Buntin v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00073 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 55 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/06/2016
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-16-05240 CI. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2115626)
1
Exhibit A - State Court Summons
2
Exhibit B - State Court Complaint
3
Exhibit C - State Court Discovery Request
3 Attachments
2
04/06/2016
Civil Cover Sheet.
3
04/06/2016
DECLARATION of Mitch Williamson re 1 Notice of Removal, by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mitch Williamson
1 Attachment
4
04/06/2016
ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days.
5
04/18/2016
NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants
6
04/20/2016
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.
7
04/21/2016
INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order.
8
04/22/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Samuel Zurik, III. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2125096.) by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
9
04/22/2016
DECLARATION of Samuel Zurik, III re 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Samuel Zurik, III. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2125096.) by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
10
04/22/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Robert P. Lombardi. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2125118.) by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
11
04/22/2016
DECLARATION of Robert P. Lombardi re 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Robert P. Lombardi. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2125118.) by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
12
04/25/2016
CLERK'S NOTICE re 8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Zurik, III, at docket 8, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
13
04/25/2016
CLERK'S NOTICE re 10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert P. Lombardi, at docket 10, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
14
04/26/2016
NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation
1
Exhibit A -- Summons
2
Exhibit B -- Complaint
3
Exhibit C -- Notice of Removal
3 Attachments
15
04/27/2016
Notice to Counsel re 14 Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s) filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Aaron Boogaerts. A review of the document submitted at dkt 14 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 14. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
05/18/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
18
05/23/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
19
05/23/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
20
05/23/2016
DECLARATION of A. Boogaerts re 19 Response in Opposition to Motion by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
21
06/03/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Remand filed by Travis Buntin.
22
08/18/2016
MOTION for Protective Order by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Good Faith Certificate
2
Exhibit A -- Proposed Protective Order
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
6
Exhibit E
6 Attachments
23
08/18/2016
DECLARATION of Robert P. Lombardi re 22 MOTION for Protective Order by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
24
09/06/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Travis Buntin.
25
09/06/2016
DECLARATION of Daniel I. Pace re 24 Response in Opposition to Motion by Travis Buntin.
26
09/13/2016
Reply to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Modified on 10/4/2016 to correct dkt text. Wrong event selected.
27
12/22/2016
ORDER denying 16 Motion to Remand and denying 21 request for costs and attorney's fees for improper removal. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 12/22/2016.
28
12/30/2016
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit An Amended Rule 26(f) Report by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
29
01/04/2017
ORDER granting 22 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 1/4/2017.
30
01/04/2017
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File An Amended Rule 26(f) Report. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer for purposes of amending the Rule 26(f) report. The parties shall submit their amended Rule 26(f) report to the Court no later than 1/12/2017. The Court HEREBY SETS a Status Conference for 1/17/2017 at 1:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess.
31
01/11/2017
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
32
01/12/2017
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
33
01/12/2017
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Appear Telephonically for Court's January 17, 2017 Status Conference by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
34
01/12/2017
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel by Defendants. Pursuant to D.Ak. LR 11(c), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that David A. Devine of Groh Eggers, LLC, is withdrawn as local counsel for Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Aaron D. Sperbeck of Birch, Horton, Bittner & Cherot is substituted as local counsel for Defendants.
35
01/12/2017
Consent MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Court's January 17, 2017 Status Conference by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
36
01/12/2017
AFFIDAVIT of Robert P. Lombardi re 35 Consent MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Court's January 17, 2017 Status Conference by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
37
01/12/2017
TMB TEXT ORDER: The 35 Motion to Expedite Consideration and 33 the Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for the January 17, 2017 Status Conference ARE HEREBY GRANTED. Counsel may appear telephonically by calling (907) 677-6246, using access code 599153, approximately five minutes before the hearing is scheduled to start.
38
01/17/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Status Conference held on 1/17/2017. Expert Discovery and Close of Discovery amended to read 11/15/2017.
