Brenden C. Humbert and Shena L. Humbert
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00441 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
05/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
doc
05/23/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
06/28/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
43
06/28/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
44
06/28/2018
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
45
06/29/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
46
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
47
07/05/2018
Certificate of Good Standing
48
07/05/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
49
07/05/2018
Entry of Appearance
50
07/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
51
07/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
07/05/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
08/06/2018
Stipulation
53
08/15/2018
Substitution of Attorney
54
08/15/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (CM11)
55
08/15/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
56
08/15/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
57
08/15/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
58
08/15/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
59
08/15/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
60
08/15/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
08/15/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
08/16/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
08/20/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
08/20/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
63
08/21/2018
Certificate of Service
64
08/22/2018
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
65
08/22/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
66
08/22/2018
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
67
08/22/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
68
08/22/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
69
08/22/2018
Affidavit of Service
09/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
09/14/2018
Generic Motion / Application
71
09/20/2018
Certificate of No Objection
72
09/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
09/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
09/28/2018
Approving Modification of Plan (BKPLAN05) (SA)
74
10/02/2018
Change of Address
10/04/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.