CP Anchorage Hotel 2, LLC v. Unite Here! Local 878 et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00071 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
05/23/2018
Notice (Other)
20
05/29/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
05/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
06/25/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
23
06/26/2018
Notice (Other)
24
07/09/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/09/2018
Declaration
27
08/13/2018
Notice of Change of Address
28
08/21/2018
Leave to File Document
29
08/31/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
31
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
32
11/27/2018
Notice (Other)
33
12/11/2018
Answer to Complaint
34
12/14/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
35
01/04/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
36
01/08/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
37
01/09/2019
Response to Order
38
01/10/2019
Scheduling Order
39
01/10/2019
Scheduling Order
40
01/28/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
41
01/29/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
42
01/31/2019
Amend/Correct
43
01/31/2019
Stipulation
44
02/05/2019
Order on Stipulation
45
02/14/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
46
02/14/2019
Declaration
47
02/14/2019
Declaration
48
02/21/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
49
02/22/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
50
02/28/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
51
04/29/2019
ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT: Hiltons Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint at Docket 42 is GRANTED in part as to the deletion of Claim 3 and the addition of the SHRM set of claims, and DENIED in part as to the proposed Holland America claims. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with the terms of this order within 7 days. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/29/2019.
52
05/06/2019
Amended Complaint

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.