Bryan R Howey and Dana L Howey
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-00005 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
147
08/13/2018
Application for Allowance and Payment of Compensation for Chapter 12 Trustee
149
08/15/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
151
09/18/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
152
10/22/2018
Entry of Appearance
153
10/22/2018
Allow Filing of Late Filed Claim (CM02)
154
10/22/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
155
10/28/2018
Certificate of Service
156
11/26/2018
Certificate of No Objection
11/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
12/11/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
158
12/13/2018
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
159
12/13/2018
Declaration
160
12/13/2018
Stay
161
12/13/2018
Shorten Time
162
12/13/2018
Shorten Time
163
12/14/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
164
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
165
12/18/2018
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
166
12/18/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
167
12/19/2018
Order to Allow Filing of Late Filed Claim
168
12/20/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
169
12/20/2018
Declaration
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
170
12/21/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
171
12/21/2018
Proceeding Memo
172
12/21/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
173
12/27/2018
Stay
12/27/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
175
01/08/2019
Witness List
176
01/08/2019
Witness List
177
01/09/2019
Witness List
178
01/14/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
179
01/14/2019
Memorandum in Support
180
01/14/2019
Exhibit List
181
01/14/2019
Exhibit List
182
01/14/2019
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
01/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
183
01/17/2019
Certificate of Service
184
01/18/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
185
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
186
01/23/2019
Proceeding Memo
187
01/23/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
188
01/23/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
189
01/31/2019
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
190
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
191
02/01/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)
192
02/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
193
02/04/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
194
02/08/2019
Amended Order (SA)
195
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
196
02/19/2019
Memorandum in Support
197
03/07/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
198
03/12/2019
Proceeding Memo
199
03/13/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
200
03/14/2019
Application for Allowance and Payment of Compensation for Chapter 12 Trustee
201
03/14/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
202
03/14/2019
Certificate of Service
03/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
203
03/22/2019
Modify Plan (BKPLAN05)
204
03/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
205
04/08/2019
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
04/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
206
04/08/2019
Certificate of No Objection
207
04/09/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
208
04/09/2019
Dismiss Case
209
04/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/14/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.