Brown v. Riley, et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:2004-cv-00070 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/28/2004
COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunctive Relief (w/attachment) Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 100771
2
01/28/2004
SUMMONS issued for Bob Riley, Page Walley, Katey Russell and returned to plaintiffs counsel for service
3
01/29/2004
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bob Riley 1/28/04; Answer due on 2/17/04 for Bob Riley
4
01/29/2004
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Page Walley 1/28/04; Answer due on 2/17/04 for Page Walley
5
01/29/2004
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Katey Russell on 1/28/04; Answer due on 2/17/04 for Katey Russell
02/03/2004
NOTICE of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Tina Brown. (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/03/2004
File referred to Mag. Judge McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
02/17/2004
MOTION by Bob Riley, Page Walley, Katey Russell to Dismiss (w/exhibits A-D); referred to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson
02/18/2004
NOTICE of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Bob Riley, Page Walley, Katey Russell. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/20/2004
ORDER setting Response to Motion for plaintiff to 3/19/04 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss ; setting Reply to Response to Motion for defendant to 4/2/04 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss ; setting [6-1] motion to Dismiss by Katey Russell, Page Walley, Bob Riley for submission on 4/2/04; directing parties that on or before 03/05/04 to send to the clerk the attached consent form (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies provided to counsel.
03/23/2004
CASE reassigned to Judge Mark E. Fuller (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/23/2004
REFERRAL JUDGE assigned to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/23/2004
Motion(s) referred to Judge Mark E. Fuller : [6-1] motion to Dismiss referred to Judge Mark E. Fuller (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2004
File referred to Judge Fuller (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/06/2004
ORDER (rendered 04/05/04) Show Cause Response due by 4/14/2004 for plaintiff to show cause why 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Bob Riley, Page Walley, Katey Russell should not be granted. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 04/05/04.
9
06/07/2004
ORDER directing plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. It is further ordered that should plaintiff wish to file an untimely brief in opposition to the Motion to Dismiss, she must seek leave of the Court and show good cause for her failure to respond to this court's previous orders as further set out Show Cause Response due by 6/14/2004. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 06/07/04.
10
06/16/2004
MOTION to Withdraw 1 Complaint by Tina Brown.
06/16/2004
Motion to Withdraw Petition treated as a NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tina Brown (This document has no PDF attached, see document #10 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
06/17/2004
ORDER treating 10 MOTION to Withdraw 1 Complaint as a notice of dismissal under F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(i)2; dismissing without prejudice this action; advising that costs of this action should be taxed as paid; terminating all pending motions: 6 Motion to Dismiss and 10 MOTION to Withdraw 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 06/17/04.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.