Calzada-zubiria v. Empyrean West LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2014-cv-02106 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 435 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/23/2014
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10896689 filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria. (submitted by Dennis Daniels)
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
6
Exhibit
7
Exhibit
8
Exhibit
9
Civil Cover Sheet)(REK
9 Attachments
2
09/23/2014
SUMMONS Submitted by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria. (submitted by Dennis Daniels)
1
Summons
2
Summons
3
Summons
4
Summons
5
Summons)(REK
5 Attachments
3
09/23/2014
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10896689. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-02106-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
4
09/23/2014
Summons Issued as to Jay Carter, Ollin E Cook, Jr, Empyrean West LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund LLC, David Keller, Liberty West Regional Center LLC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
5
10/07/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Process re: Summons and Complaint upon David Keller on 09/30/2014.
6
10/07/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Process re: Summons and Complaint upon Empyrean West, LLC on 10/2/2014.
7
10/07/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Process re: Summons and Complaint upon Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund on 10/02/2014.
8
10/07/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Process re: Summons and Complaint upon Jay Carter on 10/02/2014.
9
10/07/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Process re: Summons and Complaint upon Liberty West Regional Center, LLC on 10/02/2014.
10
10/07/2014
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Process re: Summons and Complaint upon Ollin E. Cook, Jr. on 10/02/2014.
11
10/16/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G Adams on behalf of Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
12
10/22/2014
Defendant Ollin E. Cook, Jr.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Ollin E Cook, Jr.
13
10/22/2014
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Jay Carter, David Keller. (LAD) (4 pages, filed as pro se)
14
10/31/2014
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria against Empyrean West, LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund, LLC, and Liberty West Regional Center, LLC.
1
Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Application for Entry of Default
2
Proposed Entry of Default) Modified on 11/3/2014 (REW
2 Attachments
15
11/03/2014
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Empyrean West LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund LLC, Liberty West Regional Center LLC
16
11/04/2014
MOTION for Legal Assistance by Jay Carter, David Keller. (LAD) (2 pages)
17
11/17/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel "Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Legal Assistance" filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
18
12/16/2014
ORDER denying 16 Motion for Legal Assistance. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/16/14.
1
Notice re Non-Electronic NEFs). (LSP
1 Attachment
19
01/06/2015
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/5/15.
20
01/09/2015
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Exhibit A
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
21
01/30/2015
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file and serve the Amended Complaint "on all parties under Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days of the filing of th[is] order[.]" See LRCiv 15.1(a). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/30/15.
22
02/04/2015
AMENDED COMPLAINT "First Amended Complaint" against All Defendants filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Exhibit Exhibit List
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
6
Exhibit E
7
Exhibit F-1
8
Exhibit F-2
9
Exhibit G
9 Attachments
23
02/04/2015
SUMMONS Submitted by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Summons
2
Summons
2 Attachments
24
02/05/2015
Summons Issued as to Vergie L Carter, Gale M Cook, Marsha L Keller. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
cook
2
keller)(BAS
2 Attachments
25
02/16/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Gale M. Cook on 2/6/15.
26
02/16/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Marsha L. Keller on 02/11/2015.
27
02/16/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Vergie L. Carter on 02/06/2015.
28
02/16/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Certificate of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Ollin E. Cook, Jr., David Keller, Jay Carter, Empyrean West, Generations Lifestyles of Globe, Liberty West Regional Center, LLC on 02/05/2015.
29
02/18/2015
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/18/2015.
30
02/18/2015
NOTICE re: of Service by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria re: 29 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions.
31
02/18/2015
Defendants Ollin E Cook and Gale M Cook's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ANSWER to 22 Amended Complaint by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr.
32
02/18/2015
STRICKEN by Doc. 58 ANSWER (RESPONSE) to 22 First Amended Complaint by Jay Carter, David Keller.(LAD) (2 pages) Modified on 5/1/2015 (LFIG).
