police referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
28
02/22/2002
ORDER granting [24-1] motion to supplement brief filed in response to motion for summary judgment; substituting the City of Eufaula for the Eufaula City Police Department; directing counsel for defendant police department to notify the court in writing on or before 2/28/02 whether they will represent the City as further set out;(signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
29
02/28/2002
Defendant's Acceptance of Service and Adoption of Pleadings previously filed. Referred to Mag Judge Walker [EDIT 3/8/02 to add identifying text to docket entry-DJY/QC] (ajr) Modified on 03/08/2002
30
03/04/2002
Witness and discovery list by City of Eufaula (attachment); referred to Judge Walker [EDIT 3/8/02 to complete docket entry-DJY/QC] (ajr) Modified on 03/08/2002
32
03/13/2002
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting [21-1] motion to exclude testimony, denying [19-1] motion to supplement evidence, denying [13-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel
03/13/2002
Pre-Trial Conference held before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker on 3/13/02 (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
03/14/2002
PRETRIAL ORDER setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: proposed jury instructions due on 4/1/02; voir dire questions due 4/1/02 (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
34
03/14/2002
ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response; Response to Motion set to 3/20/02 for [31-1] motion to Strike (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies faxed to counsel as directed.
35
03/15/2002
AMENDED Witness list by City of Eufaula; referred to Judge Walker
36
03/19/2002
Supplement to amended Witness list by City of Eufaula; referred to Judge Walker
37
03/25/2002
Second Amended Witness list by City of Eufaula. Referred to Mag Judge Walker.
38
04/01/2002
Exhibit list by City of Eufaula (exhibits 1-5 attached); referred to Judge Walker
39
04/01/2002
MOTION by City of Eufaula in Limine (attachment); referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
40
04/01/2002
Voir Dire Questions by City of Eufaula; referred to Judge Walker
41
04/01/2002
Proposed Jury instructions by City of Eufaula; referred to Judge Walker
42
04/04/2002
Voir Dire Questions by John Brafort; referred to Judge Walker
43
04/04/2002
Proposed Jury instructions by John Brafort; referred to Judge Walker
44
04/08/2002
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for John Brafort by Lowell Landis Sexton
46
04/08/2002
Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Exhibits; referred to Judge Walker (ajr) Modified on 04/09/2002
47
04/11/2002
ORDER denying [45-1] motion for leave to Amend [1-1] complaint (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel.
04/15/2002
Jury selection held before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker on 4/15/02 (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2002
Jury Trial held before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker on 4/15/02 - 4/17/02 (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
04/16/2002
OBJECTION (filed during trial) by City of Eufaula to [43-1] instructions jury by John Brafort referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
49
04/16/2002
MOTION (made during trial) by City of Eufaula for judgment as a matter of law at the conclusion of the plaintiff's evidence referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
50
04/16/2002
MOTION (made during trial) by City of Eufaula for judgment as a matter of law at the conclusion of the evidence referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
51
04/17/2002
Court's Instruction to the Jury
52
04/17/2002
JURY VERDICT
53
04/17/2002
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: Court Reporter - Jimmy Dickens; Jury selection and trial held on 4/15/02 - 4/17/02 before Judge Susan Russ Walker; witness and exhibit list attached; exhibits maintained in separate binder with file
54
04/18/2002
JUDGMENT for City of Eufaula against John Brafort, taxing costs against plainitff; (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies provided to counsel
04/18/2002
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2002
** Renoticed document [54-1] judgment order - order not scanned as EOD (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
04/23/2002
Bill of costs received in the amount of $1144.59 entered by City of Eufaula
04/24/2002
Costs of $1144.59 taxed for City of Eufaula against plaintiff (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.