Brandon Juan Darius Perez
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01717 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 182 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Brandon Juan Darius Perez
2
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Brandon Juan Darius Perez.
4
04/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Brandon Juan Darius Perez.
5
04/20/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Brandon Juan Darius Perez.
6
04/20/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Brandon Juan Darius Perez.
04/20/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01717-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21984488. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/12/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/29/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/30/2018.
8
04/21/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
9
04/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/22/2018.
10
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
11
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Brandon Juan Darius Perez). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
12
05/08/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
13
05/08/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Brandon Juan Darius Perez.
14
05/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/30/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
15
07/11/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 07/12/2018 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
16
07/13/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.