Carla Ann Napier
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00251 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/06/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
08/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/06/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
08/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/07/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
08/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
08/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
08/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
08/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
08/10/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
08/16/2018
Request for Special Notice
09/11/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
16
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
11/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
18
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
11/26/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.