33
02/18/2015
MOTION to Dismiss Party David Keller, Jay Carter and Their Wives by Jay Carter, Vergie L Carter, David Keller, Marsha L Keller. (LAD) (2 pages)
34
02/23/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
35
02/23/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint upon Liberty West Regional Center, LLC, c/o Arizona Corporation Commission on 02/13/2015.
36
03/09/2015
MOTION to Strike 32 Answer to Amended Complaint "Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Empyrean West, LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund, LLC, and Liberty West Regional Center, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint" by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
37
03/09/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 33 MOTION to Dismiss Party David Keller, Jay Carter and Their Wives "Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants David Keller, Jay Carter, Marsha Keller, and Vergie Carter's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint" filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
38
03/11/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
39
03/13/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/20/2015; Dispositive motions due by 1/29/2016; by separate order, the Court will refer the case to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference to be held on or before 4/15/15; vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/15 (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/13/15.
40
03/13/2015
*ORDER, this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett for a settlement conference; Counsel are directed to jointly contact Judge Willett's Chambers to schedule a date and time to set a settlement conference to be held on or before 4/15/15 and for instructions regarding preparation for such conference. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/13/15. (REW) *Modified on 3/16/2015; to correct date in text*
41
03/18/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Service re: Response to Motion to Dismiss [DE 37], Motion to Strike Answer [DE 36] upon Liberty West Regional Center, LLC on 3/10/15.
42
03/18/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria: Affidavit of Service re: Joint Case Management Report [DE 38] upon Liberty West Regional Center, LLC, c/o Arizona Corporation Commission on 3/13/15.
43
03/19/2015
NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr.
44
03/25/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr.
45
04/01/2015
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Settlement Conference (First Request) by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 Attachment
46
04/01/2015
ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extending the deadline to hold a Settlement Conference before United States Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett through and including 5/29/2015. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2015.
47
04/08/2015
NOTICE re: Service of Order Dated April 1, 2015 by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria re: 46 Order on Motion for Extension of Time.
48
04/09/2015
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Settlement Conference set for 5/11/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. The (settlement) statement may be hand delivered or mailed; however, it must be received by United States Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on or before Monday, May 4, 2015. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/9/15.
49
04/09/2015
NOTICE re: Service of Order Setting Settlement Conference by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria re: 48 Order, Set/Reset Hearings.
50
04/13/2015
REPLY to Response to 33 MOTION to Dismiss Party David Keller, Jay Carter and Their Wives filed by Jay Carter, David Keller. (LAD) (2 pages, entitled "Response to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants David Keller, Jay Carter, Marsha Keller and Vergie Carter's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint")
51
04/14/2015
ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Settlement Conference reset for 5/8/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/14/15.
52
04/14/2015
REPLY to Response to 33 MOTION to Dismiss Party David Keller, Jay Carter and Their Wives filed by Jay Carter, David Keller. (LAD) (2 pages, entitled "Response to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants David Keller, Jay Carter, Marsha Keller and Vergie Carter's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint")
53
04/14/2015
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jay Carter, David Keller. (Associated Cases: CV-14-2106-PHX-DJH, CV-15-316-PHX-DJH) (LAD) (2 pages, filed as pro se)
54
04/17/2015
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr. *Modified event on 4/20/2015 (LFIG).
55
04/17/2015
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
56
05/01/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: (53 in 2:14-cv-02106-DJH, 53 in 2:14-cv-02106-DJH) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria. (Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-02106-DJH, 2:15-cv-00316-DJH)
57
05/01/2015
ORDER denying the 33 Motion to Dismiss Party David Keller, Jay Carter and Their Wives. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/1/2015.(LFIG)
58
05/01/2015
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Strike. ORDERED that Empyrean West, LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund, LLC and Liberty West Regional Center, LLC's 32 Response is stricken in its entirety. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/1/2015.(LFIG)
59
05/01/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: (53 in 2:14-cv-02106-DJH, 53 in 2:14-cv-02106-DJH) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Luis Octavio Alcantar. (Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-00316-DJH, 2:14-cv-02106-DJH)
60
05/04/2015
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria against Defendants.
