Burke et al v. Apple inc et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

2:2011-cv-01376 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 688 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/22/2011
COMPLAINT against Apple Inc, Pandora Media Inc (Filing fee $350 Receipt# B4601022302), filed by Marcia Burke, William C Burke, III.
2
04/22/2011
Request for service by certified mail filed by Marcia Burke, William C Burke, III.
3
04/25/2011
Summons Issued as to Apple Inc, Pandora Media Inc; mailed certified mail.
4
05/02/2011
SUMMONS Returned Executed Pandora Media Inc served on 4/27/2011, answer due 5/18/2011.
5
05/10/2011
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Marcia Burke, William C Burke, III.
6
05/10/2011
TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Petition and Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. # 5), filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Pandora Media, Inc. on May 10, 2011. As a result of the matters contained in the Stipulation, it is ordered as follows: Defendant Pandora SHALL respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint or seek other appropriate relief within thirty days of a decision by the JPML on whether to centralize this and other actions into an MDL. The parties SHALL notify the court (1) if and when the motion(s) before the JPML are set for hearing, and (2) of any decision by the JPML on the motion(s). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/10/2011.
7
05/17/2011
MOTION for Extension of Time (by 30 days) by Apple Inc. Modified on 5/17/2011
8
05/17/2011
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. # 7), filed May 17, 2011. The motion (Doc. # 7) is GRANTED. Defendant Apple Inc. SHALL respond to Plaintiff's Complaint or seek other appropriate relief on or before June 16, 2011. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 05/17/11.
9
05/23/2011
ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS-reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule LR26.1(d) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/23/2011.
10
06/10/2011
Stipulation and Motion for Extentions of Time to Respond to Complaint by Apple Inc, Marcia Burke, William C Burke, III. Modified on 6/10/2011
11
06/10/2011
TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Stipulation and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. # 10), filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Apple Inc. on June 10, 2011. As a result of the matters contained in the Stipulation, it is ordered as follows: Defendant Apple, like Defendant Pandora, SHALL respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint within thirty days of a decision by the JPML on whether to consolidate this and other actions into an MDL. The parties SHALL notify the court (1) if and when the motion(s) before the JPML are set for hearing, and (2) of any decision by the JPML on the motion(s). Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/10/2011.
12
06/30/2011
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc.
13
09/14/2011
ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL 2250; Electronic case transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern District of California.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.