Brandy a. Fraser
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

1:2015-bk-01978 (alsb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 483 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/24/2015
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules and Statements Fee Amount $310(Case Upload) filed by Frances Hoit Hollinger on behalf of Brandy A. Fraser.
06/24/2015
Receipt of Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules and Statements (Case Upload)(15-01978) [caseupld,1305u] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 6220792, in the amount of $ 310.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/24/2015
Certificate of Credit Counseling For Debtor Filed by Brandy A. Fraser Frances Hoit Hollinger
3
06/24/2015
Form B21 - Social Security Number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number Filed by Brandy A. Fraser Frances Hoit Hollinger
4
06/24/2015
Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee Filed by Brandy A. Fraser Frances Hoit Hollinger
5
06/24/2015
Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee Filed by Brandy A. Fraser Frances Hoit Hollinger
6
06/24/2015
Application for INITIAL Debtor Attorney Fees Filed by Brandy A. Fraser Frances Hoit Hollinger
7
06/24/2015
Auto Assignment of Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors Daniel B. O'Brien, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/13/2015 at 08:30AM at 201 St. Louis St., Mobile, AL 36602. Proof of Claim due by 11/12/2015. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/21/2015. Judge SHULMAN added to case.
8
06/25/2015
Notice of Documents Due - The debtor(s)/petitioner(s) is/are hereby notified that this case may be dismissed in accordance with 11U.S.C.521(i)(1) and/or 11 U.S.C. 521(i)(2) and/or that it may be closed without discharge if the following documents are not filed timely. - Chapter 13 Plan - Incomplete Filings due by 7/8/2015.
9
06/25/2015
Chapter 13 Plan (Case Upload) Filed by Brandy A. Fraser
10
06/26/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) 7 Auto Assignment of Trustee) Notice Date 06/26/2015.
11
06/27/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 8 Notice of 11 U.S.C. 521(a)(1) Documents Due) Notice Date 06/27/2015.
12
06/27/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 9 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Brandy A. Fraser) Notice Date 06/27/2015.
13
07/02/2015
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change with Certificate of Service Filed by Alabama Housing Finance Authority.
14
07/15/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kristofor D Sodergren Filed by on behalf of Marine One
15
07/16/2015
Motion for Relief from Stay Fee Amount is $176.00, in addition to Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay Filed by Marine One Kristofor D Sodergren
16
07/16/2015
Fact Summary Sheet for Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Marine One Kristofor D Sodergren (related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Marine One, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay)
07/16/2015
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(15-01978) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 6252380, in the amount of $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/16/2015
Notice of Hearing Set on Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay Motion and Order Extending the Automatic Stay. (related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Marine One) Hearing scheduled for 8/12/2015 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
18
07/18/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 17 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 07/18/2015.
19
07/27/2015
Response Filed by Brandy A. Fraser (related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Marine One, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay)
20
08/13/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Recovery Management Systems Corporation For GE Money Bank.
21
08/13/2015
Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held and confirmation hearing - Case is conditionally confirmed to the bar date (O'Brien, Daniel)
22
08/13/2015
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 8/12/2015. (related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Marine One, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay. Motion granted by consent. Order due by 8/27/2015 from Sodergren. Appearances: Hollinger, Sodergren, McAleer.
23
08/14/2015
Supplemental Exhibit to Exhibit "A" Filed by Marine One Kristofor D Sodergren (related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Marine One, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay)
24
08/28/2015
FINAL NOTICE of Order Due. To Be Filed By Sodergren. If the order is not received by Final Due Date a Show Cause hearing may be set. (related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Marine One, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, 22 Minute Entry) Final Notice of Order due by 9/4/2015.
25
09/02/2015
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 15), Granting Motion For Relief From Co-Debtor Stay (Related Doc # 15) Signed on 9/2/2015.
26
09/04/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 25 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay) Notice Date 09/04/2015.
27
09/22/2015
NEGATIVE NOTICE: Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions Filed by Daniel B. O'Brien Chapter 13 Trustee (Auto-File) Objections to Trustee Objection to Exemptions due by 10/13/2015. (Chapter 13 Trustee (Auto-File))
28
09/28/2015
Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management. (Admin)
29
09/30/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 28 Financial Management Course Deadline) Notice Date 09/30/2015.
30
10/16/2015
Order Sustaining Objection to Debtors Claim of Exemptions. Signed on 10/16/2015 (related document(s) 27 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions filed by Daniel B. O'Brien)
31
10/18/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 30 Order on Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions) Notice Date 10/18/2015.
