Bryan Edward Stack
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-05149 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 124 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/05/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Bryan Edward Stack (Shinn, J.)
2
12/05/2017
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Edward Stack. (Shinn, J.)
4
12/05/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Bryan Edward Stack. (Shinn, J.)
5
12/05/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Bryan Edward Stack. (Shinn, J.)
6
12/05/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Bryan Edward Stack. (Shinn, J.)
7
12/05/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Bryan Edward Stack. (Shinn, J.)
12/05/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-05149-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21474509. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/05/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/04/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
9
12/06/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
12/06/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
11
12/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/07/2017.
12
12/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bryan Edward Stack). Notice Date 12/08/2017.
13
12/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/08/2017.
14
12/18/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
12/19/2017
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Trustmark National Bank-cf.
16
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/10/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
17
01/15/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor [AMENDED] Filed by Debtor Bryan Edward Stack. (Shinn, J.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.