Brittany Nicole Freeman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-05221 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/12/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Brittany Nicole Freeman
2
12/12/2017
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Freeman.
3
12/12/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Freeman
5
12/12/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Freeman.
6
12/12/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Freeman.
7
12/12/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Freeman.
8
12/12/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/11/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
9
12/13/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
12/13/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Freeman).
11
12/13/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
12
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
13
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Freeman). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
14
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
15
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/10/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
01/19/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
01/19/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
02/13/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/14/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/14/2018 (RE: related document(s)[8] Confirmation Hearing), [16] Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/13/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.