32
10/21/2015
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Hope Enterprise Corporation Timothy J. Anzenberger (Pro Hac)
1
Exhibit "A" - Application for Admission #
2
Exhibit "B" - Certificates of Good Standing) (Anzenberger (Pro Hac), Timothy
2 Attachments
33
10/22/2015
An Order Is Due To Be Filed By Timothy J. Anzenberger (related document(s) 32 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Hope Enterprise Corporation) Order due by 11/5/2015
34
10/26/2015
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 32) Signed on 10/26/2015.
35
10/27/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gina Baker Hantel Filed by on behalf of Tennessee Student Assistance Corporation
36
10/28/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 34 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) Notice Date 10/28/2015.
37
11/03/2015
Certificate of Financial Management Course Completion - Debtor Filed by Brandy A. Fraser Frances Hoit Hollinger
38
11/20/2015
Notice of Intent to Pay Claim 10 (Chapter 13 Trustee (Auto-File))
39
11/23/2015
Motion to Dismiss Case for Deficiencies - Pay Advices Filed by Daniel B. O'Brien Chapter 13 Trustee (Auto-File) (Chapter 13 Trustee (Auto-File))
40
11/23/2015
Notice of Hearing Set on (related document(s) 39 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Daniel B. O'Brien) Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
41
11/24/2015
Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee Filed by Brandy A. Fraser Frances Hoit Hollinger
42
11/25/2015
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 40 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 11/25/2015.
43
01/08/2016
Minute Entry Order Hearing Date: 1/6/2016. Denying (related document(s) 39 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Daniel B. O'Brien) Appearances: Hollinger, O'Brien.
44
01/27/2016
NEGATIVE NOTICE Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan to increase payments Objections to Trustee Motion to Modify the Plan due by 2/17/2016. (Chapter 13 Trustee (Auto-File))
45
02/18/2016
Objection Filed by Brandy A. Fraser (related document(s) 44 Motion to Modify Plan)
46
02/19/2016
Notice of Hearing Set on (related document(s) 44 Motion to Modify Plan, 45 Objection filed by Brandy A. Fraser) Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
47
02/21/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 46 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 02/21/2016.
doc
03/07/2016
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change Claim #8 with Certificate of Service
48
03/14/2016
Response/Objection to Debtor's Objection to Trustee's Motion to Increase Plan Payments Filed by Hope Enterprise Corporation Timothy J. Anzenberger (Pro Hac) (related document(s) 45 Objection filed by Brandy A. Fraser) (Anzenberger (Pro Hac), Timothy)
49
03/14/2016
Hearing Set on (related document(s) 48 Response to Document filed by Hope Enterprise Corporation) Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
50
03/16/2016
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 3/16/2016. (related document(s) 44 Motion to Modify Plan, 48 Response to Document filed by Hope Enterprise Corporation) Hearing continued to 4/20/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602. Appearances: Hollinger, Hartley, O'Brien.
51
04/20/2016
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: MOHELA on behalf of TSAC (Claim No. 1) To ECMC. Fee Amount $25 To ECMCPO BOX 16408ST.PAUL, MN 55116-0408 Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation.
52
04/20/2016
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Nelnet on behalf of ASA (Claim No. 3) To ECMC. Fee Amount $25 To ECMC Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation.
04/20/2016
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(15-01978) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 6651038, in the amount of $ 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/20/2016
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(15-01978) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 6651038, in the amount of $ 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
04/20/2016
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 4/20/2016. (related document(s) 44 Motion to Modify Plan, 48 Response to Document filed by Hope Enterprise Corporation) Hearing continued to 5/25/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602. Appearances: Hartley, Hollinger, O'Brien, Anzenberger.
54
04/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 51 Transfer of Claim filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation) Notice Date 04/27/2016.
55
04/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 52 Transfer of Claim filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation) Notice Date 04/27/2016.
56
05/13/2016
Order Granting Motion To Modify Plan. (Related Doc # 44) Signed on 5/13/2016.
57
05/15/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 56 Order on Motion to Modify Plan (Batch)) Notice Date 05/15/2016.
58
05/20/2016
Amended Order Granting Motion To Modify Plan. (Related Doc # 44) Signed on 5/20/2016.
59
05/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 58 Order on Motion to Modify Plan (Batch)) Notice Date 05/22/2016.
61
07/27/2016
Notice of Hearing Set on (related document(s) 60 Motion to Waive Discharge filed by Brandy A. Fraser) Hearing scheduled for 8/31/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
62
07/29/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 61 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 07/29/2016.