1
Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel
2
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
2 Attachments
61
05/05/2015
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants Empyrean West LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund LLC and Liberty West Regional Center LLC.
62
05/08/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 5/8/2015 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: This is the time set for a Settlement Conference. Defendants Marsha Keller, Vergie Carter, and Gale Cook failed to appear as ordered. As clearly stated in the Order Resetting Settlement Conference (Doc. 51) and Order Setting Settlement Conference (Doc. 48), ".all parties and, if represented, their counsel, shall physically appear before United States Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett." The Court VACATES the Settlement Conference and directs counsel and all pro se defendants to contact chambers by joint conference call to reschedule the Settlement Conference for a date convenient to the Court when all parties will be physically present to fully participate in the Settlement Conference as ordered. Counsel for Defendants Gale and Ollin Cook, Jr. shall initiate the conference call within the next 5 business days from the filing of this Order. APPEARANCES: Attorneys Dennis Daniels, Jr. and Joseph Adams for and with Plaintiff Jorge Calzada-Zubiria; Defendant David Keller appearing pro se, Defendant Jay Carter appearing pro se, Attorneys Andrew Everroad and Andrew Evans for and with Defendant Ollin Cook, Jr. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 1:38 PM to 1:43 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
63
05/11/2015
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria for proceedings held on 5/8/2015, Judge Humetewa hearing judge(s).
64
05/11/2015
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Conference Proceedings held on 05/08/2015, before Judge Eileen S. Willett. (Transcriber: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015.
65
05/19/2015
ORDER resetting Settlement Conference for 8/24/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/19/15.
1
Notice re Electronic NEFs). (LSP
1 Attachment
66
06/12/2015
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Empyrean West, LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund, LLC, and Liberty West Regional Center, LLC by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
67
06/19/2015
ORDER DENYING the Motion to Consolidate Cases (Doc. 53) by defendants David C. Keller and Jay Carter (see document for further details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/18/15. (Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-02106-DJH, 2:15-cv-00316-DJH)
68
06/26/2015
** DOCUMENT DENIED AND STRICKEN PER ORDER 72 ** MOTION to Set Aside Default 61 by Jay Carter, David Keller. (Titled Response to Application for Entry of Default) (MAP) Modified on 8/11/2015
69
06/26/2015
MOTION to Strike 68 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
70
07/23/2015
MOTION for Sanctions "Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Non-Appearance at Settlement Conference" by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
71
08/10/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 70 MOTION for Sanctions "Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Non-Appearance at Settlement Conference" The Cook Defendants' Response in Opposiiton to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr.
1
Exhibit Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
72
08/11/2015
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment by defendants Jay Carter and David Keller (Titled Response to Application for Entry of Default) is DENIED and STRICKEN (Doc. 68); IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Response to Application for Entry of Default (Doc. 69) is GRANTED; and IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (Doc. 66) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART for the reasons set forth herein. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/11/15.
73
08/11/2015
NOTICE of Settlement as to the Cook Defendants Only by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr.
74
08/13/2015
ORDER pursuant to the parties' 73 Notice of Settlement as to the Cook Defendants only. ORDERED that a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Plaintiff's claims against the Cook Defendants only shall be filed on or before October 9, 2015. ORDERED that if a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed, the parties must instead file a status report on that date. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/12/2015. (LFIG)
75
08/19/2015
NOTICE re: Withdrawal by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr re: 70 MOTION for Sanctions "Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Non-Appearance at Settlement Conference", 71 Response to Motion as to the Cook Defendants Only.
76
08/19/2015
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Cook Defendants Only by Gale M Cook, Ollin E Cook, Jr.
