Bryan Scott Sanford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05212 (alnb)

Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s)[40] Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s)[36] Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).).).

Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 47 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:26:39 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 6 Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 47 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:26:39 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 6 Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 47 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:26:39 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 6 Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 47 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:26:39 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 6 Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 47 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:26:39 Desc Main Document Page 5 of 6 United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re Bryan Scott Sanford Case No. 17-05212 Debtor(s) Chapter 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on February 13, 2018, a copy of attached was served electronically or by regular United States mail to all interested parties, the Trustee and all creditors required /s/ Brent W. Davis Brent W. Davis ASB-5320-I45B Brent W. Davis & Associates, L.L.C. 2700 Rogers Drive Suite 106 Birmingham, AL 35209-2055 205-989-1919Fax:1-866-825-8756 brent@brentwdavis.com Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 47 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:26:39 Desc Main Document Page 6 of 6

Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) [41] Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of IRS in the amount of $50,479.28 Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: SANFORD, Bryan CASE # 17-05212 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM COME(S) NOW, the Debtor in the abovestyled case, by and through the(ir) attorney of record, and gives Notice of Withdrawal of the previously filed: 1. Document #41, Objection to Claim of IRS. 2. The objection was a duplicate. _/s/ Brent W Davis Brent W. Davis, Attorney for Debtors Brent W Davis,& Associates, LLC 2700 Rogers Drive, Suite 106 Homewood Alabama 35209-2055 Phone (205) 989-1919 ~ Fax 866-825-8756 Email brent@brentwdavis.com Tuesday, February 13, 2018 Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 48 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:28:00 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re Bryan Scott Sanford Case No. 17-05212 Debtor(s) Chapter 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on February 13, 2018, a copy of attached was served electronically or by regular United States mail to all interested parties, the Trustee and all creditors required /s/ Brent W. Davis Brent W. Davis ASB-5320-I45B Brent W. Davis & Associates, L.L.C. 2700 Rogers Drive Suite 106 Birmingham, AL 35209-2055 205-989-1919Fax:1-866-825-8756 brent@brentwdavis.com Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 48 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 15:28:00 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Max C. Pope Jr Filed by Creditor Kim Gadilhe.

IN THE UNITED BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In Re: Bryan S. Sanford SSN: XXX - XX - 3353 3635 Timber Way Helena, AL 35022 A A Bankruptcy Case No .: AA | 17 - 05212 - TOM - 13 3 Debtor. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE COMES NOW, Max C. Pope, Jr ., on behalf of Kem Gadilhe, Creditor, in the above referenced proceeding, and hereby enters their appearance for the Creditor, and pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule Procedure 2002, requests their name and address be added to the mailing list maintained by the clerk and all notices given or required to be given and all papers served, be forwarded to him at the address below. Dated the 14th day of February, 2018. Mn C. Max C. Pope, Jr. Attorney for Kim Gadilhe Post Office Box 2958 Birmingham, Alabama 35202 (205) 930 - 6851 Case 17 - 05212 - TOM13 Doc 49 Filed 02 / 14 / 18 Entered 02 / 14 / 18 11: 54: 36 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on the 14th day of February, 2018, I have served a copy of the foregoing Notice of Appearance on the parties listed below by depositing the same in the United States Mail, postage prepaid and properly addressed, via electronic mail at the e - mail address below, unless the party being served is a registered participant in the CM / ECF System for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Alabama, service has been made by a " Notice of Electronic Filing " pursuant to FRBP 9036 in accordance with subparagraph II. B. 4. of the Court's Administrative Procedures as indicated below: Served via Notice of Electronic Filing: D. Sims Crawford ctimaillach13bham. com scrawford13 @ ecf. epiqsystems. com Chapter 13 Standing Trustee Post Office Box 10848 Birmingham, Alabama 35202 - 0848 Served via Notice of Electronic Filing: Brent William Davis brent @ brentwdavis. com Brent W. Davis & Associates, L. L. C. 2700 Rogers Drive Suite 106 Homewood, AL 35209 - 2055 L. Max C. Pope, Jr. Case 17 - 05212 - TOM13 Doc 49 _ Filed 02 / 14 / 18 Entered 02 / 14 / 18 11: 54: 36 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) [23] Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).).

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In Re: Bryan Scott Sanford SSN: XXX - XX - 3353 } Case No: 17 - 05212 - TOM Chapter: 13 Debtor. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTION TO CONFIRMATION FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A. Comes now, WELLS FARGO BANK, N. A ., by and through its undersigned counsel of record, Sirote & Permutt, P. C ., and withdraws its objection to Confirmation filed on December 29, 2017. Respectfully submitted, / s / Thomas G. Tutten, Jr. Thomas G. Tutten, Jr. (TUT - 003) * * * Diane Murray (MUR - 048) Enslen Crowe (CRO - 098) Donald M. Wright (WRI - 021) Attorney for Creditor Case 17 - 05212 - TOM13 Doc 50 Filed 02 / 14 / 18 Entered 02 / 14 / 18 12: 42: 00 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify in accordance with Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4001 (a), 9014, and 7004 that a copy of the above and foregoing pleading was mailed, first class postage prepaid to the following: Bryan Scott Sanford 3635 Timber Way Bessemer, AL 35022 and served via electronic case management to: Brent William Davis 2700 Rogers Drive Suite 106 Homewood, AL 35209 - 2055 brent @ brentwdavis. com Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee PO Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 - 0848 ctmail @ ch 13bham. com On this the [ 4 _ day of _ en 2018. / s / Thomas G. Tutten, Jr y OF COUNSEL Case 17 - 05212 - TOM13 Doc 50 Filed 02 / 14 / 18 Entered 02 / 14 / 18 12: 42: 00 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[44] Notice of Amendment to Schedules (prior to confirmation)). Notice Date 02/14/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-05212-TOM Bryan Scott Sanford Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: pbgray Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: van005 Total Noticed: 2 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 14, 2018. db +Bryan Scott Sanford, 3635 Timber Way, Bessemer, AL 35022-4185 9634409 +Kem Gadihle, c/o John Bahakel, 2131 -12th Ave North, Birmingham AL 35234-2719 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. NONE. TOTAL: 0 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 14, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 12, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford brent@brentwdavis.com, bwdllcmyecfmail@gmail.com;brentwdavisassociatesllc@gmail.com;r41804@notify.bestcase.com Thomas G Tutten on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ndbankruptcy@sirote.com TOTAL: 3 Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 51 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 Van−005 [Amd Sch Pre−Confirmation] (Rev. 03/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−05212−TOM13 Bryan Scott Sanford Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−3353 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULES Notice is hereby given that on 02/10/2018 the Debtor filed an Amendment to Schedules and added the following creditor(s): Kem Gadihle A meeting of creditors pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §341(a) was (or will be) held on 1/10/18, at 10:30 AM, in Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203. A hearing on confirmation of the plan will be held on 2/22/18, at 11:00 AM, in Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 3, Birmingham, AL 35203. The Court may consider objections to confirmation of the plan and Debtor's attorney's claim for fees as well as conversion or dismissal of this case on a written request made before the hearing by any party in interest. Upon filing of the petition, certain acts and proceedings against the Debtor, Co−debtor, and the estate are stayed as provided in 11 U.S.C. §362(a) and 1301. Creditors: File your claim(s) now. A claim not filed by the claims bar date generally is not allowed. It is not necessary to refile if you have already filed a proof of claim. A proof of claim form can be obtained at any bankruptcy clerk's office or by visiting www.uscourts.gov/forms/bankruptcy−forms. Claims can be filed electronically through the court's website at: www.alnb.uscourts.gov/electronic−proof−claim. Dated: February 12, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court pbg Case 17-05212-TOM13 Doc 51 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/11/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Bryan Scott Sanford
2
12/11/2017
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
3
12/11/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford
5
12/11/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
6
12/11/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
7
12/11/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
12/12/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Bryan Scott Sanford Case Number 17-02628, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/20/2017, Dismissed for Other Reason on 08/18/2017; Case Number 16-00619, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/19/2016, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 05/01/2017.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/12/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 02/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/11/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/12/2018.
9
12/12/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
12/12/2017
Order Denying Application for Payment of Filing Fees in Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor's Application to pay the filing fee in installments is hereby DENIED because filing fees from a prior case or cases are unpaid. All filing fees in the current case are due and payable. This case will be set for show cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to pay fees by separate notice of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (Non-Image Order) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford).
11
12/12/2017
Notice to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Pay Filing Fee. Show Cause hearing to be held on 1/11/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
12
12/12/2017
Notes: Filing fee in the amount of $210.00 and amendment to schedule fee in the amount of $31.00 not paid in case number 17-02628-TOM-13. (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford).
13
12/12/2017
Motion to Impose Automatic Stay Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford
14
12/13/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 13 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford). Hearing scheduled 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
15
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
16
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
17
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
18
12/14/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice to Show Cause). Notice Date 12/14/2017.
19
12/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 14 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/15/2017.
20
12/26/2017
Objection to (related document(s): 13 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford) Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
21
12/26/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 20 Objection filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
22
12/29/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
23
12/29/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).
24
01/02/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
25
01/02/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 23 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
26
01/04/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/4/2018 10:26:18 AM ]. File Size [ 2114 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:52 ]. (RE: Doc #13; Debtor's Motion to Impose Automatic Stay). (adiuser).
27
01/05/2018
Order Conditionally Granting Debtor's Motion to Impose Automatic Stay. Order Conditionally Overruling Objection to Debtor's Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Tom Tutten, Attorney for Wells Fargo. Signed on 1/5/2018 (RE: related document(s) 13 Motion to Impose Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford, 20 Objection filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.). It is further Ordered, as to Wells Fargo, the Debtor shall make each and every monthly mortgage payment pursuant to the terms of the note and mortgage. Further, the Debtor shall also cause every Chapter 13 plan payment to be posted in a timely manner.
28
01/07/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of IRS in the amount of $50,479.28 Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
01/07/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-05212-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21576348. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order Granting). Notice Date 01/07/2018.
30
01/08/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
31
01/08/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent Davis, Attorney for Debtor, has filed a plan with the pages not in the correct order. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should file the plan with the pages in the correct order. If he filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford). (thc) Modified on 1/8/2018
32
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
33
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Notice of Incorrect Event/Filing). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
34
01/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/10/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
35
01/12/2018
Second Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent Davis, Attorney for Debtor, has filed a plan with the pages not in the correct order. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should file the plan with the pages in the correct order. If he filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford).
36
01/19/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).
37
01/22/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
38
01/23/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 37 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
39
01/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/25/2018.
40
02/10/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s) 36 Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).).
41
02/10/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of IRS in the amount of $50,479.28 Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
42
02/10/2018
Amended Schedule A/B: Property Individual, Amended Schedule C, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
43
02/10/2018
Amended Schedules. F Fee Amount $31 Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.
02/10/2018
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)(17-05212-TOM13) [misc,amdsch2] (31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21708523. Fee Amount 31.00 (re:Doc# 43) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
02/12/2018
Notice of Amendment to Schedules (RE: related document(s) 43 Amended Schedules (Fee) filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford).
45
02/12/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, did not signed the pleading when filing the Amended Chapter 13 Plan. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should amend the Chapter 13 Plan ensuring it is signed and dated by all required parties. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s)[40] Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford).
46
02/12/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, filed a duplicate pleading (pleading has already been set for hearing) when filing the Debtor's Objection to Claim #2 of IRS. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should file a Corrective Entry or if amending, file an Amended Objection to Claim. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s)[41] Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford).
47
02/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s)[40] Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s)[36] Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).).).
48
02/13/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) [41] Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of IRS in the amount of $50,479.28 Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).
49
02/14/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Max C. Pope Jr Filed by Creditor Kim Gadilhe.
50
02/14/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) [23] Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Bryan Scott Sanford.).).
51
02/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[44] Notice of Amendment to Schedules (prior to confirmation)). Notice Date 02/14/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.