Byford v. McCloud
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00198 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
24
10/23/2018
Status Report
25
10/26/2018
Status Report
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
12/31/2018
Extension of Time to Amend
28
01/16/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
01/28/2019
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.