Bynum v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00255 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/24/2018
Notice of Removal
2
10/24/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/24/2018
Notice (Other)
4
10/25/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
5
11/02/2018
Notice of Service List
6
11/02/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
7
11/02/2018
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
8
11/06/2018
Order
9
11/06/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
10
11/16/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
11
12/11/2018
Order
12
12/11/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
13
12/13/2018
Order Dismissing Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.