39
02/15/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Martin J. Regimbal. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2283497.) by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
40
02/15/2017
DECLARATION of Martin J. Regimbal re 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Martin J. Regimbal. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2283497.) by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
41
02/15/2017
CLERK'S NOTICE re 39 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Martin J. Regimbal, at docket 39, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
42
02/23/2017
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/15/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2017.Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 2/23/2017. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
43
03/15/2017
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Exhibit --Proposed Pleading
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
44
04/10/2017
ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/10/2017. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
45
04/11/2017
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
46
05/15/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery or, in the Alternative, to Clarify Court's Scheduling and Planning Order by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
47
05/16/2017
TMB TEXT ORDER Re: 46 Motion for Extension to Complete Discovery or to Clarify Scheduling and Planning Order. Pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Order at docket 42, all discovery in this matter, including fact discovery, must be completed by November 15, 2017. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is DENIED AS MOOT. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
48
05/25/2017
NOTICE of Discovery Deposition by Schlumberger Technology Corporation
49
06/23/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Bryan Edward Bowdler by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
50
06/23/2017
Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Bryan Edward Bowdler as to Defendants Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation. re 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Bryan Edward Bowdler.
51
07/07/2017
CLERK'S NOTICE re 49 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bryan Edward Bowdler, at docket 49, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
52
07/12/2017
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Breach of Contract Claim by Travis Buntin.
53
07/24/2017
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 52 Stipulation of Dismissal of Breach of Contract Claim. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice at docket 52, Plaintiff Travis Buntin's breach of contract claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
54
09/13/2017
Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
55
09/29/2017
TMB TEXT ORDER: The Joint Motion to Continue Discovery Deadlines at docket 54 is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to supplement their disclosures and discovery responses in accordance with Rule 26(e) is hereby extended to November 15, 2017; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to file and serve a final witness list is hereby extended to November 15, 2017. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 10/2/2017 to correct typo in date. NEF regenerated.
56
11/15/2017
Witness List by Aaron Boogaerts, Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
57
11/15/2017
Witness List by Travis Buntin.
58
11/17/2017
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Aaron Boogaerts by Travis Buntin.
59
12/15/2017
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Table of Exhibits
2
Exhibit 2 -- Excerpts of Deposition of F. Borowski
3
Exhibit 3 -- Excerpts of Deposition of T. Buntin
4
Exhibit 5 -- Remuneration Statements for T. Buntin
5
Exhibit 6 -- Job Description
6
Exhibit 9 -- Excerpts of Deposition of A. Boogaerts
7
Exhibit 10 -- Evaluation Prepared by T. Buntin
8
Exhibit 11 -- SLP3s Prepared by T. Buntin
8 Attachments
60
12/15/2017
DECLARATION of Florian Borowski (Exhibit 1 to Motion for Summary Judgment) re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
61
12/15/2017
DECLARATION of Caleb Piaskowski (Exhibit 4 to Motion for Summary Judgment) re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
62
12/15/2017
DECLARATION of Aaron Boogaerts (Exhibit 7 to Motion for Summary Judgment) re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
63
12/15/2017
DECLARATION of Sherri Ross (Exhibit 8 to Motion for Summary Judgment) re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
64
12/15/2017
AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Dunham (Exhibit 12 to Motion for Summary Judgment) re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
65
12/15/2017
DECLARATION of Mitch Williamson (Exhibit 13 to Motion for Summary Judgment) re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
66
01/05/2018
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment Stipulation by Travis Buntin. Modified on 1/9/2018
67
01/16/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER APPROVING 66 stipulation for extension of time as to 59 motion for summary judgment by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Pursuant to this stipulation, Plaintiff is directed to file their opposition to 59 by January 19, 2018, and Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation is directed to file any reply by February 9, 2018. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
68
01/19/2018
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Travis Buntin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
69
01/19/2018
SEALED DOCUMENT re 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibit 1 by Travis Buntin.
70
01/19/2018
DECLARATION of Daniel I. Pace re 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Travis Buntin.
71
01/22/2018
RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Exhibit 1 - Email dated January 3, 2018
2
Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Letter dated January 18, 2018
3
Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Plaintiff's Deposition
4
Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of 30(b)(6) Deposition
5
Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Boogaerts' Deposition
5 Attachments
72
01/22/2018
DECLARATION of Martin J. Regimbal (Exhibit 3 to Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 68) re 71 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
73
01/26/2018
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Travis Buntin.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
74
01/26/2018
DECLARATION of Daniel I. Pace re 73 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Travis Buntin.
