Calista Corporation v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00246 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/17/2018
Complaint
2
10/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/17/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
4
10/17/2018
Certificate of Service
5
10/19/2018
Unissued Summons
10/19/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/08/2018
Affidavit of Service
7
11/23/2018
Answer to Complaint
8
11/30/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
9
12/28/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/03/2019
Notice (Other)
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
02/04/2019
Stipulation
14
02/11/2019
Order
15
02/14/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
02/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/16/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
18
04/17/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
19
05/15/2019
Stipulation
05/16/2019
Order Dismissing Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.