Brittany Nicole Handy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00238 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 18-00238-DSC Brittany Nicole Handy Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: crobey Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: pdf008 Total Noticed: 21 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db +Brittany Nicole Handy, 1241 Mountain Lane, Gardendale, AL 35071-4215 9612661 +AES/NCT, PO BOX 61047, HARRISBURG PA 17106-1047 9612663 #+BANK OF AMERICA, NC4-105-03-14, PO BOX 26012, GREENSBORO NC 27420-6012 9612664 ++BANK OF AMERICA, PO BOX 982238, EL PASO TX 79998-2238 (address filed with court: BANK OF AMERICA, PO BOX 982238, EL PASO TX 79998) 9612665 +BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS, % CREDIT PROTECTION, PO BOX 802068, DALLAS TX 75380-2068 9612667 +CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 30285, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0285 9612670 +GLENDRICK WILLIAMS, 1812 SLAYDEN AVENUE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35224-1444 9612671 +LECRAW REALTY MGMT, % WINSTON, WINSTON, ETC., 1800 12TH AVENUE SOUTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35205-4838 9612672 RAPITAL CAPITAL .COM, PO BOX 1469, KAHNAWAKE, QUEBEC JOL1BO 9612673 +REGIONS BANK, PO BOX 10247, BIRMINGHAM AL 35202-0247 9612674 +SILVER CLOUD FINANCIAL.COM, 635 STATE HWY 20, UPPER LAKE CA 95485-8793 9612677 +UAB ED, POB 2901, WINSTON SALEM NC 27102-2901 9612678 +UNIFUND CCR, LLC, % ZARZAUR & SCHWARTZ, PO BOX 11366, BIRMINGHAM AL 35202-1366 9612679 +US DEPT ED, ECMC/BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 16408, ST PAUL MN 55116-0408 9612680 +VERIZON, ATTN: WIRELESS BANKRUPTY ADMIN, 500 TECHNOLOGY DR STE 500, WELDON SPRINGS MO 63304-2225 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9612662 +E-mail/Text: ally@ebn.phinsolutions.com Jan 23 2018 01:41:09 ALLY FINANCIAL, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 380901, BLOOMINGTON MN 55438-0901 9612668 +E-mail/PDF: creditonebknotifications@resurgent.com Jan 23 2018 01:38:43 CREDIT ONE BANK NA, PO BOX 98873, LAS VEGAS NV 89193-8873 9612669 +E-mail/Text: Bankruptcy.Consumer@dish.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:10 DISH NETWORK, 9601 S MERIDIAN BLVD, ENGLEWOOD CO 80112-5905 9612675 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@ldf-holdings.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:54 SKYTRAIL CASH.COM, PO BOX 1115, LAC DU FLAMBEAU WI 54538-1115 9612676 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jan 23 2018 01:38:32 SYNCHRONY BANK/OLD NAVY, ATTN: BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 965060, ORLANDO FL 32896-5060 9612681 +E-mail/Text: kzoepfel@credit-control.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:44 VERIZON WIRELESS, % CREDIT CONTROL, LLC, 5757 PHANTOM DRIVE, STE 330, HAZELWOOD MO 63042-2429 TOTAL: 6 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9612666 ##+BRIGHTHOUSE NETWORK, 6429 1ST AVENUE SOUTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35212-1705 TOTALS: 0, * 0, ## 1 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '++' were redirected to the recipient's preferred mailing address pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 342(f)/Fed.R.Bank.PR.2002(g)(4). Addresses marked '#' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as requiring an update. While the notice was still deliverable, the notice recipient was advised to update its address with the court immediately. Addresses marked '##' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as undeliverable. Notices will no longer be delivered by the USPS to these addresses; therefore, they have been bypassed. The debtor's attorney or pro se debtor was advised that the specified notice was undeliverable. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING Case 18-00238-DSC13 Doc 11 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 6 District/off: 1126-2 User: crobey Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: pdf008 Total Noticed: 21 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 19, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort3@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 1 Case 18-00238-DSC13 Doc 11 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 6 IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA Fill in this information to identify your case: Debtor 1 Brittany Nicole Handy Check if this is an amended plan Name: First Middle Last Amends plan dated: Debtor 2 Part(s) amended: (Spouse, if filing) Name: First Middle Last Part 1 Part 5 Part 2 Part 6 Case number: Part 3 Part 8 (If known) Part 4 Part 9 Failure to check a box identifying a Part amended hereby may render that amendment ineffective. Chapter 13 Plan Part 1: Notices To Debtor(s): This form sets out options that may be appropriate in some cases, but the presence of an option on the form does not indicate that the option is appropriate in your circumstances. Plans that do not comply with local rules, administrative orders, and judicial rulings may not be confirmable. In the following notice to creditors, you must check each box that applies. Your failure to check a box that applies renders that provision ineffective. To Creditors: Your rights may be affected by this plan. Your claim may be reduced, modified, or eliminated. You should read this plan carefully and discuss it with your attorney, if you have one in this bankruptcy case. If you do not have an attorney, you may wish to consult one. If you oppose the plan's treatment of your claim or any provision of this plan, you or your attorney must file an objection to confirmation at least 7 days before the confirmation hearing, unless otherwise ordered. The Bankruptcy Court