Calvin Beauclair Watts
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00446 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
08/10/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
30
02/06/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
31
02/06/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
32
02/06/2019
Certificate of Service
02/07/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/25/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
02/26/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
02/27/2019
Substitution of Attorney
02/28/2019
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
03/01/2019
Certificate of Service
36
03/12/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
37
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
03/16/2019
Substitution of Attorney
03/18/2019
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.