Brittney Leanne Piazza
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00287 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/31/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/01/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
09/04/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/12/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.