Brekeen v. Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2016-cv-00517 (ared)

SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff must file a Brief by 11/17/2016; Defendant must file a Brief within 42 days of the date Plaintiff's Brief is served; and other briefing requirements. Signed by Deputy Clerk at the direction of the Court on 10/6/2016.

Case 4:16-cv-00517-BD Document 9 Filed 10/06/16 Page 1 of 2 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT EASTERN DISTRICT OF ARKANSAS WESTERN DIVISION MICHAEL TODD BREKEEN PLAINTIFF v. NO. 4:16-CV-517-BD CAROLYN W. COLVIN, ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION DEFENDANT SCHEDULING ORDER Plaintiff seeks review of the determination of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. The Commissioner has filed an Answer to the Complaint and transcript of the administrative proceedings. Plaintiff must file a brief in support of the allegations of the Complaint on or before November 17, 2016. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff’s failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within 42 days of the date Plaintiff’s brief is served. Defendant’s brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff’s brief and may include additional relevant issues. After briefs have been filed, an oral argument hearing by telephone may be scheduled. Each party must serve a copy of its brief on the opposing party the day of filing and file a certificate of service with the brief. Briefs should provide a short and concise history of the administrative proceedings and statement of facts. Plaintiff’s brief must identify specific points for appeal, together with relevant law and argument, and Case 4:16-cv-00517-BD Document 9 Filed 10/06/16 Page 2 of 2 Defendant’s brief must respond to each argument raised by the Plaintiff, preferably in the same order. All briefs must include citations of legal authority to support the arguments made. These citations should include specific page references within the case where the cited point is discussed. Briefs must also identify facts to support the legal arguments made and include citations to referenced portions of the transcript supporting the party’s arguments. Any argument in a brief that is not supported by relevant law and argument (with citation to relevant portions of the transcript), will be considered to have been waived by the briefing party. DATED this 6th day of October, 2016. AT THE DIRECTION OF THE COURT James W. McCormack, Clerk By:/s/Suzy Flippen Deputy Clerk

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 725 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/18/2016
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Todd Brekeen.
2
07/18/2016
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Michael Todd Brekeen.
1
https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/doc1/02713837234" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02713837234','104400','10','','2','0','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet).
1 Attachment
3
07/21/2016
ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the Clerk is directed to prepare summons and forward it to Mr. Breekeen's counsel for service of the Complaint upon the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/21/16.
07/21/2016
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to the counsel for service (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/28/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/28/2016.
5
09/30/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Earnie A. Joe on behalf of Social Security Administration
6
10/03/2016
ANSWER to [2] Complaint by Social Security Administration.
7
10/03/2016
NOTICE by Social Security Administration of Conventional Filing of the Administrative Transcript
8
10/05/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re 6 Answer to Complaint and 7 Notice of Filing. Document received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office.
9
10/06/2016
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff must file a Brief by 11/17/2016; Defendant must file a Brief within 42 days of the date Plaintiff's Brief is served; and other briefing requirements. Signed by Deputy Clerk at the direction of the Court on 10/6/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.