63
08/22/2016
Application to Employ Paul Carter as Real Estate Broker Filed by Frances Hoit Hollinger on behalf of Brandy A. Fraser.
64
08/22/2016
Notice of Hearing Set on (related document(s) 63 Application to Employ filed by Brandy A. Fraser) Hearing scheduled for 9/28/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
65
08/24/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 64 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 08/24/2016.
66
09/01/2016
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 8/31/2016. (related document(s) 60 Motion to Waive Discharge filed by Brandy A. Fraser. Granted. Order due by 9/15/2016 from Hollinger. Appearances: Hollinger, O'Brien.
67
09/16/2016
FINAL NOTICE of Order Due. To Be Filed By Frances Hoit Hollinger. If the order is not received by Final Due Date a Show Cause hearing may be set. (related document(s) 60 Motion to Waive Discharge filed by Brandy A. Fraser, 66 Minute Entry) Final Notice of Order due by 9/23/2016.
69
09/28/2016
Minute Entry Order Hearing Date: 9/28/2016. Denying (related document(s) 63 Application to Employ filed by Brandy A. Fraser) Appearances: Hollinger, Hartley, O'Brien.
70
09/30/2016
Claim Status Updated: Re: Claim Number(s) 10 (related document(s) 58 Order on Motion to Modify Plan (Batch), 68 Order on Motion to Waive Discharge) (related document(s) 58 Order on Motion to Modify Plan (Batch), 68 Order on Motion to Waive Discharge)
72
09/30/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 68 Order on Motion to Waive Discharge) Notice Date 09/30/2016.
73
10/02/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 71 Order on Motion to Waive Discharge) Notice Date 10/02/2016.
74
10/27/2016
Motion to Amend Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Frances Hoit Hollinger on behalf of Brandy A. Fraser. (related document(s) 9 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Brandy A. Fraser)
1
Supplement Mailing Matrix
1 Attachment
75
10/27/2016
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Post Conditional Confirmation Filed by Brandy A. Fraser (related document(s) 74 Motion to Amend Chapter 13 Plan filed by Brandy A. Fraser)
76
10/27/2016
Notice of Amended Schedule(s)Schedule I,Schedule J. Post Conditional Confirmation of Plan Filed by Frances Hoit Hollinger on behalf of Brandy A. Fraser.
77
10/27/2016
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Amended Schedule(s)Schedule I -Your Income,Schedule J - Current Expenditures, for Individual case. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor 1 Brandy A. Fraser
78
10/27/2016
Cumulative Statement Filed on the behalf of: Debtor 1 Brandy A. Fraser
79
10/27/2016
Notice of Hearing Set on (related document(s) 74 Motion to Amend Chapter 13 Plan filed by Brandy A. Fraser, 75 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Post-Confirmation filed by Brandy A. Fraser) Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
80
10/29/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 79 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 10/29/2016.
81
11/22/2016
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Brandy A. Fraser
82
12/02/2016
Minute Entry: Hearing Date: 11/30/2016.
83
12/13/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Chapter 13 Trustee (Auto-File))
84
12/13/2016
Motion for Relief from Stay with Certificate of Service. Fee Amount is $181.00 Filed by Bowdy J. Brown of Sasser, Sefton & Brown, P.C. on behalf of Alabama Housing Finance Authority.
1
Exhibit A - Mortgage #
2
Exhibit B - Affidavit
2 Attachments
12/13/2016
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(15-01978) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7001149, in the amount of $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
12/13/2016
Fact Summary Sheet for Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Bowdy J. Brown of Sasser, Sefton & Brown, P.C. on behalf of Alabama Housing Finance Authority.(related document(s) 84 Motion for Relief from Stay with Certificate of Service. Fee Amount is $181.00 filed by Alabama Housing Finance Authority)
86
12/13/2016
Notice of Hearing Set on Relief from Stay Motion and Order Extending the Automatic Stay. (related document(s) 84 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Alabama Housing Finance Authority) Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1, 201 St. Louis Street, Mobile AL 36602.
87
12/15/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 86 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 12/15/2016.
88
12/15/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 83 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan) Notice Date 12/15/2016.
12/19/2016
Motion Satisfied. (related document(s) 74 Motion to Amend Chapter 13 Plan filed by Brandy A. Fraser, 83 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan) (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
12/20/2016
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 84) Signed on 12/20/2016.
90
12/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) 89 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay) Notice Date 12/22/2016.
93
12/13/2018
Notice of LBF283 Due
94
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.