Campbell et al v. Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00038 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
86
05/14/2018
ORDER granting 74 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/14/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
87
07/16/2018
ORDER denying 71 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Barbara Belluomini, Appraiser, and Lynn Carlson, M.D. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/16/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
88
07/30/2018
ORDER denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/30/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
89
08/01/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
90
08/10/2018
Notice (Other)
91
08/15/2018
Status Report
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
08/30/2018
Pretrial Order
94
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
96
09/12/2018
Order
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Trial Management Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
03/18/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines
99
04/01/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.