Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. v. George
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00204 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/11/2018
Notice of Removal
2
09/19/2018
Dismiss
09/19/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/25/2018
Dismiss
4
09/25/2018
Declaratory Judgment
5
09/25/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
6
10/02/2018
Notice (Other)
7
10/16/2018
Order
8
11/08/2018
Judgment
9
11/13/2018
Notice (Other)
10
11/13/2018
Reconsideration
11
11/19/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.