Brandon Gregory Anderson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04662 (alnb)

Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of Sunsource financial in the amount of $4,165.68 Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: ANDERSON, Brandon 17-04662 Debtor(s). Chapter 13 OBJECTION TO CLAIM _________________________________________________________________________________ COME(S) NOW, your debtor(s), by and through undersigned counsel and file(s) this Objection to the Claim as described below and would submit as follows: 1. Secured claim #1 of Sunsource Financial ($4,165.68) 2. The plan proposes to surrender the collateral, tanning bed, to the lender. WHEREFORE, Debtor prays that the Court enter an Order disallowing the claim Respectfully submitted, _/s/ Brent W. Davis___________ February 14, 2018 Of Counsel Brent W. Davis, Attorney for Debtors Brent W. Davis, LLC 2700 Rogers Drive, Suite 106 Homewood Alabama 35209-2055 Phone (205) 989-1919 ~ Fax 866-825-8756 Email brent@brentwdavis.com Case 17-04662-DSC13 Doc 50 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/14/18 16:37:50 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re Brandon Gregory Anderson Case No. 17-04662 Debtor(s) Chapter 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on February 14, 2018, a copy of attached was served electronically or by regular United States mail to all interested parties, the Trustee and all creditors. Jp Morgan Chase Bank was served by US Mail at: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA Jamie Dimon, Chairman & CEO 270 Park Ave New York, NY 10017 /s/ Brent W. Davis Brent W. Davis ASB-5320-I45B Brent W. Davis & Associates, L.L.C. 2700 Rogers Drive Suite 106 Birmingham, AL 35209-2055 205-989-1919Fax:1-866-825-8756 brent@brentwdavis.com Software Copyright (c) 1996-2018 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 17-04662-DSC13 Doc 50 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/14/18 16:37:50 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s)[50] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson). Hearing scheduled 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

Van−002 [Notice of Hearing] (Rev. 05/14) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04662−DSC13 Brandon Gregory Anderson Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−8938 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF HEARING Notice is hereby given that a hearing will be held to consider and act upon the following: 50 − Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of Sunsource financial in the amount of $4,165.68 Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson. (Davis, Brent) Date: Tuesday, March 20, 2018 Time: 09:30 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attorneys should attend all scheduled hearings. If a conflict is known, the Court should be notified immediately. Continuances of non−evidentiary hearings may be granted if all parties consent. Evidentiary hearings will not be continued except for good cause shown. If there is a failure to attend a scheduled hearing, and the Court has not been notified of the reason for the failure, the Court may enter appropriate orders. Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: February 15, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court pbg Case 17-04662-DSC13 Doc 51 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/15/18 11:21:54 Desc Notice of Hearing Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/30/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Brandon Gregory Anderson
2
10/30/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
3
10/30/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson
5
10/30/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
6
10/30/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
7
10/30/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
8
10/30/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/06/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/09/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/06/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/30/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/05/2018.
9
10/31/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/31/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson Case Number 00-42037, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/14/2000, Standard Discharge on 11/02/2000; Case Number 13-04752, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/24/2013, Standard Discharge on 01/27/2014; Case Number 03-41825, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/09/2003, Standard Discharge on 10/31/2008.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
10/31/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson).
11
11/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/01/2017.
12
11/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson). Notice Date 11/02/2017.
13
11/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/02/2017.
14
11/07/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
11/13/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.
16
11/13/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
17
11/28/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor OneMain Financial (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.).
18
11/29/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor OneMain Financial). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
12/03/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
20
12/11/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/6/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
21
12/11/2017
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA.
22
12/12/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing: PROBLEM: The filer, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, has filed a document not in an upright position when filing the Notice of Mortgage Payment Change. SOLUTION: The filer, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, should refile the document scanning it in the portrait orientation. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerks Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Claim Filed) filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA).
23
12/13/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
24
12/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
12/13/2017
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/9/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
26
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Notice of Deficient Filing (PDF Not Upright Orientation)). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
27
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
28
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
29
12/20/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/20/2017 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 17 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor OneMain Financial, 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
31
01/01/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
32
01/02/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.).
1
Exhibit note and deed of trust
1 Attachment
33
01/03/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 32 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA). Hearing scheduled 1/16/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
34
01/03/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
35
01/10/2018
Consent Order on Objection to Confirmation filed by OneMain Financial. Filed By: OneMain Financial Signed on 1/10/2018 (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor OneMain Financial).
36
01/12/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mr. Smothers shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #32; Objection to Confirmation filed by Jonathan Smothers, Attorney for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
37
01/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Consent Order). Notice Date 01/12/2018.
38
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #23; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
39
01/16/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Confirmation Hearing. Hearing scheduled 02/06/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
40
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
41
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
01/22/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 188.11 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04662-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (188.11) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21630478. Fee Amount 188.11 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
02/06/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.).
43
02/06/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
44
02/07/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
02/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 121.89 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04662-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (121.89) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700433. Fee Amount 121.89 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
02/09/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 10 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
46
02/09/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/9/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
47
02/09/2018
Agreed Order Overruling Filed By: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association Signed on 2/9/2018 (RE: related document(s) 32 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA).
48
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
49
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 47 Consent Order). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
50
02/14/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of Sunsource financial in the amount of $4,165.68 Filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson.
51
02/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s)[50] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brandon Gregory Anderson). Hearing scheduled 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.