Bryan C. Wade and Rachel N. Wade
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2013-bk-00464 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
09/13/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
58
11/02/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
59
11/21/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
60
11/26/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
61
12/05/2018
Entry of Appearance
62
12/05/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
63
12/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
64
12/20/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
65
01/24/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
66
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/28/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.