may confirm this plan without further notice if no objection to confirmation is made. See Bankruptcy Rule 3015. In addition, a proper proof of claim must be filed in order to be paid under this plan. The following matters may be of particular importance to you. Debtor(s) must check each box that applies. Debtor(s)' failure to check a box that applies renders that provision ineffective. The plan seeks to limit the amount of a secured claim, as set out in Part 3, § 3.2, which may result in a partial payment or no payment at all to the secured creditor. The plan requests the avoidance of a judicial lien or nonpossessory, nonpurchase-money security interest as set out in Part 3, § 3.4. The plan sets out nonstandard provision(s) in Part 9. Part 2: Plan Payments and Length of Plan 2.1 Debtor(s) will make regular payments to the trustee as follows: $250 per Bi-Weekly for 60 months Debtor(s) shall commence payments within thirty (30) days of the petition date. 2.2 Regular payments to the trustee will be made from future income in the following manner (check all that apply): Debtor(s) will make payments pursuant to a payroll deduction. Debtor(s) request a payroll deduction be issued to: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, 120 Corporate Blvd., Norfolk, VA 23502 Debtor(s) will make payments directly to the trustee. Chapter 13 Plan Page 1 Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 18-00238-DSC13 Doc 11 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 6 Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy Case number Eff (12/01/2017) Other (specify method of payment) 2.3 Income tax refunds and returns. Check one. Debtor(s) will retain any income tax refunds received during the plan term. Debtor(s) will supply the trustee with a copy of each income tax return filed during the plan term within 14 days of filing the return and will turn over to the trustee income tax refunds received during the plan term, if any. Debtor(s) will treat income refunds as follows: Debtor(s) believe they are not required to file income tax returns and do not expect to receive tax refunds during the plan term. 2.4 Additional payment (Check all that apply): None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 2.4 need not be completed or reproduced. 2.5 Adequate Protection Payments Any adequate protection payments shall be made as part of this plan; see Part 3 or Part 9 for details. The secured creditor must file a proof of claim in order to receive payment. Unless otherwise ordered, adequate protection payments through the trustee shall be made as funds are available after the proof of claim is properly filed. Part 3: Treatment of Secured Claims 3.1 Maintenance of payments and cure of defaults, if any, on long-term secured debts. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 3.1 need not be completed or reproduced. 3.2 Request for valuation of security, claim modification, and hearing on valuation. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 3.2 need not be completed or reproduced. The rest of § 3.2 will be effective only if the applicable box in Part 1 of this plan is checked. 3.3 Secured claims excluded from 11 U.S.C. § 506 and fully secured claims. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 3.3 need not be completed or reproduced. The claims listed below were incurred within 910 days before the petition date and secured by a purchase-money security interest in a motor vehicle acquired for the personal use of Debtor(s), or were incurred within 1 year of the petition date and secured by a purchase-money security interest in any other thing of value, or are fully secured. These claims will be paid in full under the plan with interest at the rate stated below. These payments will be disbursed by the trustee as specified below. Unless otherwise ordered, the amount stated on a proof of claim or amended proof of claim controls over any contrary amount listed below as to the estimated amount of the creditor's total claim, but the interest rate is controlled by the plan. Monthly Estimated Monthly Fixed Monthly Fixed Adequate Amount of Value of Interest Name of Creditor Collateral Payment to Payment to Protection Creditor's Collateral Rate Creditor Begin Payment Total Claim ALLY FINANCIAL $139.00 $21,757.00 2016 NISSAN ALTIMA, $13,850.00 5.00% $455.00 07/2018 25,094 MILES 3.4 Section 522(f) judicial lien and nonpossessory, nonpurchase-money ("Non-PPM") security interest avoidance. Check all that apply. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 3.4 need not be completed or reproduced. 3.5 Surrender of collateral. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 3.5 need not be completed or reproduced. Part 4: Treatment of Fees and Priority Claims 4.1 General Trustee's fees will be paid in full. Except as set forth in § 4.5, allowed priority claims also will be paid in full, without interest. Chapter 13 Plan Page 2 of 4 Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 18-00238-DSC13 Doc 11 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 6 Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy Case number Eff (12/01/2017) 4.2 Chapter 13 case filing fee. Check one. Debtor(s) intend to pay the Chapter 13 case filing fee through the plan. Debtor(s) intend to pay the Chapter 13 case filing fee directly to the Clerk of Court. 4.3 Attorney's fees. The total fee requested by Debtor(s)' attorney is $3,500.00. The amount of the attorney fee paid prepetition is $0.00. The balance of the fee owed to Debtor(s)' attorney is $3,500.00, payable as follows (check one): $500.00 at confirmation and $300.00 per month thereafter until 07/2018 and then $250.00 monthly until paid in full, or in accordance with any applicable administrative order regarding fees entered in the division where the case is pending. 