Bruce A. Barcus
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00422 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
12/11/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
12/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
12/11/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/12/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
12/12/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
12/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
11
12/13/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
12
12/13/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
13
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
14
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
15
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
16
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
17
12/18/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
18
12/19/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
12/20/2018
Update Deadline (341 Meeting) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
12/21/2018
Change of Address
12/21/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
01/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/09/2019
Certificate of No Objection
01/23/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
23
01/23/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
01/23/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
05/21/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.