1
Text of Proposed Order with Prejudice as to the Cook Defendants Only
1 Attachment
77
08/20/2015
ORDER pursuant to the parties' 76 Stipulation of Dismissal. ORDERED dismissing this action, with prejudice, as to the Cook Defendants only, each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. ORDERED this stipulation does not affect Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/20/2015. (LFIG)
78
08/21/2015
NOTICE re: Non-Opposition to Motion for Sanctions by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria re: 70 MOTION for Sanctions "Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Non-Appearance at Settlement Conference", 75 Notice (Other).
79
08/21/2015
* Renewed MOTION for Pre-Judgment Interest and Costs as to Empyrean West, LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund, LLC, and Liberty West Regional Center, LLC "Renewed Motion for Pre-Judgment Interest and Costs" by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Exhibit A - Bill of Costs
2
Exhibit B - Daniels Affidavit
3
Text of Proposed Order C - Proposed Judgment) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 8/24/2015 (ATD
3 Attachments
80
08/24/2015
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Settlement Conference as to individual defendants David Keller, Marsha Keller, Jay Carter, and Vergie Carter held on 8/24/2015. The parties reached an agreement and the essential terms of the settlement were placed on the record. The parties shall file a Notice of Settlement within two (2) days. A Stipulation to Dismiss all counts as to the individual defendants shall be filed within thirty (30) days. The parties agree to keep the terms of the settlement confidential except as necessary to enforce the agreement, to cooperate with the FBI, to obtain criminal convictions, and as required by law. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the audio recording of the settlement terms sealed and accessible only by the parties or by Court Order. APPEARANCES: Attorneys Joseph Adams and Dennis Daniels, Jr. for and with Plaintiff Jorge Calzada-Zubiria; pro se Defendants David Keller, Marsha Keller, Jay Carter, and Vergie Carter. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Settlement Conference held 9:28 AM to 3:59 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
81
08/26/2015
NOTICE of Settlement as to Keller and Carter Defendants Only by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
82
08/27/2015
ORDER - All claims as to the individual defendants having been resolved at conference held August 24, 2015 and the filing of a Notice of Settlement anticipated within two business days, the Court deems Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Sanctions Due to Non-Appearance at Settlement Conference to be moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 08/27/2015.
83
09/23/2015
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to the Keller and Carter Defendants Only by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
84
09/24/2015
ORDER pursuant to the parties' 83 Stipulation. ORDERED dismissing this action as to the Keller and Carter Defendants, only, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ORDERED that this order does not affect Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendants, Empyrean West, LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund, LLC and Liberty West Regional Center, LLC. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/24/2015. (LFIG)
85
11/16/2015
AMENDED MOTION to Amend/Correct 79 Renewed MOTION for Pre-Judgment Interest and Costs by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Default Judgment
1 Attachment
86
11/17/2015
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 85 Amended Motion for Pre-Judgment Interest and Costs. Plaintiff's Motion is granted to the extent it is seeking prejudgment interest, and denied with respect to costs. ORDERED that within five (5) days from the date of entry of this Order and in accordance herewith, Plaintiff may file with the Clerk of the Court his bill of costs; and a proposed default judgment consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/17/2015.(LFIG)
87
11/20/2015
NOTICE re: Filing of Proposed Default Judgment by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
1
Proposed Default Judgment
1 Attachment
88
11/20/2015
BILL OF COSTS by Jorge Alberto Calzada-Zubiria.
89
11/24/2015
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff on all claims against Defendants Empyrean West, LLC, Generations Lifestyles of Globe Development Fund, LLC and Liberty West Regional Center, LLC, and that Plaintiff recover from Defendants as follows: (1) compensatory damages of $540,000.00; (2) pre-judgment interest in the amount of $54,000.00; (3) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1961, post-judgment interest from the date of the entry of this judgment at the rate equal to the weekly average 1-year constant maturity Treasury yield, as published by the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, for the calendar week preceding the date of this judgement. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/23/2015. (LFIG)
90
12/11/2015
Taxation Judgment in amount of $478.00 against defendant. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 12/11/15.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.