75
01/29/2018
REPLY to Response to Motion re 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Travis Buntin.
1
Exhibit 2
1 Attachment
76
01/30/2018
RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Travis Buntin.
1
Appendix
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 8
8
Exhibit 9
9
Exhibit 10
10
Exhibit 11
11
Exhibit 12
12
Exhibit 13
13
Exhibit 14
14
Exhibit 15
15
Exhibit 16
16
Exhibit 17
17
Exhibit 18
18
Exhibit 19
19
Exhibit 20
20
Exhibit 21
21
Exhibit 222
22
Exhibit 23
23
Exhibit 24
23 Attachments
77
01/30/2018
DECLARATION of Travis Buntin re 76 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Travis Buntin.
78
01/30/2018
**STRICKEN** MOTION for Summary Judgment by Travis Buntin. Modified on 5/29/2018 to indicate stricken per dkt 91.
79
02/01/2018
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
80
02/06/2018
Joint STIPULATION Unopposed Motion Regarding Non-Opposition of Either Party to Pending Motions for Extension of Time to Oppose and/or Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
81
02/09/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 80 Joint Stipulated Motion Regarding Pending Motions for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition at 76 to Defendant's motion for summary judgment at 59 is deemed timely, and Defendant is directly to file any reply by February 27, 2018. Plaintiff's motions for extensions of time at 68 and 73 and Defendant's motion for an extension of time at 79 are DENIED AS MOOT. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
82
02/13/2018
MOTION to Strike 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike
1 Attachment
83
02/27/2018
REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Exhibit 14 - Additional Deposition Excerpts of Travis Buntin
2
Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Additional Deposition Excerpts of Florian Borowski
2 Attachments
84
02/27/2018
DECLARATION of Kelly Gonzales (Exhibit 15) re 83 Reply to Response to Motion, by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
85
02/27/2018
RESPONSE in Opposition re 82 MOTION to Strike 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Travis Buntin.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
86
03/01/2018
MOTION for Hearing re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment Request for Oral Argument by Travis Buntin.
87
03/01/2018
REPLY to Response to Motion re 82 MOTION to Strike 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
88
05/17/2018
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief - UNOPPOSED by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Modified on 5/18/2018 to create relationship to dkt 59.
1
Exhibit A - Supplemental Brief
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
89
05/25/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 86 Request for Oral Argument by Plaintiff Travis Buntin. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on 59 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is set for August 1, 2018 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
90
05/25/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 88 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Defendent is directed to file the supplemental brief at [88-1] by June 1, 2018. Plaintiff may file any supplemental response, limited to 10 pages, by June 15, 2018. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 5/29/2018 to correct date.
91
05/25/2018
ORDER: The Court concludes that Plaintiff has not shown good cause to amend under Rule 16(b), and GRANTS Defendant's motion to strike at docket 82. Plaintiff's cross-motion for partial summary judgment at docket 78 is hereby STRICKEN, and the Court will consider Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment at docket 76 only as a response. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/25/2018. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
92
05/29/2018
SUPPLEMENT Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Schlumberger Technology Corporation 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
93
06/15/2018
SUPPLEMENT by Travis Buntin 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation, 92 Supplement filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
94
07/11/2018
MOTION for Leave to File by Travis Buntin. Modified on 7/17/2018 to create relationship to dkt 59.
1
Exhibit 25
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
95
07/20/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 94 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File by Travis Buntin. Plaintiff may file Exhibit 25 to 76 Plaintiff's opposition to 59 Defendant's motion for summary judgment within five (5) days of this order. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
96
07/24/2018
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 25 to Supplement Plaintiff's Opposition by Travis Buntin re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 76 Response in Opposition to Motion
1
Exhibit 25
1 Attachment
97
07/26/2018
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Proposed Pleading
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
98
07/27/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER granting 97 Motion for Leave to File by Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Defendant may file the proposed response at [97-1] within two (2) days of this order.
99
07/27/2018
RESPONSE in Support re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
100
07/27/2018
DECLARATION of Caleb Piaskowski (Exhibit A to Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Authority) re 99 Response in Support of Motion by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
101
08/01/2018
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Hearing on motion for summary judgment 59 held 9:06 AM to 9:49 AM on 8/1/2018. Oral arguments heard. Motion for summary judgment 59 ; TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Written ruling to issue. APPEARANCES: Daniel Ian Pace for plf; Aaron David Sperbeck and Martin Joseph Regimbal for def; R. Joy Stancel, Official Court Reporter.
