Caldwell v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00105 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
14
06/04/2018
Vacate
15
06/05/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate
06/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
06/06/2018
Order
18
10/12/2018
Witness List
19
10/12/2018
Witness List
20
10/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
21
10/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
22
10/16/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
23
11/09/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
24
11/19/2018
Leave to File Document
25
11/21/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
26
11/27/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
27
11/29/2018
Witness List
28
12/06/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.