Brandon Thomas Mindel and April K Mindel
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00236 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/25/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/25/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
07/25/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
4
07/25/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
07/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/25/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
07/25/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/25/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
7
07/25/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
07/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
9
07/26/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
07/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
15
08/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
16
08/07/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
17
08/07/2018
Certificate of Service
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.