4.4 Priority claims other than attorney's fees and domestic support obligations. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 4.4 need not be completed or reproduced. 4.5 Domestic support obligations. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 4.5 need not be completed or reproduced. Part 5: Treatment of Nonpriority Unsecured Claims 5.1 Nonpriority unsecured claims not separately classified. Allowed nonpriority unsecured claims that are not separately classified will be paid pro rata. 5.2 Percentage, Base, or Pot Plan. Check one. 100% Repayment Plan. This plan proposes to pay 100% of each allowed nonpriority unsecured claim. Percentage Plan. This plan proposes to pay % of each allowed nonpriority unsecured claim. Pot Plan. This plan proposes to pay $ 2,300.00, distributed pro rata to holders of allowed nonpriority unsecured claims. Base Plan. This plan proposes to pay $ to the trustee (plus any tax refunds, lawsuit proceeds, or additional payments pursuant to §§ 2.3 and 2.4). Holders of allowed nonpriority unsecured claims will receive the funds remaining, if any, after disbursements have been made to all other creditors provided for in this plan 5.3 Interest on allowed nonpriority unsecured claims not separately classified. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 5.3 need not be completed or reproduced. 5.4 Maintenance of payments and cure of any default on long-term nonpriority unsecured claims. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 5.4 need not be completed or reproduced. 5.5 Other separately classified nonpriority unsecured claims. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 5.5 need not be completed or reproduced. Part 6: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases 6.1 The executory contracts and unexpired leases listed below are assumed, will be treated as specified, and any defaults cured. Check one. None. If "None" is checked, the rest of § 6.1 need not be completed or reproduced. Assumed items. Current installment payments will be disbursed either by the trustee or paid directly by Debtor(s), as specified below. Arrearage payments will be disbursed by the trustee. The final two columns include only payments disbursed by the trustee rather than by Debtor(s). Amount of Description of leased property Current installment Monthly fixed Monthly fixed Name of Creditor arrearage to be or executory contract payment payment to creditor payment to begin paid Chapter 13 Plan Page 3 of 4 Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 18-00238-DSC13 Doc 11 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 5 of 6 Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy Case number Eff (12/01/2017) Amount of Description of leased property Current installment Monthly fixed Monthly fixed Name of Creditor arrearage to be or executory contract payment payment to creditor payment to begin paid TRENT HALL RESIDENTIAL LEASE $775.00/MO NA NA NA Disbursed by: Debtor(s) 6.2 The executory contracts and unexpired leases listed below are rejected: -NONE- Part 7: Sequence of Payments 7.1 Unless otherwise ordered, the trustee will make the monthly payments required in Parts 3 through 6 in the sequence of payments set forth in the administrative order for the division in which this case is pending. Part 8: Vesting of Property of the Estate 8.1 Property of the estate will vest in Debtor(s) (check one): Upon plan confirmation. Upon entry of Discharge Part 9: Nonstandard Plan Provisions None. If "None" is checked, the rest of Part 9 need not be completed or reproduced. Part 10: Signatures: Signature(s) of Debtor(s) required. Signature(s) of Debtor(s) (required): X /s/ Brittany Nicole Handy Date January 19, 2018 Brittany Nicole Handy X Date Signature of Attorney for Debtor(s): X /s/ Bradford W. Botes Date January 19, 2018 Bradford W. Botes 600 University Park Place Suite 510 Birmingham, AL 35209 (205) 802-2200 Name/Address/Telephone/Attorney for Debtor(s): By filing this document, Debtor(s), if not represented by an attorney, or the Attorney for Debtor(s) certif(ies) that the wording and order of the provisions in this Chapter 13 plan are identical to those contained in this district's Local Form, other than any nonstandard provisions included in Part 9. Chapter 13 Plan Page 4 of 4 Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 18-00238-DSC13 Doc 11 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 6 of 6

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 271 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/19/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Brittany Nicole Handy
2
01/19/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy.
4
01/19/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy.
5
01/19/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy.
01/19/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-00238-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21625276. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/19/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy.
7
01/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/14/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/20/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/30/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/18/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/16/2018.
8
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
9
01/20/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
01/24/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
11
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Brittany Nicole Handy). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
12
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.