Brett Wayne Heathcock and Tammy Bullock Heathcock
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82163 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
07/24/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
07/24/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
09/11/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
50
11/11/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
56
02/06/2019
Objection to Claim
58
02/21/2019
Objection to Claim(s)
60
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.