102
08/06/2018
ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment at Docket 59 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 8/6/2018. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
103
08/07/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A Status Conference is SET for 8/21/2018 at 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Counsel not located in Anchorage wishing to appear telephonically at the status conference are directed to call 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 9623794, five minutes prior to the hearing start time. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
104
08/14/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Due to conflicts with the Court's calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference set for 8/21/2018 at 11:00 AM is RESET to 8/30/2018 at 4:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Timothy M. Burgess. Counsel not located in Anchorage wishing to appear telephonically at the status conference are directed to call 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 9623794, from a landline telephone five minutes prior to the hearing start time.
105
08/30/2018
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Status Conference held 4:02 PM to 4:06 PM on 8/30/2018. Court and counsel heard re mediation scheduled 10/30/2018 before Judge Andrews. Parties to file a Status Report by COB 10/31/2018. APPEARANCES: Daniel Ian Pace for plaintiff; Aaron David Sperbeck for defendant; Martin Regimbal-telephonic, for defendant; R. Joy Stancel, Official Court Reporter.
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
11/01/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER: In light of the 106 Joint Status Report, the Court HEREBY SETS a status conference in this matter for 11/9/2018 at 11:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
108
11/01/2018
MOTION Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone for November 9, 2018 Status Conference by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
11/01/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
11/01/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING 108 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Status Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 11:30 AM AKST in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before Judge Timothy M. Burgess. Counsel for Defendant is directed to call 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 9623794 from a landline telephone five minutes prior to the scheduled start time. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
110
11/09/2018
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy M. Burgess: Status Conference held at 11:37 AM - 11:44 AM on 11/9/2018. Court and counsel heard re updates from parties. Court needs more information from Alaska Supreme Court in regards to Alaska Wage and Hour Act. Court to certify this inquiry to the Alaska Supreme Court. APPEARANCES: Daniel Ian Pace, for Plaintiff; Aaron David Sperbeck and Martin Regimbal (telephonic), for Defendants; R. Joy Stancel, Official Court Reporter.
111
11/14/2018
ORDER CERTIFYING QUESTION TO THE ALASKA SUPREME COURT: The parties shall notify this Court whether the Alaska Supreme Court accepts the certified question in a joint report to be filed within 7 days of the Alaska Supreme Court's decision. The Clerk of Court shall provide a signed copy of this order under the official seal of the United States District Court for the District of Alaska. The Clerk of Court shall also provide a copy of the record in this case, in whole or in part, to the Alaska Supreme Court upon request. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/14/2018.(NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
112
11/19/2018
MOTION to Enforce Protective Order by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
1
Exhibit A - Notice of Records Deposition
2
Exhibit B - Subpoena
3
Exhibit C - Correspondence with Daniel Pace
4
Exhibit D - Email Exchange with Farris Counsel
5
Proposed Order
5 Attachments
113
11/20/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER SETTING DEADLINE as to 112 Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation's Motion to Enforce Protective Order. Defendant did not request shortened time re 112 Motion to Enforce Protective Order, but in light of the impending deposition date, Plaintiff Travis Buntin is directed to file a Response to 112 by close of business 11/21/2018. Defendant shall thereafter file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response by close of business 11/27/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
11/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
114
11/21/2018
RESPONSE in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Enforce Protective Order filed by Travis Buntin.
1
Errata Farris protective order
2
Exhibit Portions of Schlumberger opp. to class cert.
3
Exhibit State court order granting class cert.
4
Exhibit Schlumberger's state court motion to quash
5
Exhibit Email from Ken Legacki
5 Attachments
115
11/27/2018
REPLY to Response to Motion re 112 MOTION to Enforce Protective Order filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation.
116
11/27/2018
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by Schlumberger Technology Corporation re 115 Reply to Response to Motion
1
Exhibit E to Reply to Response to (#112) Motion to Enforce Protective Order
1 Attachment
117
11/29/2018
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 112 Motion to Enforce Protective